This case was last updated from PACER on 05/23/2021 at 08:23:51 (UTC).

Phillips et al v. Ochoa et al

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 Phillips filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Ochoa. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andrew P. Gordon and Nancy J. Koppe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00483

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew P. Gordon

Referral Judge

Nancy J. Koppe

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

T. Matthew Phillips

Las Vegas, NV 89130

Ali Shahrokhi

Las Vegas, NV 89141

Defendants

A.G. Aaron Ford

Vincent Ochoa

Mathew Harter

C. Aaron Ford

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Sabrena Clinton

Attorney at Nevada Office of the Attorney General

555 E. Washington Avenue Suite 3900

Las Vegas, NV 89101

 

Court Documents

35 #2

Exhibit B

35 #1

Exhibit A

#35

(#35) REQUEST for Judicial Notice by Plaintiff Ali Shahrokhi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (HAM) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#34

(#34) RESPONSE to #20 Motion to Stay Discovery by Plaintiff Ali Shahrokhi. Replies due by 5/24/2021. (HAM) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

23 #1

Exhibit

#23

(#33) RESPONSE to #23 Request for Judicial Notice by Defendants C. Aaron Ford, Mathew Harter, Vincent Ochoa. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A) (Clinton, Sabrena) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

20 #2

Exhibit A

20 #1

Index of Exhibits

#20

(#34) RESPONSE to #20 Motion to Stay Discovery by Plaintiff Ali Shahrokhi. Replies due by 5/24/2021. (HAM) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

7 #1

Exhibit

#7

(#7) REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Ali Shahrokhi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (HAM) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#5

(#5) ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (HAM) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

#4

(#8) ORDER granting #4 Motion to file electronically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/25/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#3

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ali Shahrokhi re #3 Summons Issued on #1 Complaint. Aaron Ford served on 3/29/2021. (HAM) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by T. Matthew Phillips, Ali Shahrokhi. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (HAM) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

1 #2

Receipt # NVLAS074673

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ali Shahrokhi re #3 Summons Issued on #1 Complaint. Aaron Ford served on 3/29/2021. (HAM) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) REQUEST for Judicial Notice by Plaintiff Ali Shahrokhi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (HAM) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) RESPONSE to #20 Motion to Stay Discovery by Plaintiff Ali Shahrokhi. Replies due by 5/24/2021. (HAM) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) RESPONSE to #23 Request for Judicial Notice by Defendants C. Aaron Ford, Mathew Harter, Vincent Ochoa. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A) (Clinton, Sabrena) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) RESPONSE to #22 Request for Judicial Notice by Defendants C. Aaron Ford, Mathew Harter, Vincent Ochoa. (Clinton, Sabrena) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) RESPONSE to #21 Request for Judicial Notice by Defendants C. Aaron Ford, Mathew Harter, Vincent Ochoa. (Clinton, Sabrena) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE to Government Recording Clerk Officer by Ali Shahrokhi. (HAM) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) REPLY to Response to #15 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendants C. Aaron Ford, Mathew Harter, Vincent Ochoa. (Clinton, Sabrena) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) REQUEST for Judicial Notice by Plaintiff Ali Shahrokhi. (HAM) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) RESPONSE to #15 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiffs Ali Shahrokhi, T. Matthew Phillips. Replies due by 5/14/2021. (HAM) Modified on 5/10/2021 to add filer (SLD). (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Non-Opposition by C. Aaron Ford, Mathew Harter, Vincent Ochoa re #15 Motion to Dismiss,,. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H) (Clinton, Sabrena) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ali Shahrokhi re #3 Summons Issued on #1 Complaint. Aaron Ford served on 3/29/2021. (HAM) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #4 Motion to file electronically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/25/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Ali Shahrokhi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (HAM) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (HAM) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION by Pro Se Filer to File Electronically by Plaintiff T. Matthew Phillips. Responses due by 4/7/2021. (HAM) Modified text on 3/25/2021 (SLD). (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Aaron Ford, Mathew Harter, Vincent Ochoa re #1 Complaint. (HAM) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by T. Matthew Phillips, Ali Shahrokhi. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (HAM) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against C. Aaron Ford, Mathew Harter, Vincent Ochoa (Filing fee $402) by T. Matthew Phillips, Ali Shahrokhi. Proof of service due by 6/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt # NVLAS074673) (HAM) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (RT) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A.G. Aaron Ford is a litigant