Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/02/2019 at 08:04:55 (UTC).

Philius v. McAleenan et al

Case Summary

On 06/03/2019 Philius filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against McAleenan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph H L Perez-Montes and Dee D Drell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00701

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Joseph H L Perez-Montes

Presiding Judge

Dee D Drell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wilkens Philius

Hawthorne, CA 90250

Defendants

William Barr

Kevin McAleenan

 

Court Documents

#8

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

5 #1

Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus form

#5

(#5) MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 7/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus form)(crt,Williams, L) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Change of Address by Wilkens Philius. Clerk updated address to 2851 W 120th St Ste E #396 Hawthorne, CA 90250. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,ThomasSld, T) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) OBJECTION to #4 Report and Recommendations by Wilkens Philius. Response to Objection to R&R due by 8/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Wilkens Philius. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Wilkens Philius. Objections to R&R due by 7/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/24/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Wilkens Philius, Alexandria Staging Facility re: #5 Sec P - Deficiency Order returned marked: Return to Sender, Unable to forward. Action taken: On 6/19/19 the clerk updated plaintiff's address. Resent #5 Memorandum Order and form to updated address this date. (crt,Reeves, T) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • NOTICE of Change of Address by Wilkens Philius. Clerk updated plaintiff's address to KROME SPC, 18201 S W 12th St, Miami, FL 33194 and resent doc. 4 to updated address. (crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Wilkens Philius by Wilkens Philius. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Wilkens Philius, Alexandria Staging Facility, re: #4 Report and Recommendations, returned marked: return to sender. (crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 7/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus form)(crt,Williams, L) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - IT IS RECOMMENDED that #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order should be DENIED AND DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Objections to R&R due by 6/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/4/2019. (crt,Tice, Y)(a) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • FILING FEE RECEIVED: on behalf of Wilkens Philius in the amount of $5.00, receipt number 14635002833. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Wilkens Philius. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Receipt number 14635002833, filing fee $5) filed by Wilkens Philius. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Letter)(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less