This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/15/2019 at 07:12:46 (UTC).

Philips North America LLC et al v. KPI Healthcare, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/16/2019 Philips North America LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against KPI Healthcare, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are James V. Selna and John D. Early. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-01765

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James V. Selna

Referral Judge

John D. Early

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Koninklijke Philips N.V.

Philips North America LLC

Defendants and Counter Claimants

KPI Healthcare, Inc.

KPI Healthcare Ecommerce, Inc.

Does 1-10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Carla M Wirtschafter

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

1901 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90067-6078

Richard A Graham

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

225 Fifth Avenue

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Kirsten R Rydstrom

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

225 Fifth Avenue

Pittsburgh, PA 15219-1886

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Daniel Miles Cislo

Attorney at Cislo and Thomas LLP

12100 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Peter S Veregge

Attorney at Cislo and Thomas LLP

12100 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

#26

#25

#24

23 #1

Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complai

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

8 #2

Proposed Order

8 #1

Letter Certificate of Good Standing

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES and, COUNTERCLAIM against Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips North America LLC filed by Defendants KPI Healthcare Ecommerce, Inc., KPI Healthcare, Inc..(Cislo, Daniel) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) *NOTE: COMPLETE CASE NUMBER* ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS (L.R. 8-3), #23 by Judge James V. Selna. The Court hereby grants the stipulation and extends time for all defendants to respond to the complaint to November 11, 2019. (es) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants KPI Healthcare Ecommerce, Inc., KPI Healthcare, Inc., identifying KPI Healthcare, Inc. and KPI Healthcare Ecommerce, Inc.. (Veregge, Peter) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to KPI Healthcare Ecommerce, Inc. answer now due 11/11/2019; KPI Healthcare, Inc. answer now due 11/11/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants KPI Healthcare Ecommerce, Inc.; KPI Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by Not More Than 30 Days)(Attorney Peter S Veregge added to party KPI Healthcare Ecommerce, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Peter S Veregge added to party KPI Healthcare, Inc.(pty:dft))(Veregge, Peter) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 12/2/2019 at 10:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 11/25/2019. (lb) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Philips North America LLC, Koninklijke Philips N.V., upon Defendant KPI Healthcare Ecommerce, Inc. served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Steven S. Minn, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Wirtschafter, Carla) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Philips North America LLC, Koninklijke Philips N.V., upon Defendant KPI Healthcare, Inc. served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Steven S. Minn, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Wirtschafter, Carla) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING #9 Non-Resident Attorney Richard A. Graham APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA LLC, KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., designating Carla M. Wirtschafter as local counsel. (es) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING #8 Non-Resident Attorney Kirsten R. Rydstrom APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA LLC, KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., designating Carla M. Wirtschafter as local counsel. (es) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #4 , Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (car) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Richard A. Graham to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips North America LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24447336) filed by Plaintiffs Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Letter Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Wirtschafter, Carla) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kirsten R. Rydstrom to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips North America LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24447287) filed by Plaintiffs Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Letter Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Wirtschafter, Carla) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips North America LLC. (Wirtschafter, Carla) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Koninklijke Philips N.V. CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips North America LLC, identifying None. (Wirtschafter, Carla) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Philips North America LLC CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips North America LLC, identifying Koninklijke Philips N.V.. (Wirtschafter, Carla) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips North America LLC. (Wirtschafter, Carla) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips North America LLC. (Wirtschafter, Carla) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips North America LLC. (Wirtschafter, Carla) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24446082 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Philips North America LLC, Koninklijke Philips N.V.. (Attorney Carla M Wirtschafter added to party Koninklijke Philips N.V.(pty:pla), Attorney Carla M Wirtschafter added to party Philips North America LLC(pty:pla))(Wirtschafter, Carla) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KPI Healthcare, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Philips North America LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kirsten R. Rydstrom

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard A. Graham, Jr