This case was last updated from PACER on 03/31/2020 at 09:42:53 (UTC).

PHH Mortgage Corporation v. White

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 PHH Mortgage Corporation filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against White. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert W. Schroeder, III and Caroline Craven. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00016

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert W. Schroeder, III

Referral Judge

Caroline Craven

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHH Mortgage Corporation

Defendant

Brenda Sue White

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark Douglas Cronenwett

Attorney at Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann, PC - Dallas

14160 North Dallas Parkway, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75254

Jonathan Caleb Smith

Attorney at Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann, PC - Dallas

14160 North Dallas Parkway, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75254

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) FINAL JUDGMENT. Pursuant to the Courts order dismissing the case, the Court hereby enters Final Judgment. All other claims for relief are DENIED-AS-MOOT. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 03/20/20. (lfs, ) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Agreed Order. It is therefore, ORDERED that Defendant Brenda Sue White, as Independent Executrix of the Estate of Herschel Holtzclaw Lee, Deceased has no interest in the Property and is barred from claimingany interest in the Property in future. It is further, ORDERED that Plaintiff or its successors or assigns, may proceed with foreclosure on Defendants interest in the Property as provided in the Deed of Trust and section 51.002 of the Texas Property Code. It is further, ORDERED that foreclosure notices may be sent to Brenda Sue White, as Independent Executrix of the Estate of Herschel Holtzclaw Lee, Deceased at 201 Calumet Street, Waco, Texas 76704. It is further, ORDERED that except as otherwise noted, Plaintiff and Defendant Brenda Sue White, as Independent Executrix of the Estate of Herschel Holtzclaw Lee, Deceased are each to bear their respective costs and attorneys fees, if any. All relief not previously granted is DENIED-AS-MOOT. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE this civil action. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 03/20/20. (lfs, ) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

5 #1

Exhibit

#5

(#5) MOTION for Entry of Agreed Order by PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Agreed Order)(Smith, Jonathan) Modified on 3/18/2020 (slo, ). (Entered: 03/17/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by PHH Mortgage Corporation. Brenda Sue White served on 2/20/2020, answer due 3/12/2020. (Smith, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file a notice that the case is ready for a scheduling conference when all Defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. The notice must be filed within five days of the last remaining Defendants answer or motion. The notice must include a list of any pending motions to dismiss or transfer and a list of anyrelated cases previously filed in the Eastern District of Texas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 02/04/20. (lfs, ) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued on 02/03/2020 as to Brenda Sue White. (lfs, ) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Brenda Sue White ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7641670.), filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cronenwett, Mark) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FINAL JUDGMENT. Pursuant to the Courts order dismissing the case, the Court hereby enters Final Judgment. All other claims for relief are DENIED-AS-MOOT. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 03/20/20. (lfs, ) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Agreed Order. It is therefore, ORDERED that Defendant Brenda Sue White, as Independent Executrix of the Estate of Herschel Holtzclaw Lee, Deceased has no interest in the Property and is barred from claimingany interest in the Property in future. It is further, ORDERED that Plaintiff or its successors or assigns, may proceed with foreclosure on Defendants interest in the Property as provided in the Deed of Trust and section 51.002 of the Texas Property Code. It is further, ORDERED that foreclosure notices may be sent to Brenda Sue White, as Independent Executrix of the Estate of Herschel Holtzclaw Lee, Deceased at 201 Calumet Street, Waco, Texas 76704. It is further, ORDERED that except as otherwise noted, Plaintiff and Defendant Brenda Sue White, as Independent Executrix of the Estate of Herschel Holtzclaw Lee, Deceased are each to bear their respective costs and attorneys fees, if any. All relief not previously granted is DENIED-AS-MOOT. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE this civil action. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 03/20/20. (lfs, ) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Entry of Agreed Order by PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Agreed Order)(Smith, Jonathan) Modified on 3/18/2020 (slo, ). (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by PHH Mortgage Corporation. Brenda Sue White served on 2/20/2020, answer due 3/12/2020. (Smith, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file a notice that the case is ready for a scheduling conference when all Defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. The notice must be filed within five days of the last remaining Defendants answer or motion. The notice must include a list of any pending motions to dismiss or transfer and a list of anyrelated cases previously filed in the Eastern District of Texas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 02/04/20. (lfs, ) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued on 02/03/2020 as to Brenda Sue White. (lfs, ) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (slo, ) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketSTANDING ORDER REFERRING 40% of CIVIL CASES to Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven for all pretrial matters. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 1/31/2020. (slo, ) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (slo, ) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Brenda Sue White ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7641670.), filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cronenwett, Mark) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less