This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/14/2021 at 09:24:45 (UTC).

Phenix Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. Broan-Nutone, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 Phenix Mutual Fire Insurance Company filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Broan-Nutone, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Stearns. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-10628

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Stearns

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Phenix Mutual Fire Insurance Company

Defendants

Jakel Motors, Inc.

Broan-Nutone, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Patrick J. Loftus, III

Attorney at Loftus & LoftusPC

The Coyne Building, 732 East Broadway

South Boston, MA 02124

Lawrence F. Walker

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

1650 Market Street, Suite 2800

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew D. Black

Attorney at Smith Duggan Buell & Rufo LLP.

55 Old Bedford Road

Lincoln, MA 01773

Christopher A. Duggan

Attorney at Smith Duggan Buell & Rufo LLP

55 Old Bedford Road

Lincoln, MA 01773

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Category Form

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#13

13 #1

Exhibit

13 #2

Affidavit

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Lawrence F. Walker. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Pacho, Arnold) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Lawrence Walker Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8768922 by Phenix Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Affidavit)(Loftus, Patrick) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • Docket(#12) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. An Answer having been filed in this case, the court enters the following pretrial schedule.Initial disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) must be completed by 5/28/21. All amendments to the pleadings and/or joinder of additional parties shall be completed by 6/18/21. The court will permit 30 interrogatories, 30 requests for admissions and 30 document requests without leave of court and expects those requests to be filed within 30 days of the initial disclosures. If the parties would like to participate in the courts mediation program, they must notify our docket clerk Arnold Pacho (617-748-9812) by 10/1/21 (it may take several weeks to get a mediation date). All fact discovery must be completed no later than 10/29/21. Plaintiff shall designate its expert(s), if any, and serve Rule 26(a)(2) reports no later than 11/29/21; defendants expert witness(es), if any, will be designated and Rule 26(a)(2) reports filed no later than 12/20/21. Expert discovery must be completed by 1/24/22.Dispositive motions are due by 2/15/22, with Oppositions due 3/8/22; Reply, if any, by leave of court.(Zierk, Marsha) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Phenix Mutual Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Motorists Insurance Group for Phenix Mutual Fire Insurance Company.. (Loftus, Patrick) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew D. Black on behalf of Broan-Nutone, LLC, Jakel Motors, Inc. (Black, Andrew) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jakel Motors, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Regal Beloit Corporation for Jakel Motors, Inc... (Duggan, Christopher) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Jakel Motors, Inc..(Duggan, Christopher) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Broan-Nutone, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Nortek, Inc. for Broan-Nutone, LLC.. (Duggan, Christopher) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Broan-Nutone, LLC.(Duggan, Christopher) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed Broan-Nutone, LLC served on 4/23/2021, answer due 5/14/2021. (Loftus, Patrick) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed Jakel Motors, Inc. served on 4/26/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. (Loftus, Patrick) (Entered: 05/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Jakel Motors, Inc., Broan-Nutone, LLC Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8730102 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Phenix Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Loftus, Patrick) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BROAN NUTONE, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where JAKEL MOTORS INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew D. Black

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher A. Duggan