This case was last updated from PACER on 09/25/2020 at 09:36:27 (UTC).

Phelps v. United States of America et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2020 Phelps filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steve C. Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03113

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steve C. Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ellis Eugene Phelps

Stone Mountain, GA 30083

Defendants

U. S. Department of the Interior

United States of America

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#5

(#5) Return of Service Executed by Ellis Eugene Phelps. U. S. Department of the Interior served on 8/3/2020, answer due 10/2/2020; United States of America served on 8/3/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (adg) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#4

(#4) SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to U. S. Department of the Interior. (tcc) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#2

(#2) FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/20. (eop) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Ellis Eugene Phelps. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number GAN100122975) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 07/28/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ellis Eugene Phelps re #6 Notice (Other). (rjs) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Return of Service Executed by Ellis Eugene Phelps. U. S. Department of the Interior served on 8/3/2020, answer due 10/2/2020; United States of America served on 8/3/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (adg) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ellis Eugene Phelps re #4 Notice (Other). (rjs) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to U. S. Department of the Interior. (tcc) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ellis Eugene Phelps re #2 Order. (rvb) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/20. (eop) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Ellis Eugene Phelps. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number GAN100122975) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less