This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/28/2021 at 07:47:49 (UTC).

PHELPS v. LOGISTIX, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/29/2021 PHELPS filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against LOGISTIX, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is ANITA B. BRODY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04279

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ANITA B. BRODY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZACHARY PHELPS

Defendant

LOGISTIX, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL GROH

Attorney at MURPHY LAW GROUP, LLC

Eight Penn Center, Suite 2000, 1628 John F Kennedy Blvd

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Case Management Track Form

1 #3

Designation Form

#2

(#2) NOTICE by ZACHARY PHELPS Opt-In Consent Form of Sean Tate (GROH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ZACHARY PHELPS. LOGISTIX, LLC waiver sent on 9/29/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (GROH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ZACHARY PHELPS. LOGISTIX, LLC waiver sent on 9/29/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (GROH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by ZACHARY PHELPS Opt-In Consent Form of Sean Tate (GROH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to LOGISTIX, LLC. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 9/29/21 (bw, ) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by ZACHARY PHELPS. (JL ) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against LOGISTIX, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15440541.), filed by ZACHARY PHELPS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(GROH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL GROH