Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2019 at 10:12:34 (UTC).

Phelps v. DHL Express (USA), Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/02/2019 Phelps filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against DHL Express USA , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William O. Bertelsman and Candace J. Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00041

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William O. Bertelsman

Referral Judge

Candace J. Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stephanie Phelps

Defendant

DHL Express (USA), Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert A. Klingler

525 Vine Street, Suite 2320

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Defendant Attorneys

Laurel K. Cornell

Attorney at Fisher & Phillips - Louisville

220 W. Main Street, Suite 1700

Louisville, KY 40202

Chantell C. Foley

Attorney at Fisher & Phillips - Louisville

220 W. Main Street, Suite 1700

Louisville, KY 40202

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation (Agreed Protective Order) by DHL Express (USA), Inc., Stephanie Phelps. (Foley, Chantell) Modified to add plaintiff as a filer on 7/9/2019 (ECO). (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#16

(#16) NOTICE by DHL Express (USA), Inc. of Service of Defendant's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Foley, Chantell) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#15

(#15) ORDER:1. Parties shall first meet and/or confer in good faith and attempt to resolve discovery disputes between themselves, without judicial intervention;2. If the parties are unable to resolve a dispute after conferring directly, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreement by calling the undersigneds chambers to schedule an informal telephone conference; and,3. If, and only if, the parties are unable to resolve their discovery impasse after informal telephone conference, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court. Written motions regarding discovery shall include the certification required by Civil Rule 37(a)(1) and Local Rule of Civil Practice 37.1, if applicable.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 06/25/2019.(KRB)cc: COR (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#13

(#13) JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Foley, Chantell) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER: that said DOCKET CALL be, and hereby is, set for WEDNESDAY, JUNE 19, 2019 AT 1:00 P.M., to be held at the United States Courthouse, 35 West Fifth Street, Covington, Kentucky in the 5th Floor Courtroom before Judge William O. Bertelsman. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order at least three (3) days before docket call. Counsel must attend the docket call in person and be sufficiently familiar with the case to answer any inquires the Court may have. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 5/23/2019.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by DHL Express (USA), Inc..(Foley, Chantell) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER: That Defendant, DHL Express (USA), Inc., shall be granted an extension of time, up to and including May 7, 2019, in which to fileits responsive pleading to the Complaint of Plaintiff Stephanie Phelps. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 4/23/2019.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 04/23/2019)

#9

(#9) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DHL Express (USA), Inc. identifying Corporate Parent DPWN Holdings (USA), Inc. for DHL Express (USA), Inc... (Foley, Chantell) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Laurel K. Cornell and Chantell C. Foley. #6 Notice of Appearance, #5 Notice of Appearance has been filed by DHL Express without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (KRB) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

#7

(#7) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (JOINT) by DHL Express (USA), Inc.. (Foley, Chantell) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Chantell C. Foley on behalf of DHL Express (USA), Inc. (Foley, Chantell) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Laurel K. Cornell on behalf of DHL Express (USA), Inc. (Cornell, Laurel) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to DHL Express (USA), Inc.; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (ECO) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#3

(#3) STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to presiding Magistrate Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, hold hearings as required, and rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of court to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/18/2010.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 04/02/2019)

1 #2

Summons -DHL Express (USA), Inc.

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4324206), filed by Stephanie Phelps. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons -DHL Express (USA), Inc.)(ECO) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: #17 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation (Agreed Protective Order) by DHL Express (USA), Inc. (ECO) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation (Agreed Protective Order) by DHL Express (USA), Inc., Stephanie Phelps. (Foley, Chantell) Modified to add plaintiff as a filer on 7/9/2019 (ECO). (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE by DHL Express (USA), Inc. of Service of Defendant's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Foley, Chantell) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER:1. Parties shall first meet and/or confer in good faith and attempt to resolve discovery disputes between themselves, without judicial intervention;2. If the parties are unable to resolve a dispute after conferring directly, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreement by calling the undersigneds chambers to schedule an informal telephone conference; and,3. If, and only if, the parties are unable to resolve their discovery impasse after informal telephone conference, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court. Written motions regarding discovery shall include the certification required by Civil Rule 37(a)(1) and Local Rule of Civil Practice 37.1, if applicable.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 06/25/2019.(KRB)cc: COR (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR DOCKET CALL held on 6/19/2019 before Judge William O. Bertelsman: Parties present as noted. IT IS ORDERED that the Court adopts the parties' Joint Report of Parties Planning Meeting #13 as follows:1) Discovery shall be completed on or before December 30, 2019 with joint or separate status reports due the same date. 2) On or before October 28, 2019, plaintiff shall disclose expert witnesses as required by Rule 26(a)(2). On or before November 29, 2019, defendant shall disclose expert witnesses as required by Rule 26(a)(2). 3) On or before June 28, 2019, plaintiff shall amend pleadings or join additional parties. On or before July 29, 2019, defendant shall amend pleadings or join additional parties. 4) Dispositive motions shall be filed on or before January 27, 2020. Although documents must now be filed electronically with the Court Clerk, a PAPER court courtesy copy shall be provided to CHAMBERS within 48 hours of the filing of the brief or memorandum in support of any motion, where such brief or memorandum (including any attached exhibits) exceeds 10 pages. (Court Reporter LISA WIESMAN.) (ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Foley, Chantell) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER: that said DOCKET CALL be, and hereby is, set for WEDNESDAY, JUNE 19, 2019 AT 1:00 P.M., to be held at the United States Courthouse, 35 West Fifth Street, Covington, Kentucky in the 5th Floor Courtroom before Judge William O. Bertelsman. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order at least three (3) days before docket call. Counsel must attend the docket call in person and be sufficiently familiar with the case to answer any inquires the Court may have. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 5/23/2019.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by DHL Express (USA), Inc..(Foley, Chantell) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER: That Defendant, DHL Express (USA), Inc., shall be granted an extension of time, up to and including May 7, 2019, in which to fileits responsive pleading to the Complaint of Plaintiff Stephanie Phelps. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 4/23/2019.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DHL Express (USA), Inc. identifying Corporate Parent DPWN Holdings (USA), Inc. for DHL Express (USA), Inc... (Foley, Chantell) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Laurel K. Cornell and Chantell C. Foley. #6 Notice of Appearance, #5 Notice of Appearance has been filed by DHL Express without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (KRB) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (JOINT) by DHL Express (USA), Inc.. (Foley, Chantell) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Chantell C. Foley on behalf of DHL Express (USA), Inc. (Foley, Chantell) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Laurel K. Cornell on behalf of DHL Express (USA), Inc. (Cornell, Laurel) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Conflict Check run. (ECO) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to DHL Express (USA), Inc.; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (ECO) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to presiding Magistrate Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, hold hearings as required, and rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of court to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/18/2010.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4324206), filed by Stephanie Phelps. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons -DHL Express (USA), Inc.)(ECO) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DHL EXPRESS is a litigant