This case was last updated from PACER on 10/25/2020 at 10:08:57 (UTC).

Pheap v. City of Knoxville, et al (PLR3)

Case Summary

On 08/26/2020 Pheap filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Knoxville, PLR3. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Debra C Poplin and Clifton L Corker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00387

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Debra C Poplin

Presiding Judge

Clifton L Corker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sophea Pheap

Sophia Pheap

Defendants

Eve M Thomas

Dylan M Williams

John & Jane Does 1-5

City of Knoxville, Tennessee

Eve M. Thomas

Dylan M. Williams

City of Knoxville

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lance Kristopher Baker

Attorney at The Baker Law Firm

550 West Main Street, Suite 600

Knoxville, TN 37902

Joshua D Hedrick

Attorney at Whitt, Cooper, Hedrick & Wojcik

607 Market Street, Suite 1100

Knoxville, TN 37902

Defendant Attorneys

Ronald E Mills

Attorney at City of Knoxville

P O Box 1631

Knoxville, TN 37901

E Jerome Melson

Attorney at Gentry, Tipton & McLemore, PC

900 South Gay Street, Suite 2300

Knoxville, TN 37902

John M Kizer

Attorney at Gentry, Tipton & McLemore, PC

900 South Gay Street, Suite 2300

Knoxville, TN 37902

 

Court Documents

18 #1

Other Notice Consent/Non-Consent

#18

(#18) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/22/20. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice Consent/Non-Consent) (JBR) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

17 #1

Other Notice of Consent / Non Consent

#17

(#17) ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court after a telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiff's counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent / Non Consent) (CAT) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#16

(#16) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Dylan M. Williams. (Melson, E) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#15

(#15) NOTICE by Dylan M. Williams Pursuant to Order Governing Motions to Dismiss [Doc. 6] (Melson, E) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#14

(#14) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Dylan M. Williams. (Melson, E) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by City of Knoxville, Eve M. Thomas.(Mills, Ronald) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald E Mills on behalf of City of Knoxville, Eve M. Thomas (Mills, Ronald) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sophia Pheap. Dylan M. Williams served on 9/30/2020. (Baker, Lance) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sophia Pheap. City of Knoxville served on 9/18/2020. (Baker, Lance) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sophia Pheap. Eve M. Thomas served on 9/18/2020. (Baker, Lance) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT: this case is reassigned to District Judge Clifton L Corker for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/15/2020. (BJL) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

1 #4

Summons Williams

1 #3

Summons Thomas

1 #2

Summons City of Knoxville

1 #1

Other

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against City of Knoxville, Tennessee, John & Jane Does 1-5, Eve M Thomas, Dylan M Williams ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4461214.), filed by Sophea Pheap. (Attachments: #1 Other, #2 Summons City of Knoxville, #3 Summons Thomas, #4 Summons Williams)(Baker, Lance) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/22/20. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice Consent/Non-Consent) (JBR) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court after a telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiff's counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent / Non Consent) (CAT) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Dylan M. Williams. (Melson, E) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE by Dylan M. Williams Pursuant to Order Governing Motions to Dismiss [Doc. 6] (Melson, E) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Dylan M. Williams. (Melson, E) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by City of Knoxville, Eve M. Thomas.(Mills, Ronald) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald E Mills on behalf of City of Knoxville, Eve M. Thomas (Mills, Ronald) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sophia Pheap. Dylan M. Williams served on 9/30/2020. (Baker, Lance) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sophia Pheap. City of Knoxville served on 9/18/2020. (Baker, Lance) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sophia Pheap. Eve M. Thomas served on 9/18/2020. (Baker, Lance) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT: this case is reassigned to District Judge Clifton L Corker for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/15/2020. (BJL) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/28/20. (JBR) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 08/27/2020. (CAT) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 08/27/2020. (CAT) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 08/27/2020. (CAT) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint : INFORMATIONAL ONLY. For future reference, please file the Civil Cover Sheet in a non-fillable format. (CAT) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to City of Knoxville, Eve M. Thomas, Dylan M. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Summons Eve M. Thomas, #2 Summons Dylan M. Williams) (CAT) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketDistrict Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (CAT) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against City of Knoxville, Tennessee, John & Jane Does 1-5, Eve M Thomas, Dylan M Williams ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4461214.), filed by Sophea Pheap. (Attachments: #1 Other, #2 Summons City of Knoxville, #3 Summons Thomas, #4 Summons Williams)(Baker, Lance) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer E Jerome Melson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John M Kizer