This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/30/2022 at 20:13:26 (UTC).

Phase 5 Energy Ltd. Inc. v. Quantum Green Technologies, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 Phase 5 Energy Ltd Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Quantum Green Technologies, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas G. Wilson and Mary S. Scriven. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-00501

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Thomas G. Wilson

Presiding Judge

Mary S. Scriven

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Phase 5 Energy Ltd. Inc.

Defendants

Christopher Patton

Quantum Green Technologies, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kenneth George Turkel

Brad F. Barrios

Anthony Joseph Severino

Defendant Attorney

David Thomas Knight

 

Court Documents

#16

#17

(#17) NOTICE of withdrawal of motion by Phase 5 Energy Ltd. Inc. re #6 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court , For Attorneys' Fees Under 28 USC 1447(c), and for an Expedited Briefing Schedule filed by Phase 5 Energy Ltd. Inc. for Attorneys' Fees and Stipulation of Dismissal (Barrios, Brad) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

#15

#14

#13

#11

10 #1

Exhibit

#10

#9

#8

7 #1

Exhibit A

#7

#6

#4

2 #1

Exhibit 2 to Defendant's Joint Notice of Removal

#2

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ENDORSED ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #6 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees Under 28 U.S.C. 1447(c); DENYING AS MOOT #15 Defendant Christopher Patton's Motion to Respond to the Reply of Phase 5 Energy Ltd., Inc. In light of Plaintiff's having filed a Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Attorneys' Fees, (Dkt. 17), these Motions are denied as moot. The case shall remain closed. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/18/2021. (JRF) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of withdrawal of motion by Phase 5 Energy Ltd. Inc. re #6 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court , For Attorneys' Fees Under 28 USC 1447(c), and for an Expedited Briefing Schedule filed by Phase 5 Energy Ltd. Inc. for Attorneys' Fees and Stipulation of Dismissal (Barrios, Brad) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 First MOTION for Reconsideration re #13 Reply to Response to Motion, 12 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document to Defendant Christopher Patton's Motion to Respond to the Reply of Phase 5 Energy Ltd., Inc. filed by Phase 5 Energy Ltd. Inc.. (Barrios, Brad) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) First MOTION for Reconsideration re #13 Reply to Response to Motion, 12 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document by Christopher Patton. (Knight, David) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) DECLARATION of Andrew Smart re #13 Reply to Response to Motion by Phase 5 Energy Ltd. Inc.. (Barrios, Brad) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply to Defendant's Response to Motion for Attorneys' Fees filed by Phase 5 Energy Ltd. Inc.. (Barrios, Brad) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #11 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Reply to Defendants' Response to Motion for Attorneys' Fees. Plaintiff shall have up to and including seven (7) days from the date of this Order to file a Reply, which shall not exceed three (3) pages. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 3/24/2021. (JRF) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply to Defendant's Response to Motion for Attorneys' Fees by Phase 5 Energy Ltd. Inc. (Barrios, Brad) Modified on 3/24/2021 (TDC). (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE to Motion re #6 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court , For Attorneys' Fees Under 28 USC 1447(c), and for an Expedited Briefing Schedule filed by Christopher Patton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Knight, David) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER GRANTING IN PART #6 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 3/10/2021. (JRF) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by Christopher Patton, Quantum Green Technologies, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal (Knight, David) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DECLARATION of Andrew Smart re #6 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court , For Attorneys' Fees Under 28 USC 1447(c), and for an Expedited Briefing Schedule by Phase 5 Energy Ltd. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Barrios, Brad) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court , For Attorneys' Fees Under 28 USC 1447(c), and for an Expedited Briefing Schedule by Phase 5 Energy Ltd. Inc.. (Barrios, Brad) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CRB) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER regarding discovery motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/1/2021. (DMS) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • Docket(#3) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:21-cv-0501-MSS-TGW. (SJB) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Civil Cover Sheer by Christopher Patton, Quantum Green Technologies, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 to Defendant's Joint Notice of Removal)(Knight, David) Modified on 3/3/2021 (JLD). (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Twelfth Circuit Court, Manatee County, case number 2021-CA-500AX filed in State Court on February 9, 2021. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 113A-17954906 filed by Christopher Patton, Quantum Green Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT)(Knight, David) Modified on 3/3/2021 (JLD). (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less