Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/31/2020 at 08:25:37 (UTC).

Pharmavite LLC v. Clean Label Project Foundation et al

Case Summary

On 09/01/2020 Pharmavite LLC filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Clean Label Project Foundation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Pedro V. Castillo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-08001

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr

Referral Judge

Pedro V. Castillo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pharmavite LLC

Defendants

Pure Market, LLC

Clean Label Project Foundation

Third Party Validation & Verification LLC

Third Party Validation & Verification LLC a Colorado limited liability company doing business as Ellipse Analytics

DOES 1-20

Kevin Hicks

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rene P Tatro

Attorney at Tatro Tekosky Sadwick LLP

333 South Grand Avenue Suite 4270

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Juliet A Markowitz

Attorney at Tatro Tekosky Sadwick LLP

333 South Grand Avenue Suite 4270

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Steven R Tekosky

Attorney at Tatro Tekosky Sadwick LLP

333 South Grand Avenue Suite 4270

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2901

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew Michael Purdy

Attorney at Herrera Purdy Weiler LLP

4590 Macarthur Boulevard Suite 500

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Shawn Mark Kennedy

Attorney at Herrera Purdy LLP

4590 Macarthur Boulevard Suite 500

Newport Beach, CA 92260

Bret D Hembd

Attorney at Herrera Purdy LLP

3500 West Olive Avenue Suite 300

Burbank, CA 91505

 

Court Documents

29 #1

Proposed Order

#29

(#29) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Amended Complaint/Petition, #28 filed by Defendants Clean Label Project Foundation, Kevin Hicks, Pure Market, LLC, Third Party Validation & Verification LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Andrew Michael Purdy added to party Kevin Hicks(pty:dft))(Purdy, Andrew) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#28

(#28) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Clean Label Project Foundation, Kevin Hicks, Pure Market, LLC, Third Party Validation & Verification LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Pharmavite LLC(Tatro, Rene) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#27

(#27) ORDER ON STIPULATION PERMITTING FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr, re Stipulation to Amend/Correct #22 : Having considered the Parties' Stipulation Re Filing of First Amended Complaint, Dkt. No. 22, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Pharmavite LLC may electronically file the First Amended Complaint identified in Exhibit A to the Stipulation, Dkt. No. 22-1, by October 23, 2020. The Court STRIKES the First Amended Complaint filed on October 16, 2020, Dkt. No. 23, for being improperly filed without leave. (bm) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#26

(#26) 21-Day Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #20 as to Defendant Kevin Hicks. (gk) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#25

(#25) NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed Order re Stipulation to Amend/Correct #22 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tatro, Rene) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

22 #1

Exhibit A

#22

(#22) STIPULATION to Amend Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Pharmavite LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tatro, Rene) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#20

(#20) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Clean Label Project Foundation, Pure Market, LLC, Third Party Validation & Verification LLC, Kevin Hicks amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Pharmavite LLC(Tatro, Rene) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #9 . The following error(s) was found: The case number and/or judge(s)initials are incorrect. The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. No Judge's initials. See To: (Defendant's name and address) - name should also be exactly as in the complaint and/or unable to fit all information, please add "see attach". The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lom) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#9

(#10) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #9 . The following error(s) was found: The case number and/or judge(s)initials are incorrect. The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. No Judge's initials. See To: (Defendant's name and address) - name should also be exactly as in the complaint and/or unable to fit all information, please add "see attach". The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lom) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (jtil) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Pharmavite LLC, identifying Pharmavite LLC, Otsuka America, Inc., Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Otsuka Holdings Co., Ltd.. (Tatro, Rene) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Pharmavite LLC. (Tatro, Rene) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Pharmavite LLC. (Tatro, Rene) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#1

(#20) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Clean Label Project Foundation, Pure Market, LLC, Third Party Validation & Verification LLC, Kevin Hicks amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Pharmavite LLC(Tatro, Rene) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Amended Complaint/Petition, #28 filed by Defendants Clean Label Project Foundation, Kevin Hicks, Pure Market, LLC, Third Party Validation & Verification LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Andrew Michael Purdy added to party Kevin Hicks(pty:dft))(Purdy, Andrew) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Clean Label Project Foundation, Kevin Hicks, Pure Market, LLC, Third Party Validation & Verification LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Pharmavite LLC(Tatro, Rene) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER ON STIPULATION PERMITTING FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr, re Stipulation to Amend/Correct #22 : Having considered the Parties' Stipulation Re Filing of First Amended Complaint, Dkt. No. 22, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Pharmavite LLC may electronically file the First Amended Complaint identified in Exhibit A to the Stipulation, Dkt. No. 22-1, by October 23, 2020. The Court STRIKES the First Amended Complaint filed on October 16, 2020, Dkt. No. 23, for being improperly filed without leave. (bm) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) 21-Day Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #20 as to Defendant Kevin Hicks. (gk) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed Order re Stipulation to Amend/Correct #22 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tatro, Rene) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation #22 , Amended Complaint #23 . The following error(s) was/were found: Leave of court required for filing. Pursuant to Fed.R. Civ P 15 A party may amend its pleading once as a matter of course, no leave from the Court has been granted to file a new Amended Complaint. Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. A Word or Wordperfect version of the proposed order should also be emailed to the chambers generic email address. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) DOCUMENT STRICKEN ON 10/22/2020. First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Clean Label Project Foundation, Kevin Hicks, Pure Market, LLC, Third Party Validation & Verification LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Pharmavite LLC(Tatro, Rene) Modified on 10/23/2020 (bm). (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) STIPULATION to Amend Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Pharmavite LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tatro, Rene) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #20 filed by Plaintiff Pharmavite LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment #1)(Tatro, Rene) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Clean Label Project Foundation, Pure Market, LLC, Third Party Validation & Verification LLC, Kevin Hicks amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Pharmavite LLC(Tatro, Rene) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Pharmavite LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment #1, #2 Attachment #2)(Tatro, Rene) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #9 . The following error(s) was found: The case number and/or judge(s)initials are incorrect. The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. No Judge's initials. See To: (Defendant's name and address) - name should also be exactly as in the complaint and/or unable to fit all information, please add "see attach". The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lom) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Pharmavite LLC. (Tatro, Rene) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (jtil) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Pharmavite LLC, identifying Pharmavite LLC, Otsuka America, Inc., Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Otsuka Holdings Co., Ltd.. (Tatro, Rene) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Pharmavite LLC. (Tatro, Rene) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Pharmavite LLC. (Tatro, Rene) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27887168 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Pharmavite LLC. (Attorney Rene P Tatro added to party Pharmavite LLC(pty:pla))(Tatro, Rene) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION is a litigant

Latest cases where PHARMAVITE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven Russell Tekosky

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rene P Tatro