This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 16:04:35 (UTC).

PharmacyChecker.com LLC v. National Association of Boards of Pharmacy et al

Case Summary

On 08/13/2019 PharmacyChecker com LLC filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against National Association of Boards of Pharmacy. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth M. Karas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:19-CV-07577

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kenneth M. Karas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PharmacyChecker.com LLC

Defendants

Partnership for Safe Medicines, Inc.

Center for Safe Internet Pharmacies Ltd.

LegitScript LLC

National Association of Boards of Pharmacy

Alliance for Safe Online Pharmacies

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alexandra Shear

Attorney at Bona Law PC

375 Park Avenue, Ste 2607

New York, NY 10152

Aaron Robert Gott

Attorney at Bona Law PC

4275 Executive Square, Ste 200

La Jolla, CA 92037

Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth Weissert

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP

1735 Market St, 51St Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Justin Ward Lamson

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP (NYC)

1675 Broadway, 19Th Floor

New York, NY 10019

Leslie Ellen John

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP

1735 Market St, 51St Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Jay N. Fastow

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP

425 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Barry Werbin

Attorney at Herrick, Feinstein LLP (NYC)

2 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10016

Nicholas Grant Olear Veliky

Attorney at Herrick Feinstein LLP

Two Park Avenue

New York, NY 10016

John Tyler Mills

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

1 Battery Plaza, 28Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Ryan James Sestack

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

1 Battery Plaza, 28Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Mercedes Colwin

Attorney at Gordon & Rees , LLP

1 Battery Plaza,28Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Paul T. Olszowka

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg LLP

One North Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Erik Thomas Koons

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP

1299 Pennsylvania Ave, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Stephen Weissman

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP

1299 Pennsylvania Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Brian E. Casey

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg

700 1St Source Bank Center, 100 N. Michigan

South Bend, IN 46601

Jana Irina Seidl

Attorney at Baker Botts L.L.P.

1299 Pennsylvania Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Timothy Patrick Singer

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP

1299 Pennsylvania Ave, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Rachel Johanna Adcox

Attorney at Axinn, Veltrop & Harkrider LLP

950 F Street Nw, Ste 700

Washington, DC 20004

Cristina Marie Fernandez

Attorney at Axinn, Veltrop & Harkrider LLP

114 West 47Th Street, New York

New York, NY 10036

Jeny Maier

Attorney at Axinn, Veltrop & Harkrider LLP

950 F Street Nw, Ste 700

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

#123

(#123) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #119 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss on behalf of LegitScript. . Document filed by PharmacyChecker.com LLC..(Gott, Aaron) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

#122

(#122) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #119 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss on behalf of LegitScript. . Document filed by LegitScript LLC..(Mills, John) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

#121

(#121) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #119 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss on behalf of LegitScript. . Document filed by LegitScript LLC..(Mills, John) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

#120

(#120) DECLARATION of John Horton in Support re: #119 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss on behalf of LegitScript.. Document filed by LegitScript LLC..(Mills, John) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

#119

(#119) FIRST MOTION to Dismiss on behalf of LegitScript. Document filed by LegitScript LLC..(Mills, John) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

#118

(#118) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #104 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint as to Defendant Alliance for Safe Online Pharmacies. . Document filed by Alliance for Safe Online Pharmacies..(Adcox, Rachel) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#112

***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Aaron Robert Gott to RE-FILE Document #112 Response in Opposition to Motion. ERROR(S): document linked to filing error. NOTE: Re-file and link to document #119 Motion. (ldi) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

106 #1

Declaration of John Horton

#106

(#117) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #106 MOTION to Dismiss on behalf of LegitScript LLC. . Document filed by LegitScript LLC..(Mills, John) Modified on 5/18/2020 (ldi). (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#104

(#118) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #104 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint as to Defendant Alliance for Safe Online Pharmacies. . Document filed by Alliance for Safe Online Pharmacies..(Adcox, Rachel) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#8

(#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Partnership for Safe Medicines, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by PharmacyChecker.com LLC. (Shear, Alexandra) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

#7

(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LegitScript LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by PharmacyChecker.com LLC. (Shear, Alexandra) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

#6

(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Center for Safe Internet Pharmacies Ltd., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by PharmacyChecker.com LLC. (Shear, Alexandra) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alliance for Safe Online Pharmacies, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by PharmacyChecker.com LLC. (Shear, Alexandra) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Association of Boards of Pharmacy, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by PharmacyChecker.com LLC. (Shear, Alexandra) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by PharmacyChecker.com LLC.(Shear, Alexandra) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Shear, Alexandra) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

#1

(#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Partnership for Safe Medicines, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by PharmacyChecker.com LLC. (Shear, Alexandra) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

295 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#123) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #119 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss on behalf of LegitScript. . Document filed by PharmacyChecker.com LLC..(Gott, Aaron) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Aaron Robert Gott to RE-FILE Document #112 Response in Opposition to Motion. ERROR(S): document linked to filing error. NOTE: Re-file and link to document #119 Motion. (ldi) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#122) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #119 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss on behalf of LegitScript. . Document filed by LegitScript LLC..(Mills, John) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#121) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #119 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss on behalf of LegitScript. . Document filed by LegitScript LLC..(Mills, John) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#120) DECLARATION of John Horton in Support re: #119 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss on behalf of LegitScript.. Document filed by LegitScript LLC..(Mills, John) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#119) FIRST MOTION to Dismiss on behalf of LegitScript. Document filed by LegitScript LLC..(Mills, John) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#118) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #104 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint as to Defendant Alliance for Safe Online Pharmacies. . Document filed by Alliance for Safe Online Pharmacies..(Adcox, Rachel) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#117) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #106 MOTION to Dismiss on behalf of LegitScript LLC. . Document filed by LegitScript LLC..(Mills, John) Modified on 5/18/2020 (ldi). (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#116) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #100 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss BY DEFENDANTS. . Document filed by Alliance for Safe Online Pharmacies, Center for Safe Internet Pharmacies Ltd., LegitScript LLC, National Association of Boards of Pharmacy, Partnership for Safe Medicines, Inc...(Koons, Erik) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#115) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #97 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint as to it with Prejudice. . Document filed by Partnership for Safe Medicines, Inc...(John, Leslie) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
120 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Alexandra Shear. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (dnh) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Partnership for Safe Medicines, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by PharmacyChecker.com LLC. (Shear, Alexandra) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LegitScript LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by PharmacyChecker.com LLC. (Shear, Alexandra) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Center for Safe Internet Pharmacies Ltd., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by PharmacyChecker.com LLC. (Shear, Alexandra) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alliance for Safe Online Pharmacies, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by PharmacyChecker.com LLC. (Shear, Alexandra) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Association of Boards of Pharmacy, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by PharmacyChecker.com LLC. (Shear, Alexandra) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by PharmacyChecker.com LLC.(Shear, Alexandra) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Shear, Alexandra) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Alliance for Safe Online Pharmacies, Center for Safe Internet Pharmacies Ltd., LegitScript LLC, National Association of Boards of Pharmacy, Partnership for Safe Medicines, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17423248)Document filed by PharmacyChecker.com LLC.(Shear, Alexandra) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.