This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 05:46:47 (UTC).

PHAM v. COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/21/2019 PHAM filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tim A. Baker and Sarah Evans Barker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04632

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

Presiding Judge

Sarah Evans Barker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAELEE PHAM

Defendants

COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC. d/b/a COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER SOUTH

COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.

COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC. doing business as COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER SOUTH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul J. Cummings

Attorney at HENN HAWORTH CUMMINGS & PAGE

1634 W. Smith Valley Road, Suite B

Greenwood, IN 46142

Defendant Attorneys

Tiaundra Marie Foster

Attorney at OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART, P.C. (Indianapolis)

111 Monument Circle, Suite 4600

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Brandon M. Shelton

Attorney at OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART, P.C. (Indianapolis)

111 Monument Circle, Suite 4600

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#2

#3

#4

#5

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Dismiss

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANTS, COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC. d/b/a COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER SOUTH WITHOUT PREJUDICE - Plaintiff, Malee Pham, by counsel, having filed her #5 Motion to Dismiss of Claims against Defendants, Community Health Network, INC d/b/a Community Surgery Center South, Without Prejudice, and the Court having reviewed said Motion and being duly advised now GRANTS said Motion. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 12/13/2019.(NAD) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Tiaundra Marie Foster on behalf of Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.. (Foster, Tiaundra) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon M. Shelton on behalf of Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.. (Shelton, Brandon) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Plaintiff MAELEE PHAM. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Dismiss)(Cummings, Paul) Modified on 12/2/2019 (CKM). (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC. (REO) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J. Cummings on behalf of Plaintiff MAELEE PHAM. (Cummings, Paul) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Damages and Request for Jury Trial against COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC. d/b/a COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER SOUTH, filed by MAELEE PHAM. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5734083) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Cummings, Paul) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brandon M. Shelton