This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/22/2023 at 06:27:50 (UTC).

PG&E Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 11/12/2020 PG E Corporation was filed as a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-07967

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Haywood S Gilliam, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nott Ruby Youngblood

Ashton Kunde

Jenny Lynn Hansen

Petitioner

Sara Stewart

Appellant

Fire Victim Trustee

Claimants

Edelson PC Claimants

CDG

McNicholas & McNicholas, LLP

Law Office of Paul Mankin, APC Claimants

Attorney Dreyer Babich Buccola Wood Campora, LLP

Ellen Adler

Welty Weaver & Currie Claimants

The Brandi Law Firm

I. B.

C.D. Duckett

Defendant and Claimant

Ellen Adler

Trustee

Office of the U.S. Trustee / SF

Not Classified By Court

Official Committee of Tort Claimants

Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors

Interested Party

Senior Vice Presiden Jason P. Wells

Debtor In Possession

PG&E Corporation

487 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Trustee Attorneys

Marta Elena Villacorta

Cameron Gulden

Jason Blumberg

Lynette C. Kelly

Timothy S. Laffredi

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Chris Bator

Joseph M. Esmont

Kody D.L. Kleber

Robert Alan Julian, Esq.

Catherine E. Woltering

Eric R. Goodman

Paul S. Aronzon

Debtor In Possession Attorneys

John Nolan

Ray C. Schrock

Andriana Georgallas

Katherine B Kohn

Thomas B. Rupp

Peter J. Benvenutti

Tobias S. Keller

David Levine

98 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1632

(#2105) DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #1632 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Robert T Bryson. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order Order Approving Minors Compromise, #2 Standing Order Order to Deposit)(Bryson, Robert) (Filed on 9/20/2023) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

#114

(#2101) DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #114 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document, Order Approving Minors Compromise for L.P., a minor child (Mayra Price, parent) by Mayra Price. (Attachments: #1 Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Account or Annuity for Protected Person)(Silver-Korn, Brandt) (Filed on 9/19/2023) Modified on 9/19/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/19/2023)

2 #3

Notice of Transmission of Motion

2 #2

Court Docket Sheet

2 #1

Certificate of Service, filed by Other Prof. John K. Trotter

#2

1 #4

Docket Sheet

1 #3

Notice of Transmission of Motion

1 #2

Notice of Errata

1 #1

Notice Of Motion

#1

2,153 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2110) DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #114 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,, Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Northern California Law Group PC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Order to Deposit)(Feist, Joseph) (Filed on 9/20/2023) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2109) DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #114 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,, Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Northern California Law Group PC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Order to Deposit)(Feist, Joseph) (Filed on 9/20/2023) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2108) DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #114 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,, Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Northern California Law Group PC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Order to Deposit)(Feist, Joseph) (Filed on 9/20/2023) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2107) DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #114 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,, Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Order Approving Minors Comp W.T. by Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Order to Deposit W.T.)(Magilligan, Donald) (Filed on 9/20/2023) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2106) DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #1632 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Robert T Bryson. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order Order Approving Minors Compromise, #2 Standing Order Order to Deposit)(Bryson, Robert) (Filed on 9/20/2023) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2105) DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #1632 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Robert T Bryson. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order Order Approving Minors Compromise, #2 Standing Order Order to Deposit)(Bryson, Robert) (Filed on 9/20/2023) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2104) DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #114 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document, Order Approving Minors Compromise for D.P., a minor child (Mayra Price, parent) by Mayra Price. (Attachments: #1 Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Account or Annuity for Protected Person)(Silver-Korn, Brandt) (Filed on 9/19/2023) Modified on 9/19/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2103) DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #114 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document, Order to Deposit Money by Jade Kat-Kuoy. (Frantz, James) (Filed on 9/19/2023) Modified on 9/19/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2102) DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #114 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document, Order Approving Compromise by Jade Kat-Kuoy. (Frantz, James) (Filed on 9/19/2023) Modified on 9/19/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2101) DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #114 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document, Order Approving Minors Compromise for L.P., a minor child (Mayra Price, parent) by Mayra Price. (Attachments: #1 Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Account or Annuity for Protected Person)(Silver-Korn, Brandt) (Filed on 9/19/2023) Modified on 9/19/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2,078 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Special Masters Order for Establishment of an Individual Firm Qualified Settlement Fund. (Pollack, Kevin) (Filed on 3/12/2021) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Special Masters Order to Establishment the CDG FVT Qualified Settlement Fund. (Danko, Michael) (Filed on 3/11/2021) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Special Master Case Management Order. (Sieger-Grimm, Susan) (Filed on 2/25/2021) Modified on 2/26/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.: Telephone Conference held on 2/10/2021. Total Time in Court: 9 Minutes. Not Reported. Appellant Attorney: David Morton Trustee Attorney: Matthew Garrettson. Claims Administrator: Cathy Yanni. Special Master: Ellen James. The Court amends the Order of Appointment of Special Master (docket no. #3 ) for the sole purpose of modifying the order to include that all orders issued by the Special Master are to be e-filed on this docket. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/10/2021) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • Docket(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE. Notice is hereby given that a Telephonic Conference has been set for February 10, 2021, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.). This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2021) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Letter from Fire Victim Trust Claims Administrator Cathy Yanni . (Molton, David) (Filed on 12/17/2020) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT re #3 Order Affidavit of Hon. Ellen Sickles James (Ret.) Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455 by Fire Victim Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Molton, David) (Filed on 12/3/2020) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF A SPECIAL MASTER PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. PROC. 53. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 12/2/2020. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2020) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RECOMMENDATION REGARDING MOTION FOR PARTIAL WITHDRAWAL OF REFERENCE re #1 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, filed by Other Prof. John K. Trotter, #2 Court Docket Sheet, #3 Notice of Transmission of Motion)(bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2020) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION FOR PARTIAL WITHDRAWAL OF THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF APPOINTING THE HON. ELLEN SICKLES JAMES (RET.) AS SPECIAL MASTER PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. PROC. 53 FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Case number 19-30088. File received. Filed by Fire Victim Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Notice Of Motion, #2 Notice of Errata, #3 Notice of Transmission of Motion, #4 Docket Sheet)(bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2020) Modified on 11/13/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less