This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2021 at 17:32:49 (UTC).

PG&E Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 11/10/2020 PG E Corporation was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-07912

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Haywood S Gilliam, Jr

 

Party Details

Appellant

Pacific Investment Management Company LLC

Respondent

Elliott Management Corporation

Trustee

Office of the U.S. Trustee / SF

Not Classified By Court

Official Committee of Tort Claimants

Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors

Interested Party

Senior Vice Presiden Jason P. Wells

Debtor In Possession

PG&E Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Michael C. Hefter

Attorney at HOGAN LOVELLS US LLP

390 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10017

David Philip Simonds

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Trustee Attorneys

Cameron Gulden

Attorney at Office of the United States Trustee

300 Booth Street, Room 3009

Reno, NV 89509

Jason Blumberg

Attorney at Office of the U.S.Trustee

501 I Street, #7-500

Sacramento, CA 95814

Lynette C. Kelly

Attorney at Office of he United States Trustee

Phillip J. Burton Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue 5Th Floor, #05-0153

San Francisco, CA 94102

Marta Elena Villacorta

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

450 Golden Gate Avenue, Suite 05-0153

San Francisco, CA 94102

Timothy S. Laffredi

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Trustee-San Jose

280 South First Street, Suite 268

San Jose, CA 95113

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Joseph M. Esmont

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

127 Public Square #2000

Cleveland, OH 44147

Robert Alan Julian, Esq.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

600 Montgomery Street, Suite 3100

San Francisco, CA 94111-2806

Chris Bator

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

3200 National City Center, 1900 East 9Th Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

Kody D.L. Kleber

Attorney at Baker and Hostetler LLP

811 Main Street, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77005

Catherine E. Woltering

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

Paul S. Aronzon

Attorney at Milbank LLP

2029 Century Park East, 33Rd Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90067

James Cornell Behrens

Attorney at Milbank LLP

2029 Century Park East, 33Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Debtor In Possession Attorneys

Andriana Georgallas

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153

Peter J. Benvenutti

Attorney at Keller & Benvenutti LLP

650 California St., 19Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

David Levine

Attorney at Groom Law Group, Chartered

1701 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw #1200

Washington, DC 20006

Tobias S. Keller

Attorney at Keller & Benvenutti

650 California Street, Suite 1900, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

John Nolan

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP

767 Fifth Avenue

New Yor, NY 10153

Ray C. Schrock

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153

45 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#9

#7

8 #1

Appendix

#8

#6

5 #1

Exhibit A, Proposed Order

#5

4 #1

Exhibit A

#4

3 #2

Single PDF Documents for Record

3 #1

Certificate of Record

#3

#2

1 #2

Single PDF Notice of Appeal

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART (docket no. 4 in case no. 20-cv- 07865-HSG) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION OF REORGANIZED DEBTORS TO CONSOLIDATE CERTAIN BANKRUPTCY APPEALS. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 2/5/2021. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2021) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint Opening Brief of Appellants RSA Noteholders (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Simonds, David) (Filed on 1/22/2021) Modified on 1/25/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #6 Stipulation Changing Briefing Schedule. Appellant Brief due by 1/22/2021; Appellee Brief due by 2/26/2021; and Appellant Reply Brief due by 3/19/2021. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2020) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Changing Briefing Schedule filed by Elliott Management Corporation, PG&E Corporation, and Pacific Investment Management Company LLC. (Tsai, Rocky) (Filed on 12/11/2020) Modified on 12/14/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Response re #4 Notice (Other) / Appellants' Joint Limited Opposition to Administrative Motion of Reorganized Debtors to Consolidate Certain Bankruptcy Appeals byElliott Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Proposed Order)(Tsai, Rocky) (Filed on 12/11/2020) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by PG&E Corporation Notice of Filing of Administrative Motion of Reorganized Debtors to Consolidate Certain Bankruptcy Appeals (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rupp, Thomas) (Filed on 12/7/2020) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Record forwarded to USCA re appeal #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Record, #2 Single PDF Documents for Record)(bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2020) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - Bankruptcy Case (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2020) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-30088. File received. Filed by Pacific Investment Management Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Court Certificate of Mailing, #2 Single PDF Notice of Appeal)(bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2020) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Elliott Management Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Pacific Investment Management Company LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PG&E CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Levine