This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/03/2021 at 06:57:47 (UTC).

PG&E Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 07/28/2020 PG E Corporation was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-05171

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Haywood S Gilliam, Jr

 

Party Details

Appellant

22 Camp Fire Victims and Class Action Claimants

Claimants

Official Committee of Tort Claimants

Fire Victims Trust

Debtor In Possession

PG&E Corporation

Not Classified By Court

Office of the U.S. Trustee / SF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Larry Allan Peluso

Claimant Attorneys

Robert Alan Julian, Esq.

Joel S. Miliband

Debtor In Possession Attorneys

Ray C. Schrock

Peter J. Benvenutti

Jane Kim

Stephen Karotkin

Tobias S. Keller

Theodore Tsekerides

Jessica Liou

 

Court Documents

3 #1

Notice of Errata Re: Notice of Direct Appeal to Court of Appeals

#3

#2

1 #13

Docket Report Part 10

1 #12

Docket Report Part 9

1 #11

Docket Report Part 8

1 #10

Docket Report Part 7

1 #9

Docket Report Part 6

1 #8

Docket Report Part 5

1 #7

Docket Report Part 4

1 #6

Docket Report Part 3

1 #5

Docket Report Part 2

1 #4

Docket Report Part 1

1 #3

Certificate of Mailing

1 #2

Order

1 #1

Notice of Appeal

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2021
  • Docket(#6) ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. TERMINATING AS MOOT this appeal and closing case in light of Appellants' direct appeal to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals and Appellants' failure to respond to the Court's prior order directing them to file a status report. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2021) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • Docket(#5) ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DIRECTING Appellants TO SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be terminated as moot in light of Appellants' direct appeal to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals and Appellants' failure to respond to the Court's prior order directing them to file a status report. Appellants shall file a statement of two pages or less by 5:00 p.m. on March 31, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2021) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • Docket(#4) ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DIRECTING the Appellants to file a status report by March 15, 2021 of no more than two pages indicating the status of the request for direct appeal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2021) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Errata Re: Notice of Direct Appeal to Court of Appeals by 22 Camp Fire Victims and Class Action Claimants. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Errata Re: Notice of Direct Appeal to Court of Appeals)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - Bankruptcy Case (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-30088-DM. File received. Filed by22 Camp Fire Victims and Class Action Claimants. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Order, #3 Certificate of Mailing, #4 Docket Report Part 1, #5 Docket Report Part 2, #6 Docket Report Part 3, #7 Docket Report Part 4, #8 Docket Report Part 5, #9 Docket Report Part 6, #10 Docket Report Part 7, #11 Docket Report Part 8, #12 Docket Report Part 9, #13 Docket Report Part 10)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less