This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/17/2020 at 11:03:34 (UTC).

PG PUBLISHING COMPANY and BLOCK COMMUNICATIONS, INC et al v. PITTSBURGH COMMISSION ON HUMAN RELATIONS

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 PG PUBLISHING COMPANY and BLOCK COMMUNICATIONS, INC filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against PITTSBURGH COMMISSION ON HUMAN RELATIONS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is J. Nicholas Ranjan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01222

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Nicholas Ranjan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BLOCK COMMUNICATIONS, INC.

PG PUBLISHING COMPANY and BLOCK COMMUNICATIONS, INC

PG PUBLISHING COMPANY

Defendant

PITTSBURGH COMMISSION ON HUMAN RELATIONS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Patrick K. Cavanaugh

Attorney at Del Sole Cavanaugh

Three Ppg Place, Suite 600

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Ronald Gary London

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

1301 K St Nw, Suite 500 - East

Washington, DC 20005

Robert Corn-Revere

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

1301 K St Nw, Suite 500 East

Washington, DC 20005

Courtney Turco DeThomas

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

1301 K St Nw, Suite 500 East

Washington, DC 20005

Zachary N. Gordon

Attorney at Del Sole Cavanuagh Stroyd

Three Ppg Place, Suite 600

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Defendant Attorneys

Michael E. Kennedy

Attorney at City of Pittsburgh, Department of Law

313 City-County Building, 414 Grant Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Julie E. Koren

Attorney at City of Pittsburgh Law Department

414 Grant Street, # 313

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Lawrence D. Kerr

Attorney at Tremba, Kinney, Greiner & Kerr LLC

302 West Otterman Street

Greensburg, PA 15601

Mark R Hamilton

Attorney at Tremba Kinney Greiner & Kerr LLC

302 West Otterman Street

Greensburg, PA 15601

Wendy Kobee

Attorney at City of Pittsburgh Department of Law

Room 313 City-County Building, 414 Grant Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Chelsea Forbes

302 W Otterman Street

Greensburg, PA 15601

Yvonne Schlosberg Hilton

Attorney at City of Pittsburgh Department of Law

414 Grant Street, 313 City-County Building

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Emily McNally

Attorney at City of Pittsburgh

313 City-County Building, 414 Grant Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

#35

#34

#32

#30

#29

28 #2

Exhibit B

#28

25 #1

Proposed Order

#25

1 #8

Exhibit 7

1 #7

Exhibit 6

1 #6

Exhibit 5

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE of Appearance by Yvonne Schlosberg Hilton on behalf of PITTSBURGH COMMISSION ON HUMAN RELATIONS. (Hilton, Yvonne) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Early Neutral Evaluation. Kenneth Benson is appointed as an early neutral evaluator. Evaluation to be completed by 1/7/2021. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 10/14/2020. (av) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER. All discovery in this case is hereby STAYED until the resolution of the #25 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 10/14/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference held on 10/14/2020. (Court Reporter: none) (av) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • Docket(#31) ORDER. The Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference is hereby RESCHEDULED for 10/14/2020 at 03:30 PM before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 10/13/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) STIPULATION selecting ADR process by PITTSBURGH COMMISSION ON HUMAN RELATIONS. (Kerr, Lawrence) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kerr, Lawrence) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Errata re #26 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by PITTSBURGH COMMISSION ON HUMAN RELATIONS. Reason for Correction: Minor typographical errors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Kerr, Lawrence) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #25 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Response to Motion due by 10/28/2020. Brief shall not exceed 20 pages. Reply due by 11/4/2020. Brief shall not exceed 10 pages. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 10/2/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) BRIEF in Support re #25 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by PITTSBURGH COMMISSION ON HUMAN RELATIONS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Kerr, Lawrence) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for attorney Courtney DeThomas to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 8/25/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for attorney Courtney DeThomas to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by BLOCK COMMUNICATIONS, INC., PG PUBLISHING COMPANY. Receipt APAWDC-5852040 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order) (sdp) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for attorney Robert Corn-Revere to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #6 Motion for attorney Ronald London to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 8/21/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for attorney Ronald London to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-5850640) by BLOCK COMMUNICATIONS, INC., PG PUBLISHING COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order) (London, Ronald) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for attorney Robert Corn-Revere to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-5850557) by BLOCK COMMUNICATIONS, INC., PG PUBLISHING COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order) (Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by BLOCK COMMUNICATIONS, INC., PG PUBLISHING COMPANY. (Gordon, Zachary) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary N. Gordon on behalf of BLOCK COMMUNICATIONS, INC., PG PUBLISHING COMPANY. (Gordon, Zachary) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Complaint,. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 8/26/2020. (jv) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to PITTSBURGH COMMISSION ON HUMAN RELATIONS (jv) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against PITTSBURGH COMMISSION ON HUMAN RELATIONS (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5843544), filed by PG PUBLISHING COMPANY and BLOCK COMMUNICATIONS, INC, BLOCK COMMUNICATIONS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7) (jv) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PG PUBLISHING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chelsea Forbes

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily McNally

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark R. Hamilton