This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/13/2019 at 07:06:34 (UTC).

PFU Limited v. Data Scape Limited

Case Summary

On 08/14/2019 PFU Limited filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Data Scape Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jon S. Tigar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-04810

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jon S. Tigar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PFU Limited

Defendant

Data Scape Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dylan James Raife

Attorney at Morrison Foerster, LLP

707 Wilshire Blvd., 60Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Matthew Clayton Callahan

Attorney at Morrison and Foerster LLP

707 Wilshire Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Ryan James Malloy

Attorney at Morrison and Foerster LLP

707 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 6000

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3543

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/7/2020 by 5:00 PM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2020 2:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2019) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

16 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#16

(#16) ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 9/5/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

#14

(#14) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by PFU Limited.. (Malloy, Ryan) (Filed on 8/28/2019) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#13

(#13) Refund Status re #8 Application for Refund APPROVED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

12 #1

cmp

#12

(#12) REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patent (cc:Register) of Patents and Trademarks. (Attachments: #1 cmp)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2019) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

#11

(#11) Summons Issued as to Data Scape Limited. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2019) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

#10

(#10) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/7/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2019 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

#8

(#8) Application for Refund, Receipt Number 261UABVG by PFU Limited. (Malloy, Ryan) (Filed on 8/15/2019) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Dylan James Raife (Raife, Dylan) (Filed on 8/14/2019) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Clayton Callahan (Callahan, Matthew) (Filed on 8/14/2019) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan James Malloy (Malloy, Ryan) (Filed on 8/14/2019) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interested Entities by PFU Limited identifying Corporate Parent Fujitsu Limited, Other Affiliate Fujitsu Computer Products of America, Inc., Other Affiliate PFU America, Inc. for PFU Limited. (Malloy, Ryan) (Filed on 8/14/2019) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

#3

(#3) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by PFU Limited identifying Corporate Parent Fujitsu Limited for PFU Limited. (Malloy, Ryan) (Filed on 8/14/2019) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Malloy, Ryan) (Filed on 8/14/2019) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

1 #12

Exhibit L

1 #11

Exhibit K

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/7/2020 by 5:00 PM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2020 2:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2019) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 9/5/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • (#15) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2019) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by PFU Limited.. (Malloy, Ryan) (Filed on 8/28/2019) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Refund Status re #8 Application for Refund APPROVED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patent (cc:Register) of Patents and Trademarks. (Attachments: #1 cmp)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2019) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Summons Issued as to Data Scape Limited. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2019) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/7/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2019 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • (#9) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/29/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Application for Refund, Receipt Number 261UABVG by PFU Limited. (Malloy, Ryan) (Filed on 8/15/2019) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Dylan James Raife (Raife, Dylan) (Filed on 8/14/2019) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Clayton Callahan (Callahan, Matthew) (Filed on 8/14/2019) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan James Malloy (Malloy, Ryan) (Filed on 8/14/2019) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Interested Entities by PFU Limited identifying Corporate Parent Fujitsu Limited, Other Affiliate Fujitsu Computer Products of America, Inc., Other Affiliate PFU America, Inc. for PFU Limited. (Malloy, Ryan) (Filed on 8/14/2019) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by PFU Limited identifying Corporate Parent Fujitsu Limited for PFU Limited. (Malloy, Ryan) (Filed on 8/14/2019) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Malloy, Ryan) (Filed on 8/14/2019) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Data Scape Limited ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13611907.). Filed byPFU Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Civil Cover Sheet)(Malloy, Ryan) (Filed on 8/14/2019) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Data Scape Limited is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dylan J Raife

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan James Malloy