Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/18/2020 at 08:20:00 (UTC).

Pfeister v. RSUI Indemnity Company

Case Summary

On 05/19/2020 Pfeister filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against RSUI Indemnity Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Laurel Beeler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-03387

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Laurel Beeler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

Joanna L. Pfeister

San Francisco, CA 94102

Defendant

RSUI Indemnity Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Chad A. Westfall

Attorney at Musick Peeler & Garrett LLP

601 California St, Ste 1250

San Francisco, CA 94108-2817

David A. Tartaglio

Attorney at Musick Peeler & Garrett LLP

624 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3383

 

Court Documents

36 #1

Proposed Order

#36

(#36) OBJECTIONS to re #28 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge pursuant to FRCP 72(b) by Joanna L. Pfeister. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pfeister, Joanna) (Filed on 7/15/2020) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

34 #1

Proposed Order

#34

(#34) OBJECTIONS to re #28 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Joanna L. Pfeister. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pfeister, Joanna) (Filed on 7/15/2020) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

33 #1

Proposed Order

#33

(#33) MOTION Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge pursuant FRCP 72(b) re #28 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Joanna L. Pfeister. Responses due by 7/29/2020. Replies due by 8/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pfeister, Joanna) (Filed on 7/15/2020) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

#32

(#32) Request for Judicial Notice in support of #31 MOTION to Strike #29 Jury Demand filed by RSUI Indemnity Company. (Related document(s) #31 , #29 ) (Westfall, Chad) (Filed on 7/13/2020) Modified on 7/14/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#31

(#31) MOTION to Strike #29 Jury Demand filed by RSUI Indemnity Company. Motion Hearing set for 8/20/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 7/27/2020. Replies due by 8/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Westfall, Chad) (Filed on 7/13/2020) Modified on 7/14/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#29

(#29) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Joanna L. Pfeister. (Pfeister, Joanna) (Filed on 7/10/2020) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by RSUI Indemnity Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Westfall, Chad) (Filed on 5/19/2020) Modified on 5/26/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/19/2020)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by RSUI Indemnity Company re #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #1 Notice of Removal, (Westfall, Chad) (Filed on 5/19/2020) Modified on 5/26/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/19/2020)

#3

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by RSUI Indemnity Company re #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #1 Notice of Removal, (Westfall, Chad) (Filed on 5/19/2020) Modified on 5/26/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/19/2020)

#2

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by RSUI Indemnity Company re #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #1 Notice of Removal, (Westfall, Chad) (Filed on 5/19/2020) Modified on 5/26/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/19/2020)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

Answer to Removed Complaint (See Doc No. #1 -3) by RSUI Indemnity Company. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2020) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) OBJECTIONS to re #28 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge pursuant to FRCP 72(b) by Joanna L. Pfeister. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pfeister, Joanna) (Filed on 7/15/2020) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. [err201] Re: #34 Objection filed by Joanna L. Pfeister. Incorrect PDF attached. Please re-file in its entirety. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15 /2020) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) CLERKS NOTICE SETTING MOTION HEARING. Motion Hearing as to #33 MOTION Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge pursuant FRCP 72(b) re #28 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for 8/20/2020 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III.Case participants may also receive an email invitation from the court with different information which should be followed.All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1614698626?pwd=eXlQRThFajBjT0tieVBaYWpjMjFodz09Meeting ID: 161 469 8626Password: 546984Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) OBJECTIONS to re #28 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Joanna L. Pfeister. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pfeister, Joanna) (Filed on 7/15/2020) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) MOTION Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge pursuant FRCP 72(b) re #28 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Joanna L. Pfeister. Responses due by 7/29/2020. Replies due by 8/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pfeister, Joanna) (Filed on 7/15/2020) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Request for Judicial Notice in support of #31 MOTION to Strike #29 Jury Demand filed by RSUI Indemnity Company. (Related document(s) #31 , #29 ) (Westfall, Chad) (Filed on 7/13/2020) Modified on 7/14/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MOTION to Strike #29 Jury Demand filed by RSUI Indemnity Company. Motion Hearing set for 8/20/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 7/27/2020. Replies due by 8/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Westfall, Chad) (Filed on 7/13/2020) Modified on 7/14/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MOTION to Bifurcate the issues Liability and Damages filed by Joanna L. Pfeister. Motion Hearing set for 8/20/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 7/24/2020. Replies due by 7/31/2020. (Pfeister, Joanna) (Filed on 7/10/2020) Modified on 7/13/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Joanna L. Pfeister. (Pfeister, Joanna) (Filed on 7/10/2020) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER denying #12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 7/7/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certificate of Interested Entities by Joanna L. Pfeister identifying Corporate Parent RSUI Indemnity Company for Joanna L. Pfeister. (Pfeister, Joanna) (Filed on 5/26/2020) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 ADR Certification by Plaintiff, #2 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons)(Pfeister, Joanna) (Filed on 5/26/2020) Modified on 5/27/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/20/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Removed Complaint (See Doc No. #1 -3) by RSUI Indemnity Company. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2020) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by RSUI Indemnity Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Westfall, Chad) (Filed on 5/19/2020) Modified on 5/26/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by RSUI Indemnity Company re #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #1 Notice of Removal, (Westfall, Chad) (Filed on 5/19/2020) Modified on 5/26/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/2/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2020) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities [Civil LR 3-15] by RSUI Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent RSUI Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Alleghany Corporation, Corporate Parent Alleghany Insurance Holdings, LLC for RSUI Indemnity Company. (Westfall, Chad) (Filed on 5/19/2020) Modified on 5/26/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement [FRCP 7.1(a)] by RSUI Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent RSUI Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Alleghany Corporation, Corporate Parent Alleghany Insurance Holdings, LLC for RSUI Indemnity Company. re #1 Notice of Removal (Westfall, Chad) (Filed on 5/19/2020) Modified on 5/26/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL Under 28 USC Sections 1332 and 1441(b) [Diversity Jurisdiction] from San Francisco County Superior COurt. Their case number is CGC-20-584225. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-14484636). Filed by RSUI Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Westfall, Chad) (Filed on 5/19/2020) Modified on 5/26/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RSUI INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chad A. Westfall

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David A Tartaglio