This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 10:46:55 (UTC).

Pfeiffer v. Alamo Group Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/26/2019 Pfeiffer filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Alamo Group Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert M. Levy and Eric N. Vitaliano. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01739

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Robert M. Levy

Presiding Judge

Eric N. Vitaliano

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Milton Pfeiffer

Defendant

Alamo Group Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William Fields

Attorney at Levi & Korsinsky LLP

55 Broadway, Ste 10Th Floor, New York

New York, NY 10006

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Letter by Milton Pfeiffer (Fields, William) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#10

(#10) Proposed Scheduling Order by Milton Pfeiffer (Fields, William) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER DISMISSING CASE, Plaintiff Milton Pfeiffer dismisses this action with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(l)(A)(i). Notwithstanding the voluntary dismissal, Plaintiff and his counsel expressly reserve theright to apply for an award of attorneys' fees and expenses. Defendant reserves all rights, arguments, and defenses, including the right to oppose any application for attorneys' fees and expenses. (Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 4/09/2019) C/M (Galeano, Sonia) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Milton Pfeiffer (Fields, William) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Milton Pfeiffer. Alamo Group Inc. served on 3/28/2019, answer due 4/18/2019. (Fields, William) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#6

(#6) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

#5

(#5) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Alamo Group Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. by Milton Pfeiffer (Fields, William) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. by Milton Pfeiffer (Fields, William) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Alamo Group Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11323732 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Milton Pfeiffer. (Fields, William) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: In light of #11 plaintiff's letter indicating that he does not plan to file a motion for attorney's fees, the Court's scheduling order, dated April 18, 2019, is withdrawn. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 6/14/2019. (Siegel, Max) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Letter by Milton Pfeiffer (Fields, William) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: #10 The parties' proposed briefing schedule is so ordered, subject to the Court's bundling rule, Individual Rule III.D. Plaintiff shall serve his motion on defendant on or before June 14, 2019. Defendant shall serve its opposition on plaintiff on or before August 14, 2019. Plaintiff shall serve his reply, if any, and file all motion papers on ECF, as well as deliver a courtesy copy to chambers, on or before September 18, 2019. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 4/18/2019. (Siegel, Max) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Proposed Scheduling Order by Milton Pfeiffer (Fields, William) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER DISMISSING CASE, Plaintiff Milton Pfeiffer dismisses this action with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(l)(A)(i). Notwithstanding the voluntary dismissal, Plaintiff and his counsel expressly reserve theright to apply for an award of attorneys' fees and expenses. Defendant reserves all rights, arguments, and defenses, including the right to oppose any application for attorneys' fees and expenses. (Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 4/09/2019) C/M (Galeano, Sonia) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Milton Pfeiffer (Fields, William) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Milton Pfeiffer. Alamo Group Inc. served on 3/28/2019, answer due 4/18/2019. (Fields, William) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Alamo Group Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Proposed Summons. by Milton Pfeiffer (Fields, William) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. by Milton Pfeiffer (Fields, William) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Alamo Group Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11323732 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Milton Pfeiffer. (Fields, William) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Adamo Group Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Fields