This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/12/2021 at 04:39:13 (UTC).

Pezzo et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 12/10/2020 Pezzo filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Air Liquid Systems Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is J. Paul Oetken. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-10433

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Paul Oetken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carol A. Pezzo

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Claimants

Morse TEC LLC

ViacomCBS Inc.

Goulds Pumps, Incorporated

Gardner Denver, Inc.

Alfa Laval, Inc.

Graybar Electric Company Inc.

Air & Liquid Systems Corporation

Resillo Press Pad Co.

Ford Motor Company

Kamco Supply Corp.

Crane Co.

Warren Pumps LLC

Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.

Whirlpool Corporation

Ametek, Inc.

General Electric Company

John E. Potente & Sons, Inc.

f

Genuine Parts Company

20 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nathaniel Naftali Falda

Attorney at Maune Raichle Hartley French & Mudd, LLC

150 W. 30Th Street, Ste 201

New York, NY 10001

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Christopher Patrick Hannan

Attorney at Smith Abbot, LLP

Three New York Plaza

New York, NY 10004

Maria C. Carlucci

Attorney at Segal, mcCambridge, Singer & Mahoney, Ltd.

830 Third Avenue, Suite 400

New York, NY 10022

Steven Thomas Corbin

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP (Water St)

77 Water Street, 21St Floor

New York, NY 10005

John Samuel Howarth

Attorney at Wilbraham, Lawler & Buba

140 Broadway; 46Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Tara Lynne Pehush

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP (NYC)

599 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022-6030

Nicole Melody Kozin

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP (NYC)

599 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022-6030

David James Goodearl

Attorney at Leader & Berkon

630 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Philip Justin O'Rourke

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP (Water St)

77 Water Street, 21St Floor

New York, NY 10005

Frank Jordan

Attorney at Mendes & Mount, LLP

750 7Th Ave, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10019

Other Attorneys

David P. Schaffer

Attorney at Malaby & Bradley, LLC

150 Broadway, Suite 600

New York, NY 10038

Elizabeth Anne Weill

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla, LLP (PA)

1700 Market Street, Suite 1418

Philadelphia, PA 19103-3907

Lawrence Gable Lee

Attorney at Lynch Daskal Emery, LLP

137 West 25Th Street, 5Th Floor

New York, NY 10001

 

Court Documents

#35

#34

#33

22 #5

C

22 #4

Exhibit B

22 #3

Exhibit A

22 #2

Memorandum of Law in Support

22 #1

Motion for Remand

#22

1 #30

Exhibit Exhibit R to Sargent Declaration - MIL-M-15071D

1 #28

Exhibit Exhibit P to Sargent Declaration - MIL-M-15071C

1 #27

Exhibit Exhibit O to Sargent Declaration - MIL-B-15071A

1 #25

Exhibit Exhibit M to Sargent Declaration - Gen Spec for Mach S-1

1 #7

Exhibit G - Vol. 2 to Plaintiff Domenic Pezzo's Deposition

1 #6

Exhibit F - Vol. 1 to Plaintiff Domenic Pezzo's Deposition

1 #5

Exhibit E - Ametek's Filed Answer with Cross-Claims

1 #4

Exhibit D - Plaintiffs' Second Amended Summons and Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Summons and Complaint

83 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by FMC Corporation..(Carlucci, Maria) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Alfa Laval AB for Alfa Laval, Inc.. Document filed by Alfa Laval, Inc...(Carlucci, Maria) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) DECLARATION of Frank Jordan in Opposition re: #22 MOTION to Remand .. Document filed by Ametek, Inc...(Jordan, Frank) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #22 MOTION to Remand . . Document filed by Carol A. Pezzo, Domenic Pezzo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H).(Falda, Nathaniel) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David P. Schaffer on behalf of Qualitex Company..(Schaffer, David) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maria C. Carlucci on behalf of FMC Corporation..(Carlucci, Maria) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maria C. Carlucci on behalf of Alfa Laval, Inc...(Carlucci, Maria) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #22 MOTION to Remand . . Document filed by Ametek, Inc...(Jordan, Frank) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) DECLARATION of Frank Jordan in Opposition re: #22 MOTION to Remand .. Document filed by Ametek, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Initial Fact Sheet and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - NYSCEF System User Manual, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Chart A, #4 Exhibit 4 - Plaintiff's Deposition Transcript, #5 Exhibit 5 - Maune Rachel Amended Standard Asbestos Complaint No. 2, #6 Exhibit 6 - Discovery Response Excerpt from Brown v. Amchen Products, #7 Exhibit 7 - Discovery Response Excerpt from Maguire v. A.C. & S, #8 Exhibit 8 - Discovery Response Excerpt from Levy v. A.O. Smith).(Jordan, Frank) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Hanson Permanente Cement, Inc. for Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.. Document filed by Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc...(O'Rourke, Philip) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent IMO Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Colfax Fluid Handling LLC, Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation for IMO Industries, Inc.. Document filed by IMO Industries, Inc...(Goodearl, David) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David James Goodearl on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc...(Goodearl, David) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Anne Weill on behalf of Navistar, Inc...(Weill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal served on All Parties on December 10, 2020. Document filed by Ametek, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed on State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal to Federal Court Annexed as Exhibit A to State Court Filing, #3 Exhibit Confirmation Notice from NYSCEF confirming transmission of papers to All Counsel of Record via E-mail, #4 Exhibit E-mail to Counsel for All Parties Attaching Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to Federal Court and Exhibit A thereto - Notice of Removal to Federal Court).(Jordan, Frank) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ametek, Inc...(Jordan, Frank) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Jordan, Frank) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 190223-2020. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22978033).Document filed by Ametek, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiffs' Answers to NYCAL Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs' First Amended Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Plaintiffs' Second Amended Summons and Complaint, #5 Exhibit E - Ametek's Filed Answer with Cross-Claims, #6 Exhibit F - Vol. 1 to Plaintiff Domenic Pezzo's Deposition, #7 Exhibit G - Vol. 2 to Plaintiff Domenic Pezzo's Deposition, #8 Exhibit H - Declaration of Thomas Deeney, #9 Exhibit I - Declaration of RADM David P. Sargent, Jr. USN (Ret.), #10 Exhibit Exhibit A to Sargent Declaration - Bureau of Ships Manual, #11 Exhibit Exhibit B to Sargent Declaration - Journal of Industrial Hygiene and Toxicology, #12 Exhibit Exhibit C to Sargent Declaration - Chapter 39, #13 Exhibit Exhibit D to Sargent Declaration - Gen Specs, #14 Exhibit Exhibit E to Sargent Declaration - Military Standards, #15 Exhibit Exhibit F1 to Sargent Declaration - Fletcher Class Schedules Pt. 1, #16 Exhibit Exhibit F2 to Sargent Declaration - Fletcher Class Schedules Pt. 2, #17 Exhibit Exhibit G to Sargent Declaration - Sumner Gearing Schedules, #18 Exhibit Exhibit H to Sargent Declaration - Essex Class Insulation and Standards, #19 Exhibit Exhibit I to Sargent Declaration - 1979 Letter, #20 Exhibit Exhibit J1 to Sargent Declaration - 1942 Manual Correspondence, #21 Exhibit Exhibit J2 to Sargent Declaration - 1959 Manual Correspondence, #22 Exhibit Exhibit J3 to Sargent Declaration - 1966 Manual Correspondence, #23 Exhibit Exhibit K to Sargent Declaration - MIL-I-15024, #24 Exhibit Exhibit L to Sargent Declaration - MIL-P-15024B, #25 Exhibit Exhibit M to Sargent Declaration - Gen Spec for Mach S-1, #26 Exhibit Exhibit N to Sargent Declaration - MIL-B-15071, #27 Exhibit Exhibit O to Sargent Declaration - MIL-B-15071A, #28 Exhibit Exhibit P to Sargent Declaration - MIL-M-15071C, #29 Exhibit Exhibit Q to Sargent Declaration - MIL-T-15071B, #30 Exhibit Exhibit R to Sargent Declaration - MIL-M-15071D).(Jordan, Frank) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Alfa Laval Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where MORSE TEC LLC FKA BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORGWARNER CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY INC. is a litigant