This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/28/2022 at 10:31:40 (UTC).

Petty v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/29/2022 Petty filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Experian Information Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas W. Thrash, Jr and J. Clay Fuller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-03487

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas W. Thrash, Jr

Referral Judge

J. Clay Fuller

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sandy Jean Petty

Defendant

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher Neil Armor

Attorney at Armor Law, LLC

P.O. Box 451328

Atlanta, GA 31145

Matthew Thomas Berry

Attorney at Berry & Associates, P.C.

Suite 600, 2751 Buford Highway

Atlanta, GA 30324

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Persons by Sandy Jean Petty. (Berry, Matthew) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal w/o prejudice AS TO MIDLAND MORTGAGE CO., A DIVISION OF MIDFIRST BANK, ONLY filed by Sandy Jean Petty (Berry, Matthew) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #3 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (ceo) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal w/o prejudice AS TO MIDLAND MORTGAGE CO., A DIVISION OF MIDFIRST BANK, ONLY filed by Sandy Jean Petty (Berry, Matthew) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerks Notation re #2 Certificate of Interested Persons. Reviewed and approved by Judge Thrash. (jeh) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Persons by Sandy Jean Petty. (Berry, Matthew) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Sandy Jean Petty. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12030320) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceo) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Neil Armor

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew T. Berry