This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:46:15 (UTC).

Petromilli v. May

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Petromilli filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against May. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James G. Carr and George J. Limbert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01119

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James G. Carr

Referral Judge

George J. Limbert

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Decio R. Petromilli

Mansfield, OH 44901

Respondent

Warden Harold May

Mansfield, OH 44901

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Maura O'Neill Jaite

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General - Criminal Justice Section

16Th Floor, 150 East Gay Street

Columbus, OH 43215

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Exhibit - Appeal Court Documents

1 #1

Cover Letter

#3

(#3) Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (B,R) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#7

(#7) Amended Attorney Appearance by Maura O'Neill Jaite filed by on behalf of Harold May. (Jaite, Maura) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#1

(#1) Petition under 28 USC 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a person in state custody. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Decio R. Petromilli. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Exhibit - Appeal Court Documents, #3 Exhibit - Appeal Court Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (B,R) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit - Appeal Court Documents

#2

(#2) Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Petitioner Decio R. Petromilli. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Demand Statement, #2 Affidavit)(B,R) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

2 #2

Affidavit

2 #1

Inmate Demand Statement

#4

(#4) Order: granting petitioner's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #2 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert on 5/20/2019.(S,AA) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#5

(#5) Order: The respondent shall show cause on or before sixty (60) days of the date of this order, why the petition should not be granted and the writ as prayed for issued. Petitioner to file traverse thirty (30) days thereafter and respondent to file response fifteen (15) days thereafter ( re #1 ). Judge James G. Carr on 5/31/19. (C,D) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#6

(#6) Attorney Appearance by Maura O'Neill Jaite filed by on behalf of Harold May. (Jaite, Maura) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Amended Attorney Appearance by Maura O'Neill Jaite filed by on behalf of Harold May. (Jaite, Maura) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Attorney Appearance by Maura O'Neill Jaite filed by on behalf of Harold May. (Jaite, Maura) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of #3 , #1 , #5 and Automatic Reference of Administrative Action, Order, mailed to Decio R. Petromilli, #A683-793, Richland Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 8107, Mansfield, OH 44901, and Harold May, Warden, Richland Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 8107, Mansfield, OH 44901 on 6/3/19. (C,D) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge James G. Carr on 5/31/19. (C,D) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order: The respondent shall show cause on or before sixty (60) days of the date of this order, why the petition should not be granted and the writ as prayed for issued. Petitioner to file traverse thirty (30) days thereafter and respondent to file response fifteen (15) days thereafter ( re #1 ). Judge James G. Carr on 5/31/19. (C,D) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of #4 order on motion to proceed in forma pauperis mailed to Petitioner, Decio R. Petromilli, #A683-793, Richland Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 8107, Mansfield, OH 44901; and to Respondent, Harold May, Warden, Richland Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 8107, Mansfield, OH 44901 on 5/20/2019. (S,AA) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order: granting petitioner's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #2 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert on 5/20/2019.(S,AA) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (B,R) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (B,R) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Judge James G. Carr assigned to case, (B,R) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Petitioner Decio R. Petromilli. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Demand Statement, #2 Affidavit)(B,R) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Petition under 28 USC 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a person in state custody. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Decio R. Petromilli. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Exhibit - Appeal Court Documents, #3 Exhibit - Appeal Court Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (B,R) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.