This case was last updated from PACER on 01/20/2020 at 17:24:53 (UTC).

Petroleos De Venezuela S.A. et al v. MUFG Union Bank, N.A. et al

Case Summary

On 10/29/2019 Petroleos De Venezuela S A filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MUFG Union Bank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Polk Failla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-10023

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine Polk Failla

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

PDVSA Petroleo S.A.

Petroleos De Venezuela S.A.

PDV Holding, Inc.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

MUFG Union Bank, N.A.

GLAS Americas LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Kurt Wayne Hansson

Attorney at Paul Hastings LLP (NY)

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

James B Worthington

Attorney at Paul Hastings LLP (NY)

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

James Robert Bliss

Attorney at Paul Hastings LLP (NY)

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Michael Julian Gottlieb

Attorney at Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP

1875 K Street Nw, 20006

Washington, DC 20015

Tariq Mundiya

Attorney at Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP (NY)

787 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Jeffrey B. Korn

Attorney at Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP (NY)

787 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Nathan Philip Eimer

Attorney at Eimer Stahl LLP

224 South Michigan Avenue, Suite 1100

Chicago, IL 60604

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Luke Sobota

Three Crowns (Us) Llp, 3000 K Street Nw, Ste 101

Washington, DC 20007-5109

Walter Rieman

Attorney at Paul Weiss (NY)

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Matthew S Salerno

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP (NY)

885 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Jonathan Hillel Hurwitz

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP (NYC)

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Shane Donnelly Avidan

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Christopher J. Clark

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP (NY)

885 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Zachary Kaye

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Exhibit A - Constitution of the Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela, Art. 303

#1

(#36) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint,, addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Jonathan Hurwitz dated December 12, 2019. Document filed by GLAS Americas LLC, MUFG Union Bank, N.A..(Hurwitz, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit D - National Assembly Resolution dated Oct. 15, 2019

1 #2

Exhibit B - National Assembly Resolution dated Feb. 13, 2019

1 #3

Exhibit C - National Assembly Resolution dated Sept. 27, 2016

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MUFG Union Bank, N.A., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by PDV Holding, Inc., PDVSA Petroleo S.A., Petroleos De Venezuela S.A.. (Hansson, Kurt) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to GLAS Americas LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by PDV Holding, Inc., PDVSA Petroleo S.A., Petroleos De Venezuela S.A.. (Hansson, Kurt) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#4

(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hansson, Kurt) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#5

(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by PDV Holding, Inc., PDVSA Petroleo S.A., Petroleos De Venezuela S.A..(Hansson, Kurt) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#45

(#45) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Zachary Kaye on behalf of GLAS Americas LLC, MUFG Union Bank, N.A.. (Kaye, Zachary) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#40

(#40) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,., COUNTERCLAIM against PDV Holding, Inc., PDVSA Petroleo S.A., Petroleos De Venezuela S.A.. Document filed by MUFG Union Bank, N.A., GLAS Americas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PDVSA Offering Circular (2016), #2 Exhibit B - Supplement to Offering Circular, #3 Exhibit C - PDVSA 2020 Bond Indenture, #4 Exhibit D - Pledge and Security Agreement, #5 Exhibit E - Ad Hoc Press Release)(Clark, Christopher) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

40 #3

Exhibit C - PDVSA 2020 Bond Indenture

40 #1

Exhibit A - PDVSA Offering Circular (2016)

#44

(#44) ANSWER to #40 Counterclaim. Document filed by PDV Holding, Inc..(Korn, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

40 #2

Exhibit B - Supplement to Offering Circular

40 #5

Exhibit E - Ad Hoc Press Release

40 #4

Exhibit D - Pledge and Security Agreement

#43

(#43) ANSWER to #40 Counterclaim. Document filed by PDVSA Petroleo S.A., Petroleos De Venezuela S.A..(Worthington, James) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Zachary Kaye on behalf of GLAS Americas LLC, MUFG Union Bank, N.A.. (Kaye, Zachary) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) ANSWER to #40 Counterclaim. Document filed by PDV Holding, Inc..(Korn, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) ANSWER to #40 Counterclaim. Document filed by PDVSA Petroleo S.A., Petroleos De Venezuela S.A..(Worthington, James) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) ORDER APPROVING WITHDRAWAL F THREE CROWNS LLP AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS re: #41 Notice (Other) filed by GLAS Americas LLC, MUFG Union Bank, N.A., IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The Application to Withdraw as Counsel by Luke Sobota and the law firm of Three Crowns LLP is hereby GRANTED. Luke Sobota is hereby withdrawn and discharged as counsel for the Defendants in this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT: Luke Sobota, whose email address is luke.sobota@threecrownsllp.com, is removed from the mailing matrix and from receiving CM/ECF electronic filings in this case. Attorney Luke Sobota terminated. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/20/2019) (rj) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) NOTICE of Application of Withdrawal. Document filed by GLAS Americas LLC, MUFG Union Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sobota, Luke) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,., COUNTERCLAIM against PDV Holding, Inc., PDVSA Petroleo S.A., Petroleos De Venezuela S.A.. Document filed by MUFG Union Bank, N.A., GLAS Americas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PDVSA Offering Circular (2016), #2 Exhibit B - Supplement to Offering Circular, #3 Exhibit C - PDVSA 2020 Bond Indenture, #4 Exhibit D - Pledge and Security Agreement, #5 Exhibit E - Ad Hoc Press Release)(Clark, Christopher) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew S Salerno on behalf of GLAS Americas LLC, MUFG Union Bank, N.A.. (Salerno, Matthew) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher J. Clark on behalf of GLAS Americas LLC, MUFG Union Bank, N.A.. (Clark, Christopher) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) ORDER granting #36 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (GLAS Americas LLC answer due 12/18/2019; MUFG Union Bank, N.A. answer due 12/18/2019.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/13/2019) (rro) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint,, addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Jonathan Hurwitz dated December 12, 2019. Document filed by GLAS Americas LLC, MUFG Union Bank, N.A..(Hurwitz, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MUFG Union Bank, N.A.. (pne) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to GLAS Americas LLC. (pne) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by PDV Holding, Inc., PDVSA Petroleo S.A., Petroleos De Venezuela S.A..(Hansson, Kurt) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hansson, Kurt) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to GLAS Americas LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by PDV Holding, Inc., PDVSA Petroleo S.A., Petroleos De Venezuela S.A.. (Hansson, Kurt) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MUFG Union Bank, N.A., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by PDV Holding, Inc., PDVSA Petroleo S.A., Petroleos De Venezuela S.A.. (Hansson, Kurt) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against GLAS Americas LLC, MUFG Union Bank, N.A.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17855670)Document filed by Petroleos De Venezuela S.A., PDV Holding, Inc., PDVSA Petroleo S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Constitution of the Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela, Art. 303, #2 Exhibit B - National Assembly Resolution dated Feb. 13, 2019, #3 Exhibit C - National Assembly Resolution dated Sept. 27, 2016, #4 Exhibit D - National Assembly Resolution dated Oct. 15, 2019)(Hansson, Kurt) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.