This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:43:41 (UTC).

Petrochem Transport, Inc. v. Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Petrochem Transport, Inc filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth M Hoyt. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00036

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kenneth M Hoyt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Petrochem Transport, Inc.

Defendant

Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Antonio Ortiz

Attorney at Jordan, Holzer, & Ortiz P.C.

500 N. Shoreline

Corpus Christi, TX 78471

Shelby A Jordan

Attorney at Jordan, Holzer & Ortiz, PC

500 N Shoreline Blvd, Ste 900

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

Defendant Attorneys

Russell Carter Lewis

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP

910 Louisiana St

Houston, TX 77002

Benjamin Eric Gonsoulin

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP

One Shell Plaza, 910 Louisiana St

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Petrochem Transport, Inc., filed.(Jordan, Shelby) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

6 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC, filed.(Gonsoulin, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/31/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(MelissaMorganadi, 4) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Motion to Consolidate by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gonsoulin, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #2

Exhibit B

#7

(#7) ORDER granting Motion to Consolidate Cases: Lead Case No. 4:19-cv-1460 and Member Case No. 4:19-cv-5029, 4:20-cv-36, 4:20-cv-212, 4:20-cv-119, 4:20-cv-216.Case assign to Judge Kenneth Hoyt. Judge David Hittner no longer assigned to the case, Case terminated on 1/30/2020(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

6 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC, filed.(Gonsoulin, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #6

Exhibit F

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 215th JDC, case number 2019-86563 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23888580) filed by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Lewis, Russell) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit A

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting Motion to Consolidate Cases: Lead Case No. 4:19-cv-1460 and Member Case No. 4:19-cv-5029, 4:20-cv-36, 4:20-cv-212, 4:20-cv-119, 4:20-cv-216.Case assign to Judge Kenneth Hoyt. Judge David Hittner no longer assigned to the case, Case terminated on 1/30/2020(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Motion to Consolidate by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gonsoulin, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Petrochem Transport, Inc., filed.(Jordan, Shelby) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC, filed.(Gonsoulin, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC, filed.(Gonsoulin, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/31/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(MelissaMorganadi, 4) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 215th JDC, case number 2019-86563 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23888580) filed by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Lewis, Russell) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.