This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/05/2021 at 07:58:38 (UTC).

PETRILLO v. OWENS BROCKWAY GLASS CONTAINER, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/04/2021 PETRILLO filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against OWENS BROCKWAY GLASS CONTAINER, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kim R. Gibson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00016

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kim R. Gibson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JASON PETRILLO

Defendant

OWENS BROCKWAY GLASS CONTAINER, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeremy M. Cerutti

Attorney at Karpf, Karpf & Cerutti, P.C.

3331 Street Road, Suite 128, Two Greenwood Square

Bensalem, PA 19020

Allison A. Barker

Attorney at Karpf, Karpf & Cerutti, P.C.

3331 Street Road,, Two Greenwood Square, Suite 128

Bensalem, PA 19020

Ari R. Karpf

Attorney at Karpf, Karpf & Cerutti, P.C.

3331 Street Road, Suite 128, Two Greenwood Square

Bensalem, PA 19020

Allison A Barker

Attorney at Karpf, Karpf, & Cerutti, P.C.

3331 Street Road, Two Greenwood Square, Suite 128

Bensalem, PA 19020

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew Maunz

Attorney at Jackson Lewis

1001 Liberty Ave, Suite 1000

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Marla N. Presley

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

1001 Liberty Avenue, Suite 1000

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

2 #1

Summons Packet

#3

#4

#5

5 #1

*Restricted*

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Maunz on behalf of OWENS BROCKWAY GLASS CONTAINER, INC.. (Maunz, Andrew) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by OWENS BROCKWAY GLASS CONTAINER, INC.. (Presley, Marla) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Defenses by OWENS BROCKWAY GLASS CONTAINER, INC.. (Presley, Marla) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JASON PETRILLO. OWENS BROCKWAY GLASS CONTAINER, INC. waiver sent on 1/29/2021, answer due 3/30/2021. (Karpf, Ari) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE that the instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (krh) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 4:21-cv-00158. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to transfer this case to Western District of PA; Clerk directed to close this case. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 2/3/2021. (case closed)(lg) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Allison A. Barker on behalf of Jason Petrillo (Barker, Allison) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Owens Brockway Glass Container, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (nr) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Owens Brockway Glass Container, Inc. ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number 5451058), filed by Jason Petrillo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Owens-Brockway Glass Container, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marla N. Presley