This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/29/2021 at 08:47:47 (UTC).

Petrillo v. Owens Brockway Glass Container, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 Petrillo filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Owens Brockway Glass Container, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew W. Brann. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00158

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew W. Brann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jason Petrillo

Defendant

Owens Brockway Glass Container, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JEREMY M. CERUTTI

Attorney at KARPF, KARPF & CERUTTI, P.C.

3331 Street Road, Suite 128, Two Greenwood Square

Bensalem, PA 19020

Ari R. Karpf

Attorney at Karpf, Karpf & Cerutti, P.C.

3331 Street Road, Two Greenwood Square, Suite 128

Bensalem, PA 19020

Allison A. Barker

Attorney at Karpf, Karpf & Cerutti, P.C.

3331 Street Road,, Two Greenwood Square, Suite 128

Bensalem, PA 19020

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

2 #1

Summons Packet

#3

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Karpf is notified that the case in Middle District of PA has been TRANSFERRED to Western District of PA purusant to 2/3/2021 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE and this case has been opened in Western District of PA as case 3:21-cv-0001. The Middle District of PA case is CLOSED; the waiver form will need to be filed in Western District of PA. (lg) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Jason Petrillo. Owens Brockway Glass Container, Inc. waiver sent on 1/29/2021, answer due 3/30/2021. (Karpf, Ari) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Case transferred from Pennsylvania Middle has been opened in Western District of Pennsylvania as case 3:21-cv-00016, filed 02/04/2021. (jw) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Case electronically transferred to Eastern District of Pennsylvania. (lg) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to transfer this case to Western District of PA; Clerk directed to close this case. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 2/3/2021. (case closed)(lg) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Allison A. Barker on behalf of Jason Petrillo (Barker, Allison) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Owens Brockway Glass Container, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (nr) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Owens Brockway Glass Container, Inc. ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number 5451058), filed by Jason Petrillo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Owens-Brockway Glass Container, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JEREMY M. CERUTTI

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALLISON AILEEN BARKER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARI R. KARPF