This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:29:31 (UTC).

Petrillo et al v. Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Complany

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Petrillo filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Nationwide Property Casualty Insurance Complany. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02231

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Armand Petrillo

Colleen Petrillo

Defendant

Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Complany

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dianna E. Louder

Attorney at Schmittinger & Rodriguez, P.A.

414 S State St., P.O. Box 497

Dover, DE 19903

William D. Fletcher, Jr.

Attorney at Schmittinger & Rodriguez, P.A.

414 S State St., P.O. Box 497

Dover, DE 19903

Defendant Attorney

Louis J. Rizzo, Jr.

Attorney at Reger Rizzo & Darnall LLP

1523 Concord Pike, Suite 200

Wilmington, DE 19803

 

Court Documents

8 #2

Certificate of Compliance Certificate of Service of Plaintiffs' Response in

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#8

(#8) RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Amend/Correct #3 Answer to Complaint Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer filed by Armand Petrillo. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Compliance Certificate of Service of Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion Requesting Leave to File Amended Answer and Proposed Order)(Fletcher, William) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#7

(#7) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Complany filed by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Complany. (Rizzo, Louis) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

6 #4

Exhibit Exhibit B

6 #3

Exhibit Exhibit A

6 #2

Certificate of Service

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#6

(#6) MOTION to Amend/Correct #3 Answer to Complaint Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer - filed by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Complany. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Rizzo, Louis) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

5 #3

Exhibit Exhibit A

5 #2

Certificate of Service to Response of Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Response of Defendant Nationwide Proper

#5

(#5) RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Complany. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Response of Defendant Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Certificate of Service to Response of Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Rizzo, Louis) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

4 #2

Certificate of Compliance Certificate of Service of Plaintiffs Motion to Remand

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#4

(#4) MOTION to Remand to State Court - filed by Armand Petrillo. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Compliance Certificate of Service of Plaintiffs Motion to Remand Removed Complaint and Proposed Order)(Fletcher, William) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Complany.(Rizzo, Louis) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Amend/Correct #3 Answer to Complaint Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer filed by Armand Petrillo. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Compliance Certificate of Service of Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion Requesting Leave to File Amended Answer and Proposed Order)(Fletcher, William) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Complany filed by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Complany. (Rizzo, Louis) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Amend/Correct #3 Answer to Complaint Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer - filed by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Complany. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Rizzo, Louis) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Complany. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Response of Defendant Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Certificate of Service to Response of Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Rizzo, Louis) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Remand to State Court - filed by Armand Petrillo. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Compliance Certificate of Service of Plaintiffs Motion to Remand Removed Complaint and Proposed Order)(Fletcher, William) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Complany.(Rizzo, Louis) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from Superior Court, Case Number K19C-11-018 NEP (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2794444)- filed by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Complany. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.