1:20-CV-02929
05/16/2020
Disposed - Other Disposed
Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Andrea R. Wood
Lucas Petitgout
Riddell Sports Group, Inc.
EB Sports Corp.
BRG Sports Holdings Corp.
All American Sports Corporation
Riddell, Inc.
BRG Sports, Inc.
EASTONLL Sports, Inc.
BRG Holdings Corp.
William T Gibbs
Docket(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: The case having been terminated pursuant to MDL (2323) Conditional Transfer Order filed 6/3/2020 #7 , all pending motions and hearing dates are stricken. Mailed notice. (dal, ) (Entered: 06/04/2020)
[-] Read LessDocketELECTRONIC Acknowledgement of case transferred to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania as case 2:20-cv-02620, filed 05/29/2020. (bg, ) (Entered: 06/04/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) TRANSFERRED to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania the electronic record (rp, ) (Entered: 06/04/2020)
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL (2323) Conditional Transfer Order filed 6/3/2020 (rp, ) (Entered: 06/04/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to Eastern District of Pennsylvania.(rp, ) (Entered: 06/04/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket11, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (rp, ) (Entered: 05/18/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial status hearing set for 7/23/2020 at 9:15 AM. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. The Court expects to hold the status hearing telephonically. Parties will be contacted closer to the hearing date with a call-in number and additional details. Mailed notice. (dal, ) (Entered: 05/18/2020)
[-] Read LessDocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, ) (Entered: 05/18/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gibbs, William) (Entered: 05/16/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Lucas Petitgout; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17018391.(Gibbs, William) (Entered: 05/16/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020 (rc, ) (Entered: 05/18/2020)
[-] Read Less