This case was last updated from PACER on 01/24/2021 at 10:46:24 (UTC).

Peticos v. Oral and Maxillofacial Surgery Associates PA

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 Peticos filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Oral and Maxillofacial Surgery Associates PA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy M Cain. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-04106

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy M Cain

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shawn Peticos

Defendant

Oral and Maxillofacial Surgery Associates PA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Martin Allan Ramey

Attorney at Rhine Law Firm PC

1612 Military Cutoff Road, Suite 300

Wilmington, NC 28403

Joel Robert Rhine

Attorney at Rhine Law Firm PC

1612 Military Cutoff Road, Suite 300

Wilmington, NC 28403

James Christopher Sproat

Attorney at HawkLaw PA

607 Pendleton Street, Suite 101

Greenville, SC 29607

Defendant Attorney

Thomas Chase Samples

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC

15 South Main Street, Suite 700

Greenville, SC 29601

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Oral and Maxillofacial Surgery Associates PA. (Samples, Thomas) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

#20

(#20) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Oral and Maxillofacial Surgery Associates PA. Response to Motion due by 1/19/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Samples, Thomas) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#17

(#17) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Shawn Peticos.Reply to Response to Motion due by 1/6/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Sproat, James) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

14 #1

Affidavit

#14

(#14) First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joel Robert Rhine ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9545142) by Shawn Peticos. Response to Motion due by 1/4/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)No proposed order.(Sproat, James) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

13 #1

Affidavit

#13

(#13) First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Martin Allan Ramey ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9545122) by Shawn Peticos. Response to Motion due by 1/4/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)No proposed order.(Sproat, James) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#12

(#12) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Shawn Peticos.(Sproat, James) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

10 #2

Exhibit A - Emails between counsel

10 #1

Affidavit in support

#10

(#10) First Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to, #7 MOTION to Dismiss (Response to Motion due by 12/29/2020.) Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) by Shawn Peticos. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in support)No proposed order.(Sproat, James) (Additional attachment added on 12/10/2020: as provided by filing user: #2 Exhibit A - Emails between counsel). Modified on 12/10/2020: to add text (consent), to add link ( #7 ), to remove duplicate text (affidavit affidavit) (kmca). (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by James Christopher Sproat on behalf of Shawn Peticos (Sproat, James) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

8 #1

State Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Spartanburg County. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(Samples, Thomas) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

7 #1

Memo in Support

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Oral and Maxillofacial Surgery Associates PA. Response to Motion due by 12/16/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(Samples, Thomas) Modified on 12/3/2020 to correct motion relief (alew, ). (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Remand to Patrick Graves, Morgan & Morgan. (kmca) (Main Document 4 replaced on 11/30/2020: to correct typo) (kmca). (Entered: 11/30/2020)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Oral and Maxillofacial Surgery Associates PA.(kmca) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Oral and Maxillofacial Surgery Associates PA. (Samples, Thomas) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) TEXT ORDER granting #20 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Replies due by 1/13/2021. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy M Cain on 1/4/21.(kmca) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Oral and Maxillofacial Surgery Associates PA. Response to Motion due by 1/19/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Samples, Thomas) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER #16 Affidavit in Opposition. Reason: re-filed by attorney to correct event. Corrected Filing Document Number #17 Response in Opposition. Re-filed same day as original filing: 12/30/20. (kmca) Modified on 12/30/2020: to correct link #17 (kmca). (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Shawn Peticos.Reply to Response to Motion due by 1/6/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Sproat, James) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.; granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Martin Allan Ramey and Joel Robert Rhine for the plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 12/21/20.(alew, ) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joel Robert Rhine ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9545142) by Shawn Peticos. Response to Motion due by 1/4/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)No proposed order.(Sproat, James) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Martin Allan Ramey ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9545122) by Shawn Peticos. Response to Motion due by 1/4/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)No proposed order.(Sproat, James) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Shawn Peticos.(Sproat, James) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) TEXT ORDER granting #10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's response to #7 Motion to Dismiss is due by 12/30/20. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy M Cain on 12/10/20.(kmca) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) First Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to, #7 MOTION to Dismiss (Response to Motion due by 12/29/2020.) Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) by Shawn Peticos. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in support)No proposed order.(Sproat, James) (Additional attachment added on 12/10/2020: as provided by filing user: #2 Exhibit A - Emails between counsel). Modified on 12/10/2020: to add text (consent), to add link ( #7 ), to remove duplicate text (affidavit affidavit) (kmca). (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by James Christopher Sproat on behalf of Shawn Peticos (Sproat, James) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Spartanburg County. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(Samples, Thomas) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Oral and Maxillofacial Surgery Associates PA. Response to Motion due by 12/16/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(Samples, Thomas) Modified on 12/3/2020 to correct motion relief (alew, ). (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED #4 Notice Of Remand, to Patrick Graves, pgraves@forthepeople.com. ***DOCUMENT MAILED #4 Notice Of Remand. placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Patrick Graves, Morgan & Morgan, 170 Meeting Street, Ste 110, Charleston, SC 29401. (kmca) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Remand to Patrick Graves, Morgan & Morgan. (kmca) (Main Document 4 replaced on 11/30/2020: to correct typo) (kmca). (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Oral and Maxillofacial Surgery Associates PA.(kmca) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-42-03041. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-9493925), filed by Oral and Maxillofacial Surgery Associates PA. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(kmca) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas Chase Samples