Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/29/2021 at 12:24:23 (UTC).

Pete's Trattoria Canto III LLC v. Grubhub, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 Pete's Trattoria Canto III LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Grubhub, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Therese Wiley Dancks and Lawrence E. Kahn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00365

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Therese Wiley Dancks

Presiding Judge

Lawrence E. Kahn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pete's Trattoria Canto III LLC doing business as Pete's Trattoria

Defendant

Grubhub, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David P. Antonucci

Attorney at Office of David P. Antonucci

12 Public Square, Bonadio Building

Watertown, NY 13601

Defendant Attorney

Tamar S. Wise

Attorney at Cozen, O'Connor Law Firm - NY Office

277 Park Avenue, 19Th Floor

New York, NY 10172

 

Court Documents

9 #5

Oath on Admission

9 #4

Proposed Order

9 #3

Certificate of Good Standing from New Jersey

9 #2

Petition for Admission by Meredith C. Slawe

9 #1

Declaration of Sponsor Tamar S. Wise for Meredith C. Slawe -

#9

(#9) MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Meredith C. Slawe Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5517399. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sponsor Tamar S. Wise for Meredith C. Slawe -, #2 Petition for Admission by Meredith C. Slawe, #3 Certificate of Good Standing from New Jersey, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Oath on Admission) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Wise, Tamar) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

8 #5

Oath on Admission

8 #4

Proposed Order

8 #3

Certificate of Good Standing from New Jersey

8 #2

Petition for Admission by Michael W. McTigue Jr.

8 #1

Declaration of Sponsor Tamar S. Wise for Michael W. McTigue Jr.

#8

(#8) MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael W. McTigue Jr. Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5517338. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sponsor Tamar S. Wise for Michael W. McTigue Jr., #2 Petition for Admission by Michael W. McTigue Jr., #3 Certificate of Good Standing from New Jersey, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Oath on Admission) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Wise, Tamar) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#6

(#6) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Request extension of time to and including June 4, 2021. Plaintiff consents to this request. filed by Grubhub, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 5/21/2021 Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Wise, Tamar) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Tamar S. Wise on behalf of Grubhub, Inc. (Wise, Tamar) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint wit h Civil Cover Sheet and Supporting Papers served on Amy Lesch on April 14, 2021, filed by Pete's Trattoria Canto III LLC. (Antonucci, David) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

#3

(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 6/28/2021 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. All conferences are conducted by telephone. Plaintiff's attorney will initiate the call (unless the Court directs differently) and shall contact Judge Dancks' Chambers at 315-234-8618 (a dedicated line solely for telephone conferences) once all parties are on the line. Counsel may use a teleconferencing service for assistance initiating conference calls to the Court. For cases involving pro se parties, the Court will initiate the call for the Rule 16 Conference. Pro se parties are instructed to provide the Court with a telephone number where they may be reached for a conference call. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/21/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr) Modified on 4/5/2021 (sg, ). (Entered: 03/31/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Grubhub, Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5476041) filed by Pete's Trattoria Canto III LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Meredith Slawe, Esq.. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 5/13/2021. (sg) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael McTigue, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 5/13/2021. (sg) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Meredith C. Slawe Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5517399. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sponsor Tamar S. Wise for Meredith C. Slawe -, #2 Petition for Admission by Meredith C. Slawe, #3 Certificate of Good Standing from New Jersey, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Oath on Admission) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Wise, Tamar) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael W. McTigue Jr. Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5517338. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sponsor Tamar S. Wise for Michael W. McTigue Jr., #2 Petition for Admission by Michael W. McTigue Jr., #3 Certificate of Good Standing from New Jersey, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Oath on Admission) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Wise, Tamar) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Grubhub, Inc. time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint extended to 6/4/2021. The telephone Rule 16 Conference and associated deadlines remain as currently set. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 4/30/2021. (sg) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Request extension of time to and including June 4, 2021. Plaintiff consents to this request. filed by Grubhub, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 5/21/2021 Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Wise, Tamar) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Tamar S. Wise on behalf of Grubhub, Inc. (Wise, Tamar) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • Docket***Answer due date updated for Grubhub, Inc. answer due 5/5/2021. (khr) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint wit h Civil Cover Sheet and Supporting Papers served on Amy Lesch on April 14, 2021, filed by Pete's Trattoria Canto III LLC. (Antonucci, David) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 6/28/2021 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. All conferences are conducted by telephone. Plaintiff's attorney will initiate the call (unless the Court directs differently) and shall contact Judge Dancks' Chambers at 315-234-8618 (a dedicated line solely for telephone conferences) once all parties are on the line. Counsel may use a teleconferencing service for assistance initiating conference calls to the Court. For cases involving pro se parties, the Court will initiate the call for the Rule 16 Conference. Pro se parties are instructed to provide the Court with a telephone number where they may be reached for a conference call. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/21/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr) Modified on 4/5/2021 (sg, ). (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Grubhub, Inc. (khr) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Grubhub, Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5476041) filed by Pete's Trattoria Canto III LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GRUBHUB INC. is a litigant