This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/21/2020 at 08:52:44 (UTC).

Peterson v. Union Pacific Railroad Company

Case Summary

On 07/23/2020 Peterson filed a Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act lawsuit against Union Pacific Railroad Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Laurie Smith Camp and Susan M. Bazis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-00293

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Laurie Smith Camp

Referral Judge

Susan M. Bazis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Troy W. Peterson

Defendant

Union Pacific Railroad Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jayson D. Nelson

Attorney at HUNEGS, LENEAVE LAW FIRM - NEBRASKA

6035 Binney Street

Omaha, NE 68104

Randal W. LeNeave

Attorney at HUNEGS, LENEAVE LAW FIRM - MINNESOTA

1000 Twelve Oaks Center Drive, Suite 101

Wayzata, MN 55391

Paul A. Banker

Attorney at HUNEGS, LENEAVE LAW FIRM - MINNESOTA

1000 Twelve Oaks Center Drive, Suite 101

Wayzata, MN 55391

Defendant Attorney

William M. Lamson, Jr.

Attorney at LAMSON, DUGAN LAW FIRM

10306 Regency Parkway Drive

Omaha, NE 68114-3743

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Randal W. LeNeave on behalf of Plaintiff Troy W. Peterson.(LeNeave, Randal) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 10/5/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Union Pacific Corporation for Union Pacific Railroad Company. by Attorney William M. Lamson, Jr. on behalf of Defendants Union Pacific Railroad Company, Union Pacific Corporation.(Lamson, William) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Union Pacific Railroad Company (Lamson, William) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company on 7/27/2020. (LeNeave, Randal) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (TCL) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (LeNeave, Randal) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Union Pacific Railroad Company ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4202334), by Attorney Randal W. LeNeave on behalf of Troy Peterson (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LeNeave, Randal) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Randal W. LeNeave on behalf of Plaintiff Troy W. Peterson.(LeNeave, Randal) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 10/5/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Union Pacific Corporation for Union Pacific Railroad Company. by Attorney William M. Lamson, Jr. on behalf of Defendants Union Pacific Railroad Company, Union Pacific Corporation.(Lamson, William) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Union Pacific Railroad Company (Lamson, William) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company on 7/27/2020. (LeNeave, Randal) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (TCL) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • Docket(#3) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (TCL) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (LeNeave, Randal) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Union Pacific Railroad Company ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4202334), by Attorney Randal W. LeNeave on behalf of Troy Peterson (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LeNeave, Randal) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Union Pacific Railroad Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul Anthony Banker