This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/25/2021 at 07:15:58 (UTC).

Peterson v. Sutter Medical Foundation et al

Case Summary

On 06/26/2021 Peterson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Sutter Medical Foundation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas S. Hixson and William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-04908

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Thomas S. Hixson

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Defendants

Laurie Rose Lubiano

Michael Bishop

Sutter Medical Foundation

Kristina Lawson

Sutter Bay Hospitals, dba Alta Bates Summit Medical Center

Hedy Chang

Richard Fantozzi

Neil Stollman

Ronald Lewis

Eden Medical Center

Cathy Lozano

Felix Yip

Randy Hawkins

Sharon Levine

Sutter East Bay Medical Foundation

Rod Perry

Dev Gnanedev

Linda Whitney

Phillip Rich

Denise Pines

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Kevin John mirch

Attorney at Mirch Law Firm

750 B Street#2500

San Diego, CA 92101

Marie C. Mirch

Attorney at Mirch Law Firm, LLP

1180 Rosecrans St#104-552

San Diego, CA 92106

 

Court Documents

16 #1

Declaration of Marie Mirch

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

9 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#9

#7

#6

#5

#4

#2

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Relief from Scheduling Order and Extend time to Serve Summons and Complaint re #5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case filed by Ralph Peterson. Responses due by 8/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Marie Mirch)(Mirch, Marie) (Filed on 8/24/2021) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ralph Peterson. Hedy Chang served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. (mirch, Kevin) (Filed on 8/24/2021) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ralph Peterson. Kristina Lawson served on 7/13/2021, answer due 8/3/2021. (mirch, Kevin) (Filed on 8/24/2021) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ralph Peterson. Sharon Levine served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. (mirch, Kevin) (Filed on 8/24/2021) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ralph Peterson. Rod Perry served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. (mirch, Kevin) (Filed on 8/24/2021) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ralph Peterson. Phillip Rich served on 7/13/2021, answer due 8/3/2021. (mirch, Kevin) (Filed on 8/24/2021) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ralph Peterson. Neil Stollman served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. (mirch, Kevin) (Filed on 8/24/2021) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 07/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2021) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2021) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ralph Peterson.. (mirch, Kevin) (Filed on 7/16/2021) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Michael Bishop, Hedy Chang, Eden Medical Center, Richard Fantozzi, Dev Gnanedev, Randy Hawkins, Howard Krauss, Kristina Lawson, Sharon Levine, Ronald Lewis, Cathy Lozano, Laurie Rose Lubiano, Asif Mahmood, Rod Perry, Denise Pines, Phillip Rich, Evelyn "Gerrie" Schipske, Neil Stollman, Sutter Bay Hospitals, dba Alta Bates Summit Medical Center, Sutter East Bay Medical Foundation, Sutter Medical Foundation, Richard Thorp, Eserick Watkins, Linda Whitney, Jamie Wright. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2021) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2021) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Civil Cover Sheet by Ralph Peterson . (mirch, Kevin) (Filed on 6/29/2021) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Civil Cover Sheet missing. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #1 Complaint filed by Ralph Peterson (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2021) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/12/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2021) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (mirch, Kevin) (Filed on 6/26/2021) (Entered: 06/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16117675.). Filed byRalph Peterson. (mirch, Kevin) (Filed on 6/26/2021) (Entered: 06/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUTTER EAST BAY MEDICAL FOUNDATION is a litigant

Latest cases where EDEN MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where Sutter Medical Foundation is a litigant

Latest cases where SUTTER BAY HOSPITALS is a litigant