This case was last updated from PACER on 11/07/2019 at 06:39:09 (UTC).

Peterson v. LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners et al

Case Summary

On 11/06/2019 a Civil Right - Other Civil Right case was filed by Peterson against LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00376

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronald A. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher Peterson

Defendants

Rob Seale

LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners

Kendall Morgan

Tyler Ragan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gary R. Buckles

Po Box 771

Poteau, OK 74953

Defendant Attorneys

Michael L. Carr

Attorney at Collins Zorn & Wagner, PC

429 Ne 50Th St, Second Flr

Oklahoma City, OK 73105-1815

Ambre C. Gooch

Attorney at Collins Zorn & Wagner, PC

429 Ne 50Th St, Second Flr

Oklahoma City, OK 73105-1815

James L. Gibbs, II

Attorney at Goolsby Proctor Heefner & Gibbs, PC

701 N Broadway, Ste 400

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners, Rob Seale (Gooch, Ambre) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#13

(#13) ANSWER with Jury Demand to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint, ) by Rob Seale (Carr, Michael) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#12

(#12) ANSWER with Jury Demand to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint, ) by LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners (Carr, Michael) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint, ) by Tyler Ragan(in his official capacity), Tyler Ragan(personally) (Gibbs, James) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint, ) by Kendall Morgan(in his official capacity), Kendall Morgan(personally) (Gibbs, James) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#9

(#9) STATUS REPORT by LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners, Kendall Morgan(in his official capacity), Kendall Morgan(personally), Tyler Ragan(in his official capacity), Tyler Ragan(personally), Rob Seale (Gibbs, James) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION by LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners, Kendall Morgan(in his official capacity), Kendall Morgan(personally), Tyler Ragan(in his official capacity), Tyler Ragan(personally), Rob Seale (Gibbs, James) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#7

(#7) JURY DEMAND by LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners, Kendall Morgan(in his official capacity), Kendall Morgan(personally), Tyler Ragan(in his official capacity), Tyler Ragan(personally), Rob Seale (Gibbs, James) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ambre C. Gooch on behalf of LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners, Rob Seale (Gooch, Ambre) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael L. Carr on behalf of LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners, Rob Seale (Carr, Michael) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James L. Gibbs, II on behalf of Kendall Morgan(in his official capacity), Kendall Morgan(personally), Tyler Ragan(in his official capacity), Tyler Ragan(personally) (Gibbs, James) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

2 #7

Exhibit 7 - Summons - BOCC

2 #6

Exhibit 6 - Summons - Ragan

2 #5

Exhibit 5 - Summons - Morgan

2 #4

Exhibit 4 - Summons - Seale

2 #3

Exhibit 3 - Summons - County Clerk

2 #2

Exhibit 2 - Petition

2 #1

Exhibit 1 - OSCN Docket

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners, Rob Seale (Gooch, Ambre) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER with Jury Demand to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint, ) by Rob Seale (Carr, Michael) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER with Jury Demand to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint, ) by LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners (Carr, Michael) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint, ) by Tyler Ragan(in his official capacity), Tyler Ragan(personally) (Gibbs, James) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint, ) by Kendall Morgan(in his official capacity), Kendall Morgan(personally) (Gibbs, James) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STATUS REPORT by LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners, Kendall Morgan(in his official capacity), Kendall Morgan(personally), Tyler Ragan(in his official capacity), Tyler Ragan(personally), Rob Seale (Gibbs, James) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION by LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners, Kendall Morgan(in his official capacity), Kendall Morgan(personally), Tyler Ragan(in his official capacity), Tyler Ragan(personally), Rob Seale (Gibbs, James) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) JURY DEMAND by LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners, Kendall Morgan(in his official capacity), Kendall Morgan(personally), Tyler Ragan(in his official capacity), Tyler Ragan(personally), Rob Seale (Gibbs, James) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ambre C. Gooch on behalf of LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners, Rob Seale (Gooch, Ambre) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael L. Carr on behalf of LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners, Rob Seale (Carr, Michael) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James L. Gibbs, II on behalf of Kendall Morgan(in his official capacity), Kendall Morgan(personally), Tyler Ragan(in his official capacity), Tyler Ragan(personally) (Gibbs, James) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEES Paid in Full on 11/6/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1314989 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal, ) by Kendall Morgan(in his official capacity), Kendall Morgan(personally), Tyler Ragan(in his official capacity), Tyler Ragan(personally) (Gibbs, James) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • (#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. (Filing Fee due by 11/13/2019)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Removal from LeFlore County District Court, case number CJ-2019-105 by LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners, Kendall Morgan(personally and in his official capacity), Tyler Ragan(personally and in his official capacity), Rob Seale (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners, Kendall Morgan(personally and in his official capacity), Tyler Ragan(personally and in his official capacity), Rob Seale (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners, Kendall Morgan(personally and in his official capacity), Tyler Ragan(personally and in his official capacity), Rob Seale by Christopher Peterson (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.