This case was last updated from PACER on 12/06/2019 at 07:48:10 (UTC).

Peterson v. Golden Valley Natural, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/07/2019 a Civil Right - Other Civil Right case was filed by Peterson against Golden Valley Natural, LLC in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Idaho District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00388

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Idaho District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Candy W. Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Theresa E. Peterson

Defendants

Jeff Peters

Golden Valley Natural, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Reed W Larsen

Attorney at COOPER & LARSEN

Po Box 4229

Pocatello, ID 83205-4229

Javier L Gabiola

Attorney at Cooper and Larsen, Chartered

P O Box 4229

Pocatello, ID 83205-4229

Defendant Attorneys

David Anthony Eisele

Attorney at Wright Law Offices

477 Shoup Avenue

Idaho Falls, ID 83405

Steven J Wright

Attorney at WRIGHT JOHNSON & WAYMENT, PLLC

Po Box 50578

Idaho Falls, ID 83405-0578

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(alw) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

1 #5

Affidavit Affidavit of Service - Golden Valley Natural, LLC

1 #2

Supplement Supplemental attachment - Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Summons Summons - Jeff Peters

1 #6

Affidavit Affidavit of Service - Jeff Peters

#8

(#8) AMENDED LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - The Court will conduct a Telephonic Scheduling Conference on November 12, 2019, at 11:00 AM mountain time, for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. On or before November 5, 2019, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)

#10

(#10) DISCOVERY PLAN by Theresa E. Peterson . (Larsen, Reed)

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER Telephonic scheduling conference held 11/12/19. Dispositive Motions due by 11/13/2020. Amended Pleadings & Joinder of Parties due by 2/4/2020. Mediation shall take place by 5/31/2020. Discovery due by 10/16/2020. Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/4/20 at 2:00 PM Mountain Time - Telephonic Hearing Courtroom 6. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)

#4

(#4) LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - The Court will conduct a telephonic scheduling conference on November 19, 2019, at 3:30 p.m. mountain time, for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. Plaintiff must initiate the conference call by placing it to (208) 334-9145 and must have all appropriate parties on the line. On or before November 12, 2019, the parties must file with the Court the Joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jeff Peters, Golden Valley Natural, LLC from Bingham County Idaho District Court, case number CV06-19-1583.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1949775.), filed by Jeff Peters, Golden Valley Natural, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Supplemental attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 State Court Complaint Complaint and Summons - Golden Valley Natural, LLC, #4 Summons Summons - Jeff Peters, #5 Affidavit Affidavit of Service - Golden Valley Natural, LLC, #6 Affidavit Affidavit of Service - Jeff Peters, #7 Errata State Court Docket Sheet)(Eisele, David)

1 #3

State Court Complaint Complaint and Summons - Golden Valley Natural, LLC

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Golden Valley Natural, LLC.(Eisele, David)

1 #1

Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for all parties re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/9/2019. (ckh)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Golden Valley Natural, LLC. (Eisele, David)

#12

(#12) Disclosure Statement filed byDavid Anthony Eisele on behalf of Golden Valley Natural, LLC, Jeff Peters. (Eisele, David)

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Theresa E. Peterson. (Larsen, Reed)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #12 Disclosure Statement (Defendants' Initial Disclosures) filed by Golden Valley Natural, LLC, Jeff Peters was filed incorrectly in this case. For future reference, pursuant to Local Rule 5.4 Non-Filing of Discovery, discovery documents must be served upon other counsel and parties but must not be filed with the Clerk of Court unless on order of the court or for use in the proceeding.(jp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Disclosure Statement filed byDavid Anthony Eisele on behalf of Golden Valley Natural, LLC, Jeff Peters. (Eisele, David)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • Set Deadlines/Hearings: Per Order dkt 11, Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/4/2020 02:00 PM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. (jp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SCHEDULING ORDER Telephonic scheduling conference held 11/12/19. Dispositive Motions due by 11/13/2020. Amended Pleadings & Joinder of Parties due by 2/4/2020. Mediation shall take place by 5/31/2020. Discovery due by 10/16/2020. Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/4/20 at 2:00 PM Mountain Time - Telephonic Hearing Courtroom 6. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DISCOVERY PLAN by Theresa E. Peterson . (Larsen, Reed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Theresa E. Peterson. (Larsen, Reed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AMENDED LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - The Court will conduct a Telephonic Scheduling Conference on November 12, 2019, at 11:00 AM mountain time, for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. On or before November 5, 2019, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Golden Valley Natural, LLC.(Eisele, David)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • (#6) DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE OF VACATED HEARING: Due to the reassignment of this case, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for November 19, 2019 before Judge Winmill is vacated. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference will be reset by a separate order. (jlb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge Candy W. Dale for all further proceedings. Judge B. Lynn Winmill no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 4:19-cv-388-CWD (alw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(alw) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - The Court will conduct a telephonic scheduling conference on November 19, 2019, at 3:30 p.m. mountain time, for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. Plaintiff must initiate the conference call by placing it to (208) 334-9145 and must have all appropriate parties on the line. On or before November 12, 2019, the parties must file with the Court the Joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for all parties re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/9/2019. (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Golden Valley Natural, LLC served on 10/7/2019. (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only as to Jeff Peters) (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Golden Valley Natural, LLC. (Eisele, David)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jeff Peters, Golden Valley Natural, LLC from Bingham County Idaho District Court, case number CV06-19-1583.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1949775.), filed by Jeff Peters, Golden Valley Natural, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Supplemental attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 State Court Complaint Complaint and Summons - Golden Valley Natural, LLC, #4 Summons Summons - Jeff Peters, #5 Affidavit Affidavit of Service - Golden Valley Natural, LLC, #6 Affidavit Affidavit of Service - Jeff Peters, #7 Errata State Court Docket Sheet)(Eisele, David)

    Read MoreRead Less