This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/23/2022 at 07:36:07 (UTC).

PETERSON v. AUTOZONE, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 PETERSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AUTOZONE, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is ANITA B. BRODY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-05217

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ANITA B. BRODY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VINCENT PETERSON

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff

AUTOZONE, INC.

3Rd Party Defendant

SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MARC I. SIMON

Attorney at Simon & Simon, PC

18 Campus Blvd, Suite 100

Newtown Square, PA 19073

ANDREW LOUIS BARON

Attorney at Simon & Simon, PC

18 Campus Blvd, Suite 100

Newtown Square, PA 19073

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

ARIEL JACOB SLIFFMAN

Attorney at German Gallagher & Murtagh, P.C.

200 S. Broad Street, Suite 500

Philadelphia, PA 19102

JACOB C. LEHMAN

Attorney at GERMAN GALLAGHER & MURTAGH

200 S Broad Street, Suite 500

Philadelphia, PA 19102

3Rd Party Defendant Attorneys

JOSHUA D. GROFF

Attorney at GREEN SILVERSTEIN & GROFF LLC

215 South Broad St Suite 500

Philadelphia, PA 19107

MARK E. GOTTLIEB

Attorney at OFFIT KURMAN

Ten Penn Center Suite 2300, 1801 Market St

Philadelphia, PA 19103

MEGAN K. SHANNON

Attorney at OFFIT KURMAN PA

1801 Market St Suite 2300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by MARK E. GOTTLIEB on behalf of SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY with JURY DEMAND AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE(GOTTLIEB, MARK) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#11

(#11) SEPTA's ANSWER to #6 Third Party Complaint of Defendant Autozone, Inc. by SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY.(SHANNON, MEGAN) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by JACOB C. LEHMAN on behalf of AUTOZONE, INC.(LEHMAN, JACOB) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

9 #1

Exhibit A-D

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA D. GROFF on behalf of SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY with Certificate of Service(GROFF, JOSHUA) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

7 #1

Exhibit A

7 #7

Main Document

6 #1

Exhibit A

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by AUTOZONE, INC. Jury Demand, Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(SLIFFMAN, ARIEL) Modified on 1/5/2022 (tjd). (Entered: 01/04/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Hearing: RULE 16 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 2/24/2022 AT 10:30 AM BEFORE HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY.(jwl, ) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW LOUIS BARON on behalf of VINCENT PETERSON (BARON, ANDREW) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by ARIEL JACOB SLIFFMAN on behalf of AUTOZONE, INC. (SLIFFMAN, ARIEL) (Entered: 12/31/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against AUTOZONE, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15572327.), filed by VINCENT PETERSON.(SIMON, MARC) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by MARK E. GOTTLIEB on behalf of SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY with JURY DEMAND AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE(GOTTLIEB, MARK) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SEPTA's ANSWER to #6 Third Party Complaint of Defendant Autozone, Inc. by SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY.(SHANNON, MEGAN) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by JACOB C. LEHMAN on behalf of AUTOZONE, INC.(LEHMAN, JACOB) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by AUTOZONE, INC..Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(SLIFFMAN, ARIEL) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA D. GROFF on behalf of SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY with Certificate of Service(GROFF, JOSHUA) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketTHIRD PARTY Summons Issued as to SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY on 1/5/22 (JL) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service re: served Joinder Complaint upon Melody Hill by Electronic on January 5, 2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(SLIFFMAN, ARIEL) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY filed by AUTOZONE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(LEHMAN, JACOB) Modified on 1/5/2022 (tjd). (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by AUTOZONE, INC. Jury Demand, Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(SLIFFMAN, ARIEL) Modified on 1/5/2022 (tjd). (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Hearing: RULE 16 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 2/24/2022 AT 10:30 AM BEFORE HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY.(jwl, ) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW LOUIS BARON on behalf of VINCENT PETERSON (BARON, ANDREW) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by ARIEL JACOB SLIFFMAN on behalf of AUTOZONE, INC. (SLIFFMAN, ARIEL) (Entered: 12/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to AUTOZONE, INC.. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 11/26/21 (JL ) (Entered: 11/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AUTOZONE, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15572327.), filed by VINCENT PETERSON.(SIMON, MARC) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY is a litigant

Latest cases where AUTOZONE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOSHUA D. GROFF