This case was last updated from PACER on 02/08/2020 at 07:46:18 (UTC).

Petersen-Dean, Inc. v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.

Case Summary

On 12/10/2019 Petersen-Dean, Inc filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alvin K. Hellerstein. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-11299

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alvin K. Hellerstein

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Petersen-Dean, Inc.

Respondent

National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Neil A. Goteiner

Attorney at Farella Braun & Martel, LLP

Russ Building, 235 Montgomery Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Steven Mark Silverberg

Attorney at Hoguet Newman Regal & Kenney, LLP

60 East 42Nd Street, 48Th Floor

New York, NY 10165

Respondent Attorneys

Nicholas Primer Crowell

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP (NY)

787 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Francesca Eva Brody

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP(NY)

787 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#1

(#15) RESPONSE to #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. Document filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA..(Crowell, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#2

***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Neil A. Goteiner for noncompliance with Section 14.2 of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet to: caseopenings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (pc) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#3

(#3) DOCUMENTS TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/10/2019) (pc) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#5

(#14) ORDER denying #5 Motion to Seal. Plaintiff moves to seal several categories of documents filed, or anticipated to be filed, in connection with this case. Because Plaintiffs only stated reason in support of its motion is that the parties here are subject to a confidentiality agreement that restricts the disclosure of certain information, the motion is denied. This Court's prior order (ECF No. 5-7) on sealing is hereby vacated. The Clerk is directed to close the motion (ECF No. 5). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/17/19) (yv) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

5 #5

Gerking Decl. Ex. 4

5 #4

Gerking Decl. Ex. 3

5 #7

Order Granting Motion to Seal - Signed by Judge Marrero (Part I)

5 #6

Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Seal

5 #3

Gerking Decl. Ex. 2

#16

(#16) CROSS MOTION to Confirm Arbitration . Document filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA..(Crowell, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#20

(#20) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #16 CROSS MOTION to Confirm Arbitration . . Document filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.. (Crowell, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#19

(#19) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #16 CROSS MOTION to Confirm Arbitration . Petersen-Dean's Reply in Support of Petition to Vacate Prehearing Security Award and Opposition to Cross-Motion to Confirm Award. Document filed by Petersen-Dean, Inc.. (Goteiner, Neil) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

18 #2

Exhibit 2

#18

(#18) DECLARATION of Nicholas P. Crowell in Opposition to Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award [Dkt. Nos. 1, 8] and in Support of Respondent's Cross-Motion to Confirm [Dkt No. 16]. Document filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Crowell, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

18 #3

Exhibit 3

18 #4

Exhibit 4

18 #1

Exhibit 1

#17

(#17) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award [Dkt. Nos. 1, 8] and in Support of Respondent's Cross-Motion to Confirm [Dkt No. 16]. Document filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.. (Crowell, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #16 CROSS MOTION to Confirm Arbitration . . Document filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.. (Crowell, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #16 CROSS MOTION to Confirm Arbitration . Petersen-Dean's Reply in Support of Petition to Vacate Prehearing Security Award and Opposition to Cross-Motion to Confirm Award. Document filed by Petersen-Dean, Inc.. (Goteiner, Neil) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) DECLARATION of Nicholas P. Crowell in Opposition to Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award [Dkt. Nos. 1, 8] and in Support of Respondent's Cross-Motion to Confirm [Dkt No. 16]. Document filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Crowell, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award [Dkt. Nos. 1, 8] and in Support of Respondent's Cross-Motion to Confirm [Dkt No. 16]. Document filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.. (Crowell, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) CROSS MOTION to Confirm Arbitration . Document filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA..(Crowell, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) RESPONSE to #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. Document filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA..(Crowell, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER denying #5 Motion to Seal. Plaintiff moves to seal several categories of documents filed, or anticipated to be filed, in connection with this case. Because Plaintiffs only stated reason in support of its motion is that the parties here are subject to a confidentiality agreement that restricts the disclosure of certain information, the motion is denied. This Court's prior order (ECF No. 5-7) on sealing is hereby vacated. The Clerk is directed to close the motion (ECF No. 5). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/17/19) (yv) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 1/22/2020. Replies due by 1/29/2020. (yv) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/17/19) (yv) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time re Briefing Schedule for Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Nicholas P. Crowell dated December 16, 2019. Document filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA..(Crowell, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Petersen-Dean, Inc..(Silverberg, Steven) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Seal Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award. Document filed by Petersen-Dean, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tyler C. Gerking in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Gerking Decl. Ex. 1, #3 Gerking Decl. Ex. 2, #4 Gerking Decl. Ex. 3, #5 Gerking Decl. Ex. 4, #6 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Seal, # Vacated as per Judge's Order dated 12/17/2019, Doc. # 14 (7) Order Granting Motion to Seal - Signed by Judge Marrero (Part I))(Silverberg, Steven) Modified on 12/17/2019 (yv). (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Neil A. Goteiner for noncompliance with Section 14.2 of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet to: caseopenings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (pc) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • (#4) SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DOCUMENTS TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/10/2019) (pc) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED as to National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.. (pc) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (pc) (pne). (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465401250092).Document filed by Petersen-Dean, Inc..(pc) (pne). (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.