This case was last updated from PACER on 07/20/2019 at 07:09:01 (UTC).

PETERS v. TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/21/2019 PETERS filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are M CASEY RODGERS, MICHAEL J FRANK and T KENT WETHERELL II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00138

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

MICHAEL J FRANK

Presiding Judges

M CASEY RODGERS

T KENT WETHERELL II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AUTUMN PETERS

Defendant

TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMY D BOGGS

Attorney at BOGGS LAW GROUP PA - ST PETERSBURG FL

4554 Central Avenue, Suite L

St Petersburg, FL 33711

Defendant Attorneys

JOHN MICHAEL PENNEKAMP

Attorney at FOWLER WHITE BURNETT PA - MIAMI FL

1395 Brickell Ave - 14Th Fl

Miami, FL 33131

KEITH MICHAEL DETWEILER

Attorney at NIELSEN CARTER & TREAS LLC - METAIRIE LA

3838 N Causeway Blvd Ste 2850

Metairie, LA 70002

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II for all further proceedings. JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 7/16/2019. (erl)**Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 5:19cv138-TKW/MJF. (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#9

(#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (BOGGS, AMY) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by KEITH MICHAEL DETWEILER on behalf of TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY (DETWEILER, KEITH) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#7

(#7) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 6/24/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/24/2019. Discovery due by 12/10/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 6/10/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by AMY D BOGGS on behalf of AUTUMN PETERS (BOGGS, AMY) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent Tower Hill Holdings, Inc. for TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY.. (PENNEKAMP, JOHN) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#4

(#4) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY. (PENNEKAMP, JOHN) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

3 #1

NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT

#3

(#3) NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE. (mailed via USPS to Pla's counsel) (Attachments: #1 NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT) (sdw) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (PENNEKAMP, JOHN) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - SFIP

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Complaint State Court

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tower Hill Prime Insurance Company from 14th Judicial Circuit in and for Bay County, Florida, case number 19001267CA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4497176.), filed by Tower Hill Prime Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint State Court, #2 Exhibit 2 - SFIP, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (PENNEKAMP, JOHN) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II for all further proceedings. JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 7/16/2019. (erl)**Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 5:19cv138-TKW/MJF. (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (sdw) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (BOGGS, AMY) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by KEITH MICHAEL DETWEILER on behalf of TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY (DETWEILER, KEITH) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 6/24/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/24/2019. Discovery due by 12/10/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 6/10/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #6 Notice of Appearance. (please see proposed ISO) (sdw) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by AMY D BOGGS on behalf of AUTUMN PETERS (BOGGS, AMY) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent Tower Hill Holdings, Inc. for TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY.. (PENNEKAMP, JOHN) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY. (PENNEKAMP, JOHN) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE. (mailed via USPS to Pla's counsel) (Attachments: #1 NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT) (sdw) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (PENNEKAMP, JOHN) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tower Hill Prime Insurance Company from 14th Judicial Circuit in and for Bay County, Florida, case number 19001267CA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4497176.), filed by Tower Hill Prime Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint State Court, #2 Exhibit 2 - SFIP, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (PENNEKAMP, JOHN) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tower Hill Prime Ins Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amy D. Boggs(Designation Retained)