This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/03/2021 at 08:02:08 (UTC).

Peters, Derivatively on Behalf of Nominal Defendant Eastman Kodak Company v. Continenza et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 Peters, Derivatively on Behalf of Nominal Defendant Eastman Kodak Company filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against Continenza. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth A. Wolford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-06621

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Elizabeth A. Wolford

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LOUIS PETERS, Derivatively on Behalf of Nominal Defendant EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY

Louis Peters

Petitioner

Herbert Silverberg

Defendants

JAMES V. CONTINENZA

DAVID E. BULLWINKLE

ROGER W. BYRD

RICHARD TODD BRADLEY

GEORGE KARFUNKEL

PHILLIPE D. KATZ

JASON NEW

RANDY VANDAGRIFF

EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hadley L. Matarazzo

Attorney at Faraci Lange LLP

28 East Main Street, Suite 1100

Rochester, NY 14614

Eric L. Zagar

Attorney at Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

280 King Of Prussia Road

Radnor, PA 19087

Lee D. Rudy

Attorney at Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

280 King Of Prussia Road

Radnor, PA 19087

Stacey A. Greenspan

Attorney at Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

280 King Of Prussia Road

Radnor, PA 19087

Defendant Attorneys

John P. Nowak

Attorney at Paul Hastings LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Kevin C. Logue

Attorney at Paul Hastings LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Zachary S. Zwillinger

Attorney at Paul Hastings LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Katherine Johnson Berris

Attorney at Paul Hastings LLP

2050 M Street Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Andrew W. Goldwater

Attorney at Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP

7 Times Square, 27Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Eric Owen Corngold

Attorney at Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP

7 Times Square, 27Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Timothy Michael Haggerty

Attorney at Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP

7 Times Square, 27Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Andrew W. Stern

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

787 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Joshua J. Card

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

787 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Peter J Mardian

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

787 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Christopher J. Clark

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

1271 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Jeff G. Hammel

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

1271 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Michael S. Bosworth

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

1271 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Zachary L. Rowen

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

1271 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Avi D. Schick

Attorney at Troutman Sanders LLP

875 Third Avenue, 16Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Mary Grace W. Metcalfe

Attorney at Troutman Sanders LLP

875 Third Avenue, 16Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

25 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#64

(#64) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A Straus on behalf of Jason New (Straus, Paul) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#63

(#63) NOTICE of Appearance by David Mitchell Zensky on behalf of Eastman Kodak Company (Zensky, David) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

62 #10

Exhibit 16 - Order in Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund v. Icahn

62 #9

Exhibit 15 - Decision in Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund v. Ica

62 #8

Exhibit 14 - Kodak's March 16, 2021 10-K

62 #7

Exhibit 13 - In re Activision Blizzard Oral Argument Transcript

62 #6

Exhibit 12 - Memo in Support of Karfunkel's Motion to Dismiss

62 #5

Exhibit 11 - Memo in Support of Eastman Kodak's Motion to Dismiss

62 #4

Exhibit 10 - Memo in Support of Option Defendants' Motion to Dismiss

2 #5

Memorandum in Support

2 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Lee D. Rudy, Esq.

#2

(#4) STIPULATION Regarding Briefing Schedule re #2 Motion for Consolidation and Appointment by Louis Peters. (Matarazzo, Hadley) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet with Attachments

1 #4

Compl. Exhibit D [9.24.21 Def Status Rpt]

1 #3

Exhibit C [11.6.20 Demand response]

1 #2

Exhibit B [9.15.20 SC Report]

1 #1

Exhibit A [8.13.20 demand]

#1

162 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A Straus on behalf of Jason New (Straus, Paul) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) NOTICE of Appearance by David Mitchell Zensky on behalf of Eastman Kodak Company (Zensky, David) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) RESPONSE in Support re #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appointment of Lead Plaintiff filed by Herbert Silverberg. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Jeffrey S. Abraham in Support of Plaintiff Silverbergs Cross-Motion for Organizing the Two Related Shareholder Derivative Actions, #2 Exhibit 8 - Peters Docket, #3 Exhibit 9 - Memo in Support of Continenza's Motion to Dismiss Insider Trading Claim, #4 Exhibit 10 - Memo in Support of Option Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit 11 - Memo in Support of Eastman Kodak's Motion to Dismiss, #6 Exhibit 12 - Memo in Support of Karfunkel's Motion to Dismiss, #7 Exhibit 13 - In re Activision Blizzard Oral Argument Transcript, #8 Exhibit 14 - Kodak's March 16, 2021 10-K, #9 Exhibit 15 - Decision in Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund v. Icahn, #10 Exhibit 16 - Order in Miami Firefighters' Relief and Pension Fund v. Icahn)(Abraham, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) Letter filed by Eastman Kodak Company as to George Karfunkel, David E. Bullwinkle, Phillipe D. Katz, Randy Vandagriff, James V. Continenza, Jason New, Roger W. Byrd, Eastman Kodak Company, Richard Todd Bradley re #49 MEMORANDUM. (Nussbaum, Carolyn) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) TEXT ORDER granting #46 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by David M. Zensky. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/16/2021. (MGB)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) TEXT ORDER granting #47 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Eliot Lauer. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/09/2021. (MGB)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) TEXT ORDER granting #33 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Mary Grace W. Metcalfe. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/09/2021. (MGB)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) TEXT ORDER granting #32 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by W. Alex Smith. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/09/2021. (MGB)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) TEXT ORDER granting #31 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Avi Schick. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/09/2021. (MGB)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) TEXT ORDER granting #48 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Zachary L. Rowen. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/09/2021. (MGB)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding deadline to respond to complaint. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 10/25/2021. (MGB) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding briefing schedule. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 10/25/2021. (MGB) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION and [Proposed Order] Regarding Deadline to Respond by James V. Continenza. (Zwillinger, Zachary) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION Regarding Briefing Schedule re #2 Motion for Consolidation and Appointment by Louis Peters. (Matarazzo, Hadley) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appointment of Lead Plaintiff by Herbert Silverberg. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Klein, #2 Exhibit 1 - NY AG Filings, #3 Exhibit 2 - Peters Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit 3 - July 2020 Forms 4, #5 Exhibit 4 - Silverberg Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 - Dendreon Transcript, #7 Exhibit 6 - KTMC Website Page, #8 Exhibit 7 - Kodak Bylaws, #9 Exhibit 8 - AF&T Resume, #10 Memorandum in Support of Silverbergs Cross-Motion, for Organizing the Two Related Shareholder Derivative Actions and in Response to the Peters Motion, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Klein, Michael) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel by Louis Peters. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Lee D. Rudy, Esq., #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Lee D. Rudy, Esq., #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Lee D. Rudy, Esq., #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration of Lee D. Rudy, Esq., #5 Memorandum in Support, #6 Proposed Order)(Matarazzo, Hadley) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketAUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 402 receipt number 0209-4378964, filed by LOUIS PETERS, Derivatively on Behalf of Nominal Defendant EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A [8.13.20 demand], #2 Exhibit B [9.15.20 SC Report], #3 Exhibit C [11.6.20 Demand response], #4 Compl. Exhibit D [9.24.21 Def Status Rpt], #5 Civil Cover Sheet with Attachments)(Matarazzo, Hadley) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew W. Stern

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy Michael Haggerty

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric O. Corngold Esq.