This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2019 at 11:13:03 (UTC).

Peterkin v. Pardon and Paroles

Case Summary

On 04/04/2019 Peterkin filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Pardon and Paroles. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kari A. Dooley. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00497

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kari A. Dooley

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Doram Anthony Peterkin

Uncasville, CT 06382

Respondent

Board of Pardon and Paroles

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

JoAnne Sulik

Attorney at Chief State Attorney Office, Civil Litigation Bureau

300 Corporate Place

Rocky Hill, CT 06067

 

Court Documents

#12

#11

#10

9 #1

Replacement pdf.

#9

#8

7 #7

Rule 7

7 #6

Rule 12

7 #5

Notice to Pro Se Party

7 #4

Appendix C

7 #3

Appendix B

7 #2

Appendix A

7 #1

Memorandum in Support

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Gould, K.) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Dismiss and finding as moot #9 Motion For Relief, and finding as moot #11 Motion for Emergency Relief. See attached Memorandum of Decision. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 6/25/19. (Dooley, Kari) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION seeking Emergency Relief by Doram Anthony Peterkin. Responses due by 7/12/2019. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket Entry Correction re #9 MOTION seeking Emergency Relief. Corrected replacement pdf. added. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Duplicity and Violation of Constitutional Rights by Doram Anthony Peterkin. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION seeking Emergency Relief by Doram Anthony Peterkin. Responses due by 6/10/2019. (Fanelle, N.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/21/2019: #1 Replacement pdf.) (Fanelle, N.). (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) OPPOSITION to #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Doram Anthony Peterkin. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Dismiss by Board of Pardon and Paroles.Responses due by 5/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Appendix A, #3 Appendix B, #4 Appendix C, #5 Notice to Pro Se Party, #6 Rule 12, #7 Rule 7)(Sulik, JoAnne) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by JoAnne Sulik on behalf of Board of Pardon and Paroles (Sulik, JoAnne) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Set Deadline: Show Cause Response due by 5/17/2019 (Gould, K.) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Re Petition for writ of habeas corpus. See attached. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 4/8/19.(Dooley, Kari) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 4/4/2019.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Standing Order on Prisoner Electronic Filing Program. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/4/2019.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 4/4/2019.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • PRISCS - Filing fee received from Doram Anthony Peterkin: $5.00, receipt number CTXH00015421. (Bozek, M.) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PRISCS - PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Doram Anthony Peterkin. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Board of Pardons and Paroles is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JoAnne Sulik