This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 14:46:02 (UTC).

Peterkin v. Howmedica Osteonics Corp

Case Summary

On 06/20/2019 Peterkin filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Indira Talwani. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-11366

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Indira Talwani

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bonnie Peterkin

Defendants

Howmedica Osteonics Corp

Howmedica Osteonics Corp doing business as STRYKER ORTHOPAEDICS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter A. Sandberg

Attorney at Ingaldson Fitzgerald, P.C.

813 W 3Rd Avenue

Anchorage, AK 99501

Defendant Attorney

Steve S. Tervooren

Attorney at Hughes Gorski Seedorf Odsen & Tervooren LLC

3900 C Street, Suite 1001

Anchorage, AK 99503

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #11 Master Long Form Complaint by Howmedica Osteonics Corp.(DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#11

(#11) MASTER LONG FORM COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp.(DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

10 #2

Supplement Category Sheet

10 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#10

(#10) COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:19-cv-11366, filed by Bonnie Peterkin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Category Sheet)(Sandberg, Peter) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

9 #7

Order Aiding Private Settlement

9 #6

Defendant Fact Sheet

9 #5

Plaintiff Fact Sheet

9 #4

Fact Sheet Implementation Order

9 #3

ESI Order

9 #2

Protective Order

9 #1

Case Management Orders No. 1-5

#9

(#9) Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MDL Orders No. 1-13, (Attachments: #1 Case Management Orders No. 1-5, #2 Protective Order, #3 ESI Order, #4 Fact Sheet Implementation Order, #5 Plaintiff Fact Sheet, #6 Defendant Fact Sheet, #7 Order Aiding Private Settlement)(Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

6 #1

*Restricted*

#6

(#6) Case transferred in from District of Alaska; Case Number 3:19-cv-00158. (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#5

(#5) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-48) - 2 action(s) re: pldg. (1 in AK/3:19-cv-00157, 1 in AK/3:19-cv-00158, 387 in MDL No. 2768) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. This case transfer to the District of Massachusetts for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Howmedica Osteonics Corp (Tervooren, Steve) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #11 Master Long Form Complaint by Howmedica Osteonics Corp.(DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MASTER LONG FORM COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp.(DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:19-cv-11366, filed by Bonnie Peterkin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Category Sheet)(Sandberg, Peter) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MDL Orders No. 1-13, (Attachments: #1 Case Management Orders No. 1-5, #2 Protective Order, #3 ESI Order, #4 Fact Sheet Implementation Order, #5 Plaintiff Fact Sheet, #6 Defendant Fact Sheet, #7 Order Aiding Private Settlement)(Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • (#8) NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: Pursuant to CTO Number: 48, MDL No. 2768 has been transferred from Alaska and assigned civil action number: 19-11366. Alaska case number: 19-00158. In Re: Striker Orthopaedics LFIT V40 Femoral Head Products Liability Litigation (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • (#7) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Case transferred in from District of Alaska; Case Number 3:19-cv-00158. (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Case transferred to District of Massachusetts. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-48) - 2 action(s) re: pldg. (1 in AK/3:19-cv-00157, 1 in AK/3:19-cv-00158, 387 in MDL No. 2768) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. This case transfer to the District of Massachusetts for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Howmedica Osteonics Corp (Tervooren, Steve) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (Tervooren, Steve) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Howmedica Osteonics Corp from Superior Court of Alaska at Anchorage, case number 3AN-19-6883CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2708942), filed by Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tervooren, Steve) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less