This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 15:41:35 (UTC).

Peter Strojnik, Sr. v. Burton Way Hotels LLC

Case Summary

On 02/15/2019 Peter Strojnik, Sr filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Burton Way Hotels LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are George H. Wu and Rozella A. Oliver. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01199

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George H. Wu

Referral Judge

Rozella A. Oliver

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Peter Strojnik, Sr

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Defendants

Burton Way Hotels LLC

Burton Way Hotels LLC doing business as Four Seasons Los Angeles at Beverly Hills

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: GRANTING #7 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (shb) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Plaintiff Peter Strojnik, Sr. (iv) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Peter Strojnik, Sr, upon Defendant Burton Way Hotels LLC served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Michelle Klein in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (lom) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (lh) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant Burton Way Hotels LLC. (lh) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Defendant Burton Way Hotels LLC. Case assigned to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver.(Filing Fee $ 400 Paid) Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Peter Strojnik, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lh) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BURTON WAY HOTELS LTD A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant