This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/31/2023 at 20:14:46 (UTC).

Peter Moses Gutierrez v. Amplify Energy Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 Peter Moses Gutierrez filed a Property - Land lawsuit against Amplify Energy Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are David O. Carter and John D. Early. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-01628

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David O. Carter

Referral Judge

John D. Early

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Peter Moses Gutierrez, Jr.

Chandralekha Wickramasekaran

Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran

East Meets West Excursions

John Pedicini

Marysue Pedicini

Quality Sea Food, Inc.

LBC Seafood, Inc.

125 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alex R. Straus

Stephen Gerard Larson

Jason A Ibey

Seyed Abbas Kazerounian

Blake Hunter Yagman

Lexi J Hazam

Darren O. Aitken

Megan Janet Gless Demshki

Wylie A Aitken

Erica A Maharg

Hannah E Mohr

James Thomas Brett

Jason Robert Flanders

Matthew Christopher Maclear

Paul A Matiasic

Other Attorneys

David Seabold Casey, Jr

121 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#87

No Description Available

#753

No Description Available

752 #3

Exhibit 3 - [Proposed] Plan of Distribution Waterfront Tourism

752 #2

Exhibit 2 - [Proposed] Plan of Distribution Real Property

752 #1

Exhibit 1 - [Proposed] Plan of Distribution Fishers

#752

No Description Available

#751

No Description Available

#750

No Description Available

#749

No Description Available

#748

No Description Available

747 #2

Proposed Order

747 #1

Declaration

#747

No Description Available

#746

No Description Available

#745

No Description Available

744 #2

Proposed Order Proposed Order

1,242 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2023
  • Docket(#778) ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #777 Cosco Shipping Lines Co. LTD.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief From Initial Standing Order Following Assignment of Civil Case to Judge Carter, Rule I, For 9/14/23 Status Conference. (twdb) (Entered: 08/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#777) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from Initial Standing Order re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #11 filed by Defendant COSCO Shipping Lines Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicholas S. Politis in Support of Cosco Shipping Lines Co. Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for Relief from Initial Standing Order, #2 Proposed Order Granting Cosco Shipping Lines Co. Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for Relief from Initial Standing Order) (Conner, Lisa) (Entered: 08/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • Docket(#776) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #772 . The following error(s) was/were found: Docket text and document conflict; re party name. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 08/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • Docket(#775) RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Plaintiffs' Plans of Distribution #760 filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran, Consol Plaintiff Beyond Business Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Amended) Granting Motion for Approval of Plans of Distribution)(Hazam, Lexi) (Entered: 08/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • Docket(#774) RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for GRANTING ATTORNEYS FEES, EXPENSES, AND SERVICE AWARDS UNDER RULE 23(H) #756 filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran, Consol Plaintiff Beyond Business Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Amended) Granting Motion for Attorneys Fees, Expenses, and Service Awards, #2 Exhibit A - Supplemental Declaration of Lexi J. Hazam)(Hazam, Lexi) (Entered: 08/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • Docket(#773) RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION #755 for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran, Consol Plaintiff Beyond Business Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Second Amended) Granting Final Approval of Settlement, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Gretchen Eoff)(Hazam, Lexi) (Entered: 08/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2023
  • Docket(#772) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Richard D McCune counsel for Consol Plaintiff Beyond Business Incorporated. Sherief Morsy is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Plaintiff. (McCune, Richard) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2023
  • Docket(#771) NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Plaintiffs' Plans of Distribution #760 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for GRANTING ATTORNEYS FEES, EXPENSES, AND SERVICE AWARDS UNDER RULE 23(H) #756 , MOTION #755 filed by Defendant COSCO Shipping Lines Co. Ltd.. (Conner, Lisa) (Entered: 08/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • Docket(#770) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher William Keegan counsel for Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. James Yates is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants James Yates. (Keegan, Christopher) (Entered: 08/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • Docket(#769) Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Intervenors Ascot Underwriting Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, MARKEL INTERNATIONAL LTD. (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 3000).(Hall, James) (Entered: 08/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
758 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Beta Operating Company, LLC. (esa) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Amplify Energy Corporation. (esa) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (esa) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (esa) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Peter Moses Gutierrez, Jr. (Straus, Alex) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Peter Moses Gutierrez, Jr. (Straus, Alex) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Peter Moses Gutierrez, Jr, identifying N/A. (Straus, Alex) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Peter Moses Gutierrez, Jr. (Straus, Alex) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32094542 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Peter Moses Gutierrez, Jr. (Attorney Alex R. Straus added to party Peter Moses Gutierrez, Jr(pty:pla))(Straus, Alex) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less