This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/30/2021 at 08:20:41 (UTC).

Peter D Arcy v. Sequential Brands Group, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 Peter D Arcy filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Sequential Brands Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is J. Paul Oetken. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-07296

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Paul Oetken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CJD Property Finance Company, LLC

Petitioners

James Conlon

Glenn Daniel Payne

Defendants

Sequential Brands Group, Inc.

Yehuda Shmidman

Karen Murray

Gary Klein

Andrew Cooper

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Devin Freedman

Attorney at Roche Freedman LLP

1 Se 3Rd Ave.Suite 1240

Miami, FL 33131

Ivy T. Ngo

Attorney at Roche Freedman LLP

1 Se 3Rd Ave.Suite 1240

Miami, FL 33131

Constantine Philip Economides

Attorney at Roche Freedman LLP

1 Se 3Rd Ave.Suite 1240

Miami, FL 33131

Petitioner Attorney

Jennifer Pafiti

Attorney at Pomerantz LLP

1100 Glendon Avenue15Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Defendant Attorney

Mary Beth Maloney

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP (NY)

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

 

Court Documents

34 #2

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

34 #1

Exhibit Declaration of Ivy Ngo

34 #34

Main Document

#33

(#33) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mary Beth Maloney on behalf of Sequential Brands Group, Inc...(Maloney, Mary Beth) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

#32

(#32) NOTICE of Commencement of Chapter 11 Cases and Automatic Stay. Document filed by Sequential Brands Group, Inc...(Maloney, Mary Beth) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

#31

#30

9 #1

Proposed Order

9 #9

Main Document

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

PSLRA Certification

1 #1

Main Document

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER granting #34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (bh) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #34 MOTION for Ivy T. Ngo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25056011. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MOTION for Ivy T. Ngo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25056011. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by CJD Property Finance Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Ivy Ngo, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Ngo, Ivy) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mary Beth Maloney on behalf of Sequential Brands Group, Inc...(Maloney, Mary Beth) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE of Commencement of Chapter 11 Cases and Automatic Stay. Document filed by Sequential Brands Group, Inc...(Maloney, Mary Beth) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-10471-JPO. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Constantine Philip Economides on behalf of CJD Property Finance Company, LLC..(Economides, Constantine) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Devin Freedman on behalf of CJD Property Finance Company, LLC..(Freedman, Devin) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Appointment of Lead Plaintiff #9 filed by Plaintiff Peter D Arcy. (Rosen, Laurence) [Transferred from California Central on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Appointment of Lead Plaintiff filed by Movant Peter D Arcy. Motion set for hearing on 6/21/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rosen, Laurence) [Transferred from California Central on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Andrew Cooper, Gary Klein, Karen Murray, Sequential Brands Group, Inc., Yehuda Shmidman. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Peter DArcy. (Rosen, Laurence) [Transferred from California Central on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Peter DArcy, (Rosen, Laurence) [Transferred from California Central on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Peter DArcy. (Rosen, Laurence) [Transferred from California Central on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30922036 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Peter DArcy. (Attachments: #1 PSLRA Certification) (Attorney Laurence M. Rosen added to party Peter DArcy(pty:pla))(Rosen, Laurence) [Transferred from California Central on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEQUENTIAL BRANDS GROUP is a litigant