This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/28/2021 at 09:20:26 (UTC).

PESTRETTO v. COOK INCORPORATED et al

Case Summary

On 10/29/2021 PESTRETTO filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against COOK INCORPORATED. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-06652

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANTOINETTE PESTRETTO

Defendants

COOK INCORPORATED

COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED

COOK GROUP INC.

COOK MEDICAL LLC

WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Neal Lewis Moskow

Attorney at URY & MOSKOW

883 Black Rock Turnpike

Fairfield, CT 06825

Paul L. Stoller

Attorney at DALIMONTE RUEB STOLLER, LLP

2425 East Camelback Roadsuite 500

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Defendant Attorneys

Andrea Roberts Pierson

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Streetsuite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Kip S.M. McDonald

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Streetsuite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul L. Stoller on behalf of MDL Plaintiff ANTOINETTE PESTRETTO. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06652-RLY-TAB (Stoller, Paul) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#18

(#18) AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by ANTOINETTE PESTRETTO.Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06652-RLY-TAB(Stoller, Paul) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#13

(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK GROUP INC., COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK DENMARK HOLDING APS, COOK DENMARK INTERNATIONAL APS, COOK GROUP EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP, INC., COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MED INSTITUTE, INC., COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES, COOK NEDERLAND BV, MED INSTITUTE, INC., MEDICAL ENGINEERING AND DEVELOPMENT INSTITUTE, INC., WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-00551-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02736-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02778-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02789-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02790-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02791-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02797-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02798-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02806-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02807-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02814-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02819-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02826-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02828-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02834-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02835-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06553-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06633-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06639-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06652-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06655-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06656-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06658-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#12

(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK GROUP INC., COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK DENMARK HOLDING APS, COOK DENMARK INTERNATIONAL APS, COOK GROUP EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP, INC., COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MED INSTITUTE, INC., COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES, COOK NEDERLAND BV, MED INSTITUTE, INC., MEDICAL ENGINEERING AND DEVELOPMENT INSTITUTE, INC., WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-00551-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02736-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02778-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02789-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02790-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02791-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02797-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02798-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02806-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02807-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02814-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02819-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02826-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02828-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02834-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02835-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06553-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06633-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06639-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06652-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06655-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06656-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06658-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#9

(#16) Second Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 11/2/2021.(LBT) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

15 #1

*Restricted*

#15

(#15) Case transferred in from District of Connecticut; Case Number 3:21-cv-01312. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#14

(#14) MDL Transfer Order. Case transferred to Southern District of Indiana. Signed by Clerk John W. Nichols, MDL Panel. (Fanelle, N.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 10/29/2021.] (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#13

(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Antoinette Pestretto. Cook Group Incorporated served on 10/12/2021, answer due 11/2/2021. (Moskow, Neal) [Transferred from Connecticut on 10/29/2021.] (Entered: 10/14/2021)

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#8

No Description Available

#7

No Description Available

#6

No Description Available

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Antoinette Pestretto, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 10/5/2021.(Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 10/29/2021.] (Entered: 10/05/2021)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK GROUP INC., COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK DENMARK HOLDING APS, COOK DENMARK INTERNATIONAL APS, COOK GROUP EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP, INC., COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MED INSTITUTE, INC., COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES, COOK NEDERLAND BV, MED INSTITUTE, INC., MEDICAL ENGINEERING AND DEVELOPMENT INSTITUTE, INC., WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-00551-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02736-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02778-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02789-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02790-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02791-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02797-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02798-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02806-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02807-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02814-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02819-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02826-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02828-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02834-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02835-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06553-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06633-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06639-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06652-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06655-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06656-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06658-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK GROUP INC., COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK DENMARK HOLDING APS, COOK DENMARK INTERNATIONAL APS, COOK GROUP EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP, INC., COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MED INSTITUTE, INC., COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES, COOK NEDERLAND BV, MED INSTITUTE, INC., MEDICAL ENGINEERING AND DEVELOPMENT INSTITUTE, INC., WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-00551-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02736-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02778-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02789-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02790-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02791-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02797-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02798-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02806-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02807-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02814-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02819-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02826-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02828-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02834-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02835-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06553-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06633-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06639-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06652-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06655-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06656-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06658-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul L. Stoller on behalf of MDL Plaintiff ANTOINETTE PESTRETTO. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06652-RLY-TAB (Stoller, Paul) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by ANTOINETTE PESTRETTO.Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06652-RLY-TAB(Stoller, Paul) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • Docket(#17) Remark - Case Transferred In from District of Connecticut, Cause No. 3:21-cv-1312 on 10/29/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-29-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from District of Connecticut, Cause No. 3:21-cv-1312 on 10/29/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6652-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Middle District of Florida, Cause No. 8:21-cv-2456 on 11/2/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6653-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Northern District of Florida, Cause No. 1:21-cv-159 on 11/2/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6654-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Eastern District of Michigan, Cause No. 1:21-cv-12217 on 10/18/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6655-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Southern District of Mississippi, Cause No. 5:21-cv-89 on 10/29/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-XX-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from District of New Mexico, Cause No. 1:21-cv-1009 on 10/29/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6657-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Northern District of Ohio, Cause No. 1:21-cv-1800 on 10/29/2021, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:21-cv-6658-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06652-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06653-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06654-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06655-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06656-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06657-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06658-RLY-TAB(LBT) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Second Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 11/2/2021.(LBT) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Case transferred in from District of Connecticut; Case Number 3:21-cv-01312. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketJUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Fanelle, N.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 10/29/2021.] (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MDL Transfer Order. Case transferred to Southern District of Indiana. Signed by Clerk John W. Nichols, MDL Panel. (Fanelle, N.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 10/29/2021.] (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Antoinette Pestretto. Cook Group Incorporated served on 10/12/2021, answer due 11/2/2021. (Moskow, Neal) [Transferred from Connecticut on 10/29/2021.] (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Antoinette Pestretto, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 10/5/2021.(Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 10/29/2021.] (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 10/5/2021.(Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 10/29/2021.] (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 10/5/2021.(Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 10/29/2021.] (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/4/2021. Discovery due by 4/6/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 5/11/2022. Signed by Clerk on 10/5/2021.(Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 10/29/2021.] (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketJudge Kari A. Dooley added. (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 10/29/2021.] (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to Cook Medical LLC. (Moskow, Neal) [Transferred from Connecticut on 10/29/2021.] (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to Cook Group Incorporated. (Moskow, Neal) [Transferred from Connecticut on 10/29/2021.] (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to Cook Medical Incorporated. (Moskow, Neal) [Transferred from Connecticut on 10/29/2021.] (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to Cook Incorporated. (Moskow, Neal) [Transferred from Connecticut on 10/29/2021.] (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6673683.), filed by Antoinette Pestretto. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moskow, Neal) [Transferred from Connecticut on 10/29/2021.] (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COOK GROUP INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where COOK INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where COOK MEDICAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS is a litigant