Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/10/2020 at 08:05:58 (UTC).

Pesch v. Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 05/11/2020 Pesch filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shelly D. Dick and Erin Wilder-Doomes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00288

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Shelly D. Dick

Referral Judge

Erin Wilder-Doomes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alan Pesch

Defendants

Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company

Trace Adair

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ross Michael LeBlanc

Attorney at dudley debosier injury lawyers

1075 Governemnt Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Defendant Attorneys

Chelsea Coleman Crews

Attorney at Strauss Massey Dinneen LLC

935 Gravier Street, Ste 1450

New Orleans, LA 70112

David A. Strauss

Attorney at Strauss Massey Dinneen LLC

935 Gravier Street, Suite 1450

New Orleans, LA 70112

William C. Helm

Attorney at Kinchen Walker Bienvenue Bargas Reed & Helm

9456 Jefferson Highway, Building Iii, Suite F

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #10 MOTION to Remand filed by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. (Crews, Chelsea) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

#14

(#14) Minute Entry/Telephone Conference Report and Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes: Telephone Conference held on 6/1/2020. Brief due by 6/8/2020. (KMW) Modified on 6/5/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW). (Entered: 06/04/2020)

#13

(#13) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #10 MOTION to Remand filed by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. (Crews, Chelsea) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

10 #3

Attachment Proposed Order

10 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B - Bone & Joint medical records

10 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Response to Request for Admission

#10

(#10) MOTION to Remand by Alan Pesch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Response to Request for Admission, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Bone & Joint medical records, #3 Attachment Proposed Order)(LeBlanc, Ross) Modified on 5/27/2020 to edit text (LT). (Entered: 05/26/2020)

8 #2

Exhibit Proposed Order

8 #1

Proposed Pleading; Amended Notice of Removal

#8

(#8) Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute #1 Notice of Removal by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Amended Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Crews, Chelsea) Modified on 5/26/2020 to link the entries (KMW). (Entered: 05/25/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE AND ORDER: On or before 5/25/2020, Defendant Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company shall file a Motion to Substitute the Notice of Removal with a comprehensive Amended Notice of Removal as set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/18/2020. (SWE) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

1 #5

Attachment Corporate Disclosure Statement

1 #4

Attachment Certificate of Compliance

1 #3

Attachment Notice of all parties remaining

1 #2

Attachment State Court Record

1 #1

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 23rd JDC for Ascension Parish, Case Number 125597. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2111976), filed by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment State Court Record, #3 Attachment Notice of all parties remaining, #4 Attachment Certificate of Compliance, #5 Attachment Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Crews, Chelsea) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/11/2020 to flatten the document) (KMW). (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/28/2020 pursuant to rec doc 9) (LT). (Entered: 05/11/2020)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #10 MOTION to Remand filed by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. (Crews, Chelsea) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Minute Entry/Telephone Conference Report and Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes: Telephone Conference held on 6/1/2020. Brief due by 6/8/2020. (KMW) Modified on 6/5/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW). (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #10 MOTION to Remand filed by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. (Crews, Chelsea) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: A Telephone Conference is set before the Magistrate Judge for 6/1/2020 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes to discuss the pending #10 Motion to Remand. Counsel participating in the Conference shall call 877-336-1839 using access code 9565780 five minutes prior to conference. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice to Counsel: In light of the pending #10 Motion to Remand, good cause exists to defer entry of a scheduling order at this time. The Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2020 is CANCELED. No status report is due. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Remand by Alan Pesch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Response to Request for Admission, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Bone & Joint medical records, #3 Attachment Proposed Order)(LeBlanc, Ross) Modified on 5/27/2020 to edit text (LT). (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Ex Parte Motion to Substitute Attachment. The clerk is directed to replace R. Doc. 1 with R. Doc. 8-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/26/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute #1 Notice of Removal. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute #1 Notice of Removal by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Amended Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Crews, Chelsea) Modified on 5/26/2020 to link the entries (KMW). (Entered: 05/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE AND ORDER: On or before 5/25/2020, Defendant Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company shall file a Motion to Substitute the Notice of Removal with a comprehensive Amended Notice of Removal as set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/18/2020. (SWE) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SEALED Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support of #1 Notice of Removal filed by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1-1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(NLT) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: The #2 SEALED Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Removal Under Seal is GRANTED, as the documents sought to be sealed contain information regarding settlement negotiations and some medical records. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the Supplemental Memorandum in support of removal at R. Doc. 2-2, and the exhibits attached thereto at R. Doc. 2-3 through R. Doc. 2-6, UNDER SEAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 05/13/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (NLT) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Status Report due by 6/11/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2020 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/12/2020. (KMW) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation for Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. (KMW) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Removal Under Seal by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; SEALED Supplemental Memo, #3 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit 1 to Supplemental memo, #4 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit 1-1 to Supplemental memo, #5 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit 2 to Supplemental memo, #6 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit 3 to Supplemental memo)(Crews, Chelsea) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 23rd JDC for Ascension Parish, Case Number 125597. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2111976), filed by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment State Court Record, #3 Attachment Notice of all parties remaining, #4 Attachment Certificate of Compliance, #5 Attachment Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Crews, Chelsea) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/11/2020 to flatten the document) (KMW). (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/28/2020 pursuant to rec doc 9) (LT). (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE NORTHWESTERN INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant