This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/04/2023 at 11:07:11 (UTC).

Personnel Staffing Group, LLC v. XL Insurance America, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/08/2022 Personnel Staffing Group, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against XL Insurance America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John F. Walter and Steve Kim. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-06491

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Walter

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Personnel Staffing Group, LLC

Respondents

XL Insurance America, Inc.

XL Specialty Insurance Company

Does 1 through 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Joseph C Gjonola

Vincent S Gannuscio

Nicholas P Roxborough

Respondent Attorneys

Michaela Battista Sozio

Nicholas A. Ritrivi

Lincoln V. Horton

 

Court Documents

64 #4

Exhibit A - Part 2

64 #2

Declaration of Samuel J. Thomas

64 #1

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

#64

(#64) APPLICATION to file document Notice of Motion to Seal and Redact Certain Documents under seal filed by Respondents XL Insurance America, Inc., XL Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Samuel J. Thomas, #3 Exhibit A - Part 1, #4 Exhibit A - Part 2, #5 Exhibit A - Part 3, #6 Proposed Order)(Sozio, Michaela) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

54 #8

Exhibit 6 - Nov 21, 2022 emails

54 #2

Declaration DECLARATION OF JOSEPH C. GJONOLA

#54

(#57) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Petitioner Personnel Staffing Group, LLC. correcting NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Arbitration #54 (Gjonola, Joseph) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

42 #5

Proposed Order

42 #1

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

1 #18

Exhibit A-18 - Exhibit 7 to Exhibit F in Support of Petition to Vacate Arbitrati

1 #13

Exhibit A-13 - Exhibit 2 to Exhibit F in Support of Petition to Vacate Arbitrati

1 #11

Exhibit A-11 - Exhibit F in Support of Petitiion to Vacate Arbitration Award

1 #9

Exhibit A-9 - Exhibit D in Support of Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award

1 #8

Exhibit A-8 - Exhibit C in Support of Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award

1 #7

Exhibit A-7 - Exhibit B in Support of Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award

1 #6

Exhibit A-6 - Exhibit A in Support of Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award

1 #1

Exhibit A-1 - Superior Court Civil Case Cover

1 #1

Main Document

145 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2022
  • Docket(#66) TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from Southern District of New York, 1:22-cv-10259 filed 12/2/2022. (rolm) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING RESPONDENTS XL INSURANCE AMERICA, INC. AND XL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANYS MOTION TO TRANSFER TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK [filed 11/1/22; Docket No. #42 ]; ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION [filed 11/23/22; Docket No. #54 ]; and ORDER DENYING RESPONDENTS XL INSURANCE AMERICA, INC. AND XL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION TO SEAL AND REDACT CERTAIN DOCUMENTS [filed 11/30/22; Docket No. #64 ] by Judge John F. Walter. Respondents' Motion is GRANTED, and this action is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. In light of the transfer of this action to the Southern District of New York, the Court DENIES without prejudice Petitioner's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and DENIES Respondents Motion to Seal and Redact Certain Documents. Case transferred electronically. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (iv) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) APPLICATION to file document Notice of Motion to Seal and Redact Certain Documents under seal filed by Respondents XL Insurance America, Inc., XL Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Samuel J. Thomas, #3 Exhibit A - Part 1, #4 Exhibit A - Part 2, #5 Exhibit A - Part 3, #6 Proposed Order)(Sozio, Michaela) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) STATEMENT of Decision NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District #42 [Proposed] filed by Respondents XL Insurance America, Inc., XL Specialty Insurance Company. (Sozio, Michaela) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) RESPONSE filed by Respondents XL Insurance America, Inc., XL Specialty Insurance Companyto Text Only Scheduling Notice,,,, 60 Declaration of Michaela Battista Sozio in Response to OSC Re Sanctions for Respondent's Failure to Timely File Statement of Decision (Sozio, Michaela) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) Text Entry Order STRIKING Notice of Under Seal Filing, #52 . Docket text and filing do not match. Incorrect filing event chosen. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) Text Entry Order: The Court has reviewed the docket in this action and determined that counsel for Respondents has failed to file the proposed Statement of Decision required by paragraph 5(f) of the Court's Standing Order, filed September 13, 2022 (Docket No. #12 ), in connection with Respondents Motion to Transfer to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, filed on November 1, 2022 (Docket No. #42 ). Accordingly, counsel for Respondents is ordered to show cause in writing on or before 12:00 p.m., on December 1, 2022, why counsel should not be sanctioned in the amount of $2,500.00 for violating the Court's Standing Order. No oral argument on this matter will be heard unless otherwise ordered by the Court. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of the response to the Order to Show Cause. Failure to respond to the Order to Show Cause will result in the imposition of sanctions. In addition, Respondents shall file the required proposed Statement of Decision on or before 12:00 p.m., on December 1, 2022. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Samuel Thomas to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant XL Insurance America, Inc. and XL Specialty Insurance Company, designating Michaela Sozio as local counsel #56 . (iv) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) Amended STIPULATION to Amended filed by Respondents XL Insurance America, Inc., XL Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Sozio, Michaela) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Petitioner Personnel Staffing Group, LLC. correcting NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Arbitration #54 (Gjonola, Joseph) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2022
  • Docket(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (et) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of New Case Number and Judge Assignment by Clerk. This case is hereby converted from case type MC to case type CV because the incorrect case type was used at case opening. A new case number has therefore been assigned to this case. District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim are assigned to this new case number. All future documents must be filed under the new case number, which is 2:22-06491-JFW (SKx). The previous case number, 2:22-mc-00182-, is hereby terminated. (et) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-CONFORMED COPY OF PETITION VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD filed against XL Insurance America, Inc., XL Specialty Insurance Company, Does 1 through 50, filed by Petitioner Personnel Staffing Group, LLC. [SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT NO. 5 #1 ] (et) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Respondents XL Insurance America, Inc., XL Specialty Insurance Company. correcting Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,, #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal)(Horton, Lincoln) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Respondents XL Insurance America, Inc., XL Specialty Insurance Company, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on 09-08-2022. (Horton, Lincoln) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Respondents XL Insurance America, Inc., XL Specialty Insurance Company, identifying Greenwich Insurance Company; X.L. America, Inc.; XL Financial Holdings (Ireland); XL Bermuda Ltd.; XL Group Ltd; AXA SA. (Horton, Lincoln) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Respondents XL Insurance America, Inc., XL Specialty Insurance Company. (Horton, Lincoln) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 22STCP03266 Receipt No: ACACDC-33951461 - Fee: $402, filed by Respondent XL Specialty Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 - Superior Court Civil Case Cover, #2 Exhibit A-2 - Declaration of Joe Gjonola and Exhibits in Support of Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award, #3 Exhibit A-3 - Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award, #4 Exhibit A-4 - Petitioner's Notice of Conditional Filing Under Seal, #5 Exhibit A-5 - Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award, #6 Exhibit A-6 - Exhibit A in Support of Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award, #7 Exhibit A-7 - Exhibit B in Support of Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award, #8 Exhibit A-8 - Exhibit C in Support of Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award, #9 Exhibit A-9 - Exhibit D in Support of Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award, #10 Exhibit A-10 - Exhibit E (Redacted) in Support of Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award, #11 Exhibit A-11 - Exhibit F in Support of Petitiion to Vacate Arbitration Award, #12 Exhibit A-12 - Exhibit 1 to Exhibit F in Support of Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award, #13 Exhibit A-13 - Exhibit 2 to Exhibit F in Support of Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award, #14 Exhibit A-14 - Exhibit 3 to Exhibit F in Support of Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award, #15 Exhibit A-15 - Exhibit 4 to Exhibit F in Support of Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award, #16 Exhibit A-16 - Exhibit 5 to Exhibit F in Support of Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award, #17 Exhibit A-17 - Exhibit 6 to Exhibit F in Support of Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award, #18 Exhibit A-18 - Exhibit 7 to Exhibit F in Support of Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award, #19 Exhibit A-19 - Exhibit 8 to Exhibit F in Support of Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award) (Attorney Lincoln V Horton added to party XL Insurance America, Inc. (pty:res), Attorney Lincoln V Horton added to party XL Specialty Insurance Company(pty:res))(Horton, Lincoln) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less