This case was last updated from PACER on 08/04/2019 at 07:22:47 (UTC).

Persaud v. Ascension Health Short-Term Disability Payroll Program et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2019 Persaud filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Ascension Health Short-Term Disability Payroll Program. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jean C. Hamilton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-01636

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jean C. Hamilton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gary Persaud

Defendants

Ascension Health Short-Term Disability Payroll Program

Ascension Health Long-Term Disability Plan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Phillip A. Tatlow

Attorney at BOLLWERK AND TATLOW, LLC

10525 Big Bend Boulevard

St. Louis, MO 63122

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gary Persaud Ascension Health Short-Term Disability Payroll Program waiver signed on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Tatlow, Phillip) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gary Persaud Ascension Health Long-Term Disability Plan waiver signed on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Tatlow, Phillip) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

1 #2

Original Filing Form Original Filing Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7259274, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Gary Persaud. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Tatlow, Phillip) Modified on 6/5/2019 (JWD). Clerk's note: Waivers of Service to each defendant were uploaded as part of the Main Document PDF by the filer. (Entered: 06/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gary Persaud Ascension Health Short-Term Disability Payroll Program waiver signed on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Tatlow, Phillip) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gary Persaud Ascension Health Long-Term Disability Plan waiver signed on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Tatlow, Phillip) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 2. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Jean C. Hamilton. (JWD) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7259274, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Gary Persaud. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Tatlow, Phillip) Modified on 6/5/2019 (JWD). Clerk's note: Waivers of Service to each defendant were uploaded as part of the Main Document PDF by the filer. (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less