This case was last updated from PACER on 12/22/2020 at 09:01:38 (UTC).

Perry v. Global Lending Services LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 Perry filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Global Lending Services LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sam R Cummings. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-03244

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam R Cummings

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony Perry

3Rd Party Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Claimants

Global Lending Services LLC

Family Dealership Group LLC doing business as Family Toyota of Burleson

Cross Defendant

Family Dealership Group LLC

3Rd Party Defendant

Taylor Perry

Joshua, TX 76058

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

R Douglas Scott

Attorney at Law Offices of Craig Zimmerman

Suite 200, 3901 Arlington Highlands Blvd.

Arlington, TX 76018

3Rd Party Plaintiff, Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Shay Powell Talbitzer

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

1801 California Street, Suite 5000

Denver, CO 80202

Kevin A Teters

Attorney at Holland & Knight

200 Crescent Court, Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75201

Anne-Alise Fritsche

Attorney at Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons LLP

700 N Pearl Street, 25Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75201-2832

Barry A Moscowitz

Attorney at Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons LLP

700 N Pearl St 25Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75201-2832

David A McFarland

Attorney at Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons LLP

700 N Pearl Street, 25Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75201-2832

Derek D Rollins

Attorney at Shackelford Bowen McKinley & Norton LLP

9201 N Central Expressway, 4Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75231

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Anne-Alise Fritsche

Attorney at Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons LLP

700 N Pearl Street, 25Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75201-2832

Barry A Moscowitz

Attorney at Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons LLP

700 N Pearl St 25Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75201-2832

David A McFarland

Attorney at Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons LLP

700 N Pearl Street, 25Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75201-2832

Derek D Rollins

Attorney at Shackelford Bowen McKinley & Norton LLP

9201 N Central Expressway, 4Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75231

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Family Dealership Group LLC. (McFarland, David) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#19

(#19) ANSWER to Crossclaim filed by Family Dealership Group LLC. Related document: #8 Answer to Complaint,,,,, Third Party Complaint,,,,, Crossclaim,,,, (McFarland, David) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David A McFarland on behalf of Family Dealership Group LLC. (Filer will update contact info in ECF.) (McFarland, David) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#17

(#17) ANSWER to Third Party Complaint filed by Taylor Perry. Related document: #8 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (oyh) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#16

(#16) ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Family Dealership Group LLC answer due 12/21/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 12/14/2020) (ndt) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

#15

(#15) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Cross-Claim filed by Family Dealership Group LLC (Rollins, Derek) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#14

(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Taylor Perry; served on 11/28/2020. (jmg) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#13

(#13) ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS Filing of Exhibit A to Cross Claim to #8 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint , Crossclaim filed by Global Lending Services LLC (Talbitzer, Shay) Modified event and text on 11/23/2020 (mjr). (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#8

(#13) ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS Filing of Exhibit A to Cross Claim to #8 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint , Crossclaim filed by Global Lending Services LLC (Talbitzer, Shay) Modified event and text on 11/23/2020 (mjr). (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Global Lending Services LLC answer due 11/16/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 11/2/2020) (ndt) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#5

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Global Lending Services LLC answer due 11/16/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 11/2/2020) (ndt) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#4

(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Global Lending Services LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties. (Talbitzer, Shay) Modified title on 10/26/2020 (hml). (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#2

(#2) *** PLEASE DISREGARD *** CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Global Lending Services LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Assured Investment Management, LLC for Global Lending Services LLC. (Talbitzer, Shay) Modified text on 10/26/2020 (hml). (Entered: 10/23/2020)

1 #3

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #2

Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit(s)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Global Lending Services LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11298337) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Talbitzer, Shay) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Family Dealership Group LLC. (McFarland, David) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ANSWER to Crossclaim filed by Family Dealership Group LLC. Related document: #8 Answer to Complaint,,,,, Third Party Complaint,,,,, Crossclaim,,,, (McFarland, David) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David A McFarland on behalf of Family Dealership Group LLC. (Filer will update contact info in ECF.) (McFarland, David) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ANSWER to Third Party Complaint filed by Taylor Perry. Related document: #8 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (oyh) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Family Dealership Group LLC answer due 12/21/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 12/14/2020) (ndt) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Cross-Claim filed by Family Dealership Group LLC (Rollins, Derek) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Taylor Perry; served on 11/28/2020. (jmg) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS Filing of Exhibit A to Cross Claim to #8 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint , Crossclaim filed by Global Lending Services LLC (Talbitzer, Shay) Modified event and text on 11/23/2020 (mjr). (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anne-Alise Fritsche on behalf of Family Dealership Group LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Fritsche, Anne-Alise) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry A Moscowitz on behalf of Family Dealership Group LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Moscowitz, Barry) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Issued as to Taylor Perry. (ndt) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Global Lending Services LLC. (Talbitzer, Shay) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Global Lending Services LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Taylor Perry filed by Global Lending Services LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., CROSSCLAIM against Family Dealership Group LLC filed by Global Lending Services LLC (Talbitzer, Shay) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Family Dealership Group LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Rollins, Derek) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Global Lending Services LLC answer due 11/16/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 11/2/2020) (ndt) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Global Lending Services LLC (Talbitzer, Shay) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Global Lending Services LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties. (Talbitzer, Shay) Modified title on 10/26/2020 (hml). (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) *** PLEASE DISREGARD *** CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Global Lending Services LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Assured Investment Management, LLC for Global Lending Services LLC. (Talbitzer, Shay) Modified text on 10/26/2020 (hml). (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Global Lending Services LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11298337) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Talbitzer, Shay) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less