Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/26/2020 at 11:22:39 (UTC).

PERRY et al v. SELECT MANAGEMENT RESOURCES, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/28/2020 PERRY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SELECT MANAGEMENT RESOURCES, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are CATHERINE C. EAGLES and JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00685

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CATHERINE C. EAGLES

Referral Judge

JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Ericka Burch

Christopher Blacknall

Veronica Vaughn

Angelo Graves

Chandris Wyatt

Chetarra Hill

Keeling Barrino

Ethel Dolores Lawson

Atashaniyah Robinson

Francesca Cheek

Theartis Evans, Jr.

Brenda Plott

Danny Horne, Jr.

Barry Mullins

Kimiesha Hyman

Joe Harper

Kimberly Butchee

Defendants and Counter Claimants

North American Title Loans, LLC

LoanSmart, LLC

Anderson Financial Services, LLC

66 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER

Attorney at BENSON, BROWN & FAUCHER, PLLC

822 N. Elm St., Ste. 200

Greensboro, NC 27401

JEFFREY K. PERALDO

Attorney at BENSON, BROWN & FAUCHER, PLLC

822 N. Elm St., Ste. 200

Greensboro, NC 27401

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

MELANIE BLACK DUBIS

Attorney at PARKER POE ADAMS & BERNSTEIN

Pob 389

Raleigh, NC 27602-0389

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) Letter to Clerk, Guilford County Superior Court re: #19 Order. (Daniel, J) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#19

(#19) ORDER signed by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 9/1/2020. Plaintiffs' motion to remand (Doc. #12 ) is GRANTED and this matter is remanded to the North Carolina Superior Court, Guilford County. (Daniel, J) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#18

(#18) ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 8/28/2020. The Motion for Extension of Time to Respond (Doc. #16 ) is GRANTED, and the response filed August 27, 2020 is timely. (Daniel, J) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#17

(#17) NOTICE by ANDERSON FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, LOANSMART, LLC, NORTH AMERICAN TITLE LOANS, LLC, SELECT MANAGEMENT RESOURCES, LLC re #12 MOTION to Remand (DUBIS, MELANIE) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

16 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#16

(#16) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Remand by ANDERSON FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, LOANSMART, LLC, NORTH AMERICAN TITLE LOANS, LLC, SELECT MANAGEMENT RESOURCES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DUBIS, MELANIE) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#15

(#15) Answer/Reply to Counterclaim by CRYSTAL BAGBY, KEELING BARRINO, CHRISTOPHER BLACKNALL, ERICKA BURCH, KIMBERLY BUTCHEE, MARY CAUDLE, FRANCESCA CHEEK, ELIZABETH CHOLKA, BEVERLY COX, THEARTIS EVANS, JR, ANGELO GRAVES, JOE HARPER, YOLANDA HAYNES, RODNEY HIGH, CHETARRA HILL, DANNY HORNE, JR, KIMIESHA HYMAN, ANTHONY JOHNSON, GARY JONES, ETHEL DOLORES LAWSON, GLORIA LEGGETT, SAMUEL LINEBERRY, DAVID LITTLE, APRIL MCCLAIN, MELISSA MILLS, FREDERICK MOORE, TAMMY MOORE, BARRY MULLINS, SARAH PAYNE, ALFRED PERRY, BRENDA PLOTT, ATASHANIYAH ROBINSON, GARY RUSHING, SHERRY STEELE, SANDRA THOMPSON, TAKEESHA TILLERY, VERONICA VAUGHN, THOMAS WHEELER, CHANDRIS WYATT. (FAUCHER, JAMES) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to #7 Complaint and Counterclaim by SELECT MANAGEMENT RESOURCES, LLC, LOANSMART, LLC, ANDERSON FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, NORTH AMERICAN TITLE LOANS, LLC. (DUBIS, MELANIE) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#12

(#13) BRIEF re #12 MOTION to Remand . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Graves Loan Agreement, #2 Exhibit Miller v. Morocho Bros., #3 Exhibit McLendon v. Walter Home Mortgage., #4 Exhibit NCGS 75-16)(PERALDO, JEFFREY) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant Select Management Resources, LLC (DUBIS, MELANIE) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant North American Title Loans, LLC (DUBIS, MELANIE) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant LoanSmart, LLC (DUBIS, MELANIE) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant Anderson Financial Services, LLC (DUBIS, MELANIE) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MELANIE BLACK DUBIS on behalf of Defendants Anderson Financial Services, LLC, LoanSmart, LLC, North American Title Loans, LLC, Select Management Resources, LLC (DUBIS, MELANIE) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit C - Declaration of Kenneth Wayco

1 #2

Exhibit B - Proof of Service of Process

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Summonses and Complaint

#1

(#8) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Original document filed in Guilford County Superior Court, case # 20CVS5558, and is listed as Exhibit A to the #1 Petition for Removal.) (Hicks, Samantha) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Letter to Clerk, Guilford County Superior Court re: #19 Order. (Daniel, J) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER signed by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 9/1/2020. Plaintiffs' motion to remand (Doc. #12 ) is GRANTED and this matter is remanded to the North Carolina Superior Court, Guilford County. (Daniel, J) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions Submitted: #12 MOTION to Remand to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 8/28/2020. The Motion for Extension of Time to Respond (Doc. #16 ) is GRANTED, and the response filed August 27, 2020 is timely. (Daniel, J) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE by ANDERSON FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, LOANSMART, LLC, NORTH AMERICAN TITLE LOANS, LLC, SELECT MANAGEMENT RESOURCES, LLC re #12 MOTION to Remand (DUBIS, MELANIE) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions Referred: RE: #16 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Remand to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Sanders, Marlene) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Remand by ANDERSON FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, LOANSMART, LLC, NORTH AMERICAN TITLE LOANS, LLC, SELECT MANAGEMENT RESOURCES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DUBIS, MELANIE) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Answer/Reply to Counterclaim by CRYSTAL BAGBY, KEELING BARRINO, CHRISTOPHER BLACKNALL, ERICKA BURCH, KIMBERLY BUTCHEE, MARY CAUDLE, FRANCESCA CHEEK, ELIZABETH CHOLKA, BEVERLY COX, THEARTIS EVANS, JR, ANGELO GRAVES, JOE HARPER, YOLANDA HAYNES, RODNEY HIGH, CHETARRA HILL, DANNY HORNE, JR, KIMIESHA HYMAN, ANTHONY JOHNSON, GARY JONES, ETHEL DOLORES LAWSON, GLORIA LEGGETT, SAMUEL LINEBERRY, DAVID LITTLE, APRIL MCCLAIN, MELISSA MILLS, FREDERICK MOORE, TAMMY MOORE, BARRY MULLINS, SARAH PAYNE, ALFRED PERRY, BRENDA PLOTT, ATASHANIYAH ROBINSON, GARY RUSHING, SHERRY STEELE, SANDRA THOMPSON, TAKEESHA TILLERY, VERONICA VAUGHN, THOMAS WHEELER, CHANDRIS WYATT. (FAUCHER, JAMES) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to #7 Complaint and Counterclaim by SELECT MANAGEMENT RESOURCES, LLC, LOANSMART, LLC, ANDERSON FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, NORTH AMERICAN TITLE LOANS, LLC. (DUBIS, MELANIE) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) BRIEF re #12 MOTION to Remand . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Graves Loan Agreement, #2 Exhibit Miller v. Morocho Bros., #3 Exhibit McLendon v. Walter Home Mortgage., #4 Exhibit NCGS 75-16)(PERALDO, JEFFREY) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Hicks, Samantha) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Hicks, Samantha) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Original document filed in Guilford County Superior Court, case # 20CVS5558, and is listed as Exhibit A to the #1 Petition for Removal.) (Hicks, Samantha) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by SHERRY STEELE, SARAH PAYNE, GARY RUSHING, BEVERLY COX, KIMIESHA HYMAN, ETHEL DOLORES LAWSON, ANGELO GRAVES, ALFRED PERRY, FRANCESCA CHEEK, SAMUEL LINEBERRY, ERICKA BURCH, KIMBERLY BUTCHEE, MARY CAUDLE, MELISSA MILLS, DAVID LITTLE, GARY JONES, KEELING BARRINO, CHETARRA HILL, SANDRA THOMPSON, TAMMY MOORE, CHRISTOPHER BLACKNALL, GLORIA LEGGETT, JOE HARPER, DANNY HORNE, JR, RODNEY HIGH, BARRY MULLINS, YOLANDA HAYNES, THEARTIS EVANS, JR, ANTHONY JOHNSON, CHANDRIS WYATT, CRYSTAL BAGBY, ELIZABETH CHOLKA, VERONICA VAUGHN, BRENDA PLOTT, APRIL MCCLAIN, TAKEESHA TILLERY, THOMAS WHEELER, FREDERICK MOORE, ATASHANIYAH ROBINSON. (Original document filed in Guilford County Superior Court, case # 20CVS5558, and is listed as Exhibit A to the #1 Petition for Removal.)(Hicks, Samantha) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant Select Management Resources, LLC (DUBIS, MELANIE) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant North American Title Loans, LLC (DUBIS, MELANIE) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant LoanSmart, LLC (DUBIS, MELANIE) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant Anderson Financial Services, LLC (DUBIS, MELANIE) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MELANIE BLACK DUBIS on behalf of Defendants Anderson Financial Services, LLC, LoanSmart, LLC, North American Title Loans, LLC, Select Management Resources, LLC (DUBIS, MELANIE) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2852306.)(Related Case # 1:19-cv-321, 1:19-cv-325, 1:19-cv-519, 1:19-cv-670, 1:19-cv-575), filed by Select Management Resources, LLC, LoanSmart, LLC, Anderson Financial Services, LLC, North American Title Loans, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summonses and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service of Process, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Kenneth Wayco)(DUBIS, MELANIE) Modified on 7/29/2020 to correct related case number. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Anderson Financial Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where North American Company for Life and Health Insurance is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melanie B Dubis